EP2522073 - BROADBAND ANALOG RADIO-FREQUENCY COMPONENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.01.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.02.2018 [2018/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Spero Devices, Inc. 43 Nagog Park Suite 215 Acton MA 01720 / US | For all designated states Gupta, Dev V. 356 Mattison Drive Concord, MA 01742 / US | For all designated states Lai, Zhiguo 236 Brown Bear Crossing Acton, MA 01718 / US | [2016/06] |
Former [2012/46] | For all designated states Newlans, Inc. 43 Nagog Park Suite 215 Acton, MA 01720 / US | ||
For all designated states Gupta, Dev V. 356 Mattison Drive Concord, MA 01742 / US | |||
For all designated states Lai, Zhiguo 236 Brown Bear Crossing Acton, MA 01718 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUPTA, Dev, V. 356 Mattison Drive Concord, MA 01742 / US | 02 /
LAI, Zhiguo 236 Brown Bear Crossing Acton, MA 01718 / US | [2012/46] | Representative(s) | Driver, Virginia Rozanne Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/46] | Driver, Virginia Rozanne Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | Application number, filing date | 11790125.6 | 11.02.2011 | WO2011US24542 | Priority number, date | US20100304064P | 12.02.2010 Original published format: US 304064 P | US20100359108P | 28.06.2010 Original published format: US 359108 P | [2012/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011152896 | Date: | 08.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2522073 | Date: | 14.11.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.12.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 08.12.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.05.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H03F3/45, H03H11/04, H03H11/24, H04L25/03, H03F1/22 | [2014/24] | CPC: |
H03F3/45183 (EP,US);
H03F3/45 (KR);
H03F1/223 (EP,US);
H03F3/19 (EP,US);
H03F3/45188 (EP,US);
H03F3/45197 (EP,US);
H03F3/45201 (EP,US);
H03H11/04 (KR);
H03H11/1256 (EP,US);
H03H11/24 (KR);
H03H11/53 (EP,US);
H03H7/482 (US);
H03H7/487 (US);
H04L25/03 (KR);
H03F2200/264 (EP,US);
H03F2200/36 (EP,US);
H03F2203/45318 (EP,US);
H03F2203/45374 (EP,US);
H03F2203/45644 (EP,US);
H03F2203/45686 (EP,US);
H03F2203/45702 (EP,US);
H03H2210/017 (EP,US);
H03H2210/021 (EP,US);
H03H2210/028 (EP,US);
H03H2210/036 (EP,US);
H03H2210/04 (EP,US);
H03H7/24 (US);
H03H7/25 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2012/46] | H03F3/45, H03H11/04, H03H11/24, H04L25/03 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/46] | Title | German: | ANALOGE BREITBAND-FUNKFREQUENZ-KOMPONENTEN | [2012/46] | English: | BROADBAND ANALOG RADIO-FREQUENCY COMPONENTS | [2012/46] | French: | COMPOSANTS RADIOÉLECTRIQUES ANALOGIQUES À LARGE BANDE | [2012/46] | Entry into regional phase | 09.08.2012 | National basic fee paid | 09.08.2012 | Search fee paid | 09.08.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.08.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.08.2012 | Examination requested [2012/46] | 09.12.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.09.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/06] | 28.09.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2017 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6765377 (LU JINGHUI [US]) [X] 1-8 * column 3, lines 41-60 *; | [A]GB2439116 (LAM CHI MING JOHN [HK]) [A] 1-8 * page 5, line 32 - page 6, line 7; figure 3 *; | [A]US2007146071 (WU YUE [US]) [A] 1-8 * paragraphs [0016] - [0023]; figure 4 * | International search | [A]US6359507 (MYER ROBERT EVAN [US]); | [A]US2002114270 (PIERZGA WAYNE FRANCIS [US], et al); | [A]WO02095990 (IBM [US], et al); | [A]US2005130609 (NAGODE THOMAS D [US], et al); | [A]US2006186995 (WU JIANGFENG [US], et al) |