EP2577536 - METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR PREDICTING UNOBSERVED PHENOTYPES (PUP) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.09.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.09.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 18.10.2017 [2017/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Syngenta Participations AG Schwarzwaldallee 215 4058 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2013/15] | For all designated states Syngenta Participations AG Schwarzwaldallee 215 4058 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUO, Zhigang c/o Syngenta Biotechnology Inc. P.O. Box 12257 3054 Cornwallis Road Research Triangle Park, NC 27709-2257 / US | 02 /
KISHORE, Venkata, Krishna c/o Syngenta Biotechnology Inc. P.O. Box 12257 3054 Cornwallis Road Research Triangle Park, NC 27709-2257 / US | [2013/15] | Representative(s) | SYNGENTA IP WRO B8-Z1-30 Rosentalstrasse 67 4058 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2014/18] | Syngenta International AG WRO 1008-Z1-26 Schwarzwaldalle 215 4058 Basel / CH | ||
Former [2013/41] | Schaberg, Ulf Günther, et al Syngenta International AG Intellectual Property Department Schwarzwaldallee 215 4058 Basel / CH | ||
Former [2013/15] | Radkov, Stoyan Atanassov Syngenta Crop Protection AG WRO1004.6.18-1 Schwarzwaldallee 215 4058 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 11790396.3 | 02.06.2011 | WO2011US38909 | Priority number, date | US20100793550 | 03.06.2010 Original published format: US 793550 | [2013/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011153336 | Date: | 08.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/49] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2577536 | Date: | 10.04.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.12.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 23.02.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06F19/14, G06F19/18 | [2017/16] | CPC: |
G16B20/20 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6895 (US);
G16B20/00 (EP,US);
G16B20/40 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/15] | G06F19/14, G06F17/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/15] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR VORHERSAGE UNBEOBACHTETER PHÄNOTYPEN | [2013/15] | English: | METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR PREDICTING UNOBSERVED PHENOTYPES (PUP) | [2013/15] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET COMPOSITIONS PERMETTANT DE PRÉDIRE DES PHÉNOTYPES NON OBSERVÉS | [2013/15] | Entry into regional phase | 12.11.2012 | National basic fee paid | 12.11.2012 | Search fee paid | 12.11.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.11.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.11.2012 | Examination requested [2013/15] | 28.12.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.09.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US5492547 (JOHNSON RICHARD [US]) [I] 1-14 * abstract * * column 5, line 20 - line 52 * * column 7, line 8 - line 12 * * column 24, line 52 - line 62 * * column 4, line 17 - line 19 * * claims 10,12,14 * * column 11, line 40 - line 45 *; | [A] - S. ZHONG ET AL, "Factors Affecting Accuracy From Genomic Selection in Populations Derived From Multiple Inbred Lines: A Barley Case Study", GENETICS, US, (20090318), vol. 182, no. 1, doi:10.1534/genetics.108.098277, ISSN 0016-6731, pages 355 - 364, XP055131917 [A] 1-14 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1534/genetics.108.098277 | International search | [X]US6455758 (JOHNSON GLENN RICHARD [US]); | [A]US2007105107 (WANG TIANLIN [US], et al); | [A]US2007166707 (SCHADT ERIC E [US], et al); | [Y]US2008216188 (RAGOT MICHEL [FR], et al); | [XP]US2010145624 (KISHORE VENKATA KRISHNA [US], et al); | [XP]US2010204921 (KISHORE VENKATA KRISHNA [US], et al); | [Y] - ZHONG ET AL., "Factors Affecting Accuracy From Genomic Selection in Populations Derived From Multiple Inbred Unes: A Barley Case Study", GENETICS, (200905), vol. 182, pages 355 - 364, XP055131917 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1534/genetics.108.098277 | [A] - HABIER ET AL., "The Impact of Genetic Relationship Information on Genome-Assisted Breeding Values", GENETICS, (200712), vol. 177, no. 4, pages 2389 - 2397, XP055131915 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1534/genetics.107.081190 |