EP2638034 - SUBSTITUTED HETEROAROMATIC CARBOXAMIDE AND UREA DERIVATIVES AS VANILLOID RECEPTOR LIGANDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.10.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.11.2015 [2015/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Grünenthal GmbH Zieglerstrasse 6 52078 Aachen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/38] | For all designated states Grünenthal GmbH Zieglerstrasse 6 52078 Aachen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRANK, Robert LuisenstraBe 28 52070 Aachen / DE | 02 /
CHRISTOPH, Thomas Schilderstrasse 42 52080 Aachen / DE | 03 /
LESCH, Bernhard Korneliusstrasse 59 52076 Aachen / DE | 04 /
LEE, Jeewoo c/o Digitalbiotech Co. Ltd. Building 20 Room 402 College of Pharmacy, Seoul National University, Shinlim-Dong-Kwanak-Ku Seoul 151 -742 / KR | [2013/38] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [N/P] |
Former [2013/38] | Brosch, Oliver, et al Kutzenberger Wolff & Partner Theodor-Heuss-Ring 23 50668 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 11791203.0 | 09.11.2011 | WO2011EP05628 | Priority number, date | EP20100014449 | 10.11.2010 Original published format: EP 10014449 | [2013/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012062462 | Date: | 18.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2638034 | Date: | 18.09.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.05.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C07D401/14, C07D403/14, C07D405/14, C07D413/12, C07D417/12, C07D471/04 | [2013/38] | CPC: |
C07D403/12 (EP,US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P1/12 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P11/08 (EP);
A61P13/00 (EP);
A61P13/10 (EP);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P17/04 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P19/10 (EP);
A61P23/00 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/02 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P25/06 (EP);
A61P25/08 (EP);
A61P25/14 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/22 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P25/30 (EP);
A61P25/32 (EP);
A61P25/36 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P31/22 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P7/10 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
C07D401/14 (EP,US);
C07D405/14 (EP,US);
C07D413/12 (EP,US);
C07D417/12 (EP,US);
C07D471/04 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/38] | Title | German: | SUBSTITUIERTE HETEROAROMATISCHE CARBOXAMID- UND HARNSTOFFDERIVATE ALS VANILLOIDREZEPTORLIGANDEN | [2013/38] | English: | SUBSTITUTED HETEROAROMATIC CARBOXAMIDE AND UREA DERIVATIVES AS VANILLOID RECEPTOR LIGANDS | [2013/38] | French: | CARBOXAMIDE HÉTÉROAROMATIQUE SUBSTITUÉ ET DÉRIVÉS DE L'URÉE EN TANT QUE LIGANDS DU RÉCEPTEUR VANILLOÏDE | [2013/38] | Entry into regional phase | 10.06.2013 | National basic fee paid | 10.06.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.06.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.09.2012 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.06.2013 | Examination requested [2013/38] | 19.12.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.06.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/47] | 15.07.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2014 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2005004133 (MAKINGS LEWIS R [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * whole document, specially compounds I-119, I-120, I-122 and I-123 in p. 20 *; | [Y]WO2005028445 (MERCK SHARP & DOHME [GB], et al) [Y] 1-15 * claim 1 *; | [A]WO2006061638 (ANGELETTI P IST RICHERCHE BIO [IT], et al) [A] 1-15 * compounds in p. 32, l. 33-34; p. 35, l. 20-23; p. 37, l. 7-10 and p. 39, l. 15-16 *; | [I]WO2007054480 (ORGANON NV [NL], et al) [I] 1-15 * whole document, specially examples 3C-3J and 8A-8S. *; | [A]WO2010044441 (SHIONOGI & CO [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * compounds II-2-12 in p. 174, II-2-191 in p.210 and II-2-197 in p. 211 *; | [A] - Chemcats, Chemical Abstracts Service, Columbus, Ohio, US, (20101018), XP002626336 [A] 1-15 * Order Number: SYN 15554367 * | [A] - Chemcats, Chemical Abstracts Service, Columbus, Ohio, US, (20100216), XP002626337 [A] 1-15 * Order Number: SYN 15554367 * | [X] - CHEMCATS, Chemical Abstracts Service, Columbus, Ohio, US, (20100804), XP002626338 [X] 1-13 * Order Number: OSSK_895636 * | by applicant | - CHENG, PRUSOFF; BIOCHEM. PHARMACOL, (1973), vol. 22, pages 3099 - 3108 | - CHENG, PRUSOFF, BIOCHEM. PHARMACOL., (1973), vol. 22, pages 3099 - 3108 | - D. DUBUISSON ET AL., PAIN, (1977), vol. 4, pages 161 - 174 | - T.J. CODERRE ET AL., PAIN, (1993), vol. 52, pages 259 - 285 | - I.C. HENDERSHOT; J. FORSAITH, J. PHARMACOL. EXP. THER., (1959), vol. 125, pages 237 - 240 | - BENNETT; XIE, PAIN, (1988), vol. 33, pages 87 - 107 | - Reaxys@ Database, ELSEVIER | - Compendium of Organic Synthetic Methods, WILEY & SONS | - Reaxys@ database, ELSEVIER | - SciFinder@ database, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY |