EP2642956 - VALVE FOR OSTOMY POUCH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.05.2018 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.06.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.01.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hollister Incorporated 2000 Hollister Drive Libertyville, IL 60048-3781 / US | [2013/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARCH, Daniel 1706 Cherry Court Lake Villa, IL 60046 / US | 02 /
HANNAN, John, F. Carrowcarden County Sligo Enniscrone / IE | 03 /
KING, Terence 63 Rosetree Lane Lindenhurst, IL 60046 / US | 04 /
GOCZKOWSKI, Jakub Mynstersvej 17, 2 Sal. 1827 Frederiksberg C / DK | [2017/28] |
Former [2013/40] | 01 /
MARCH, Daniel 1706 Cherry Court Lake Villa, IL 60046 / US | ||
02 /
HANNAN, John, F. Carrowcarden County Sligo Enniscrone / IE | |||
03 /
KING, Terence 63 Rosetree Lane Lindenhurst, IL 60046 / US | |||
04 /
GOCZKOWSKI, Jakub Mynstersvej 17 2 Sal. DK-1827 Frederiksberg C / DK | Representative(s) | Høiberg P/S Adelgade 12 1304 Copenhagen K / DK | [2017/28] |
Former [2013/40] | Høiberg A/S St. Kongensgade 59 A 1264 Copenhagen K / DK | Application number, filing date | 11791404.4 | 22.11.2011 | [2017/28] | WO2011US61833 | Priority number, date | US20100416072P | 22.11.2010 Original published format: US 416072 P | US201113301395 | 21.11.2011 Original published format: US201113301395 | [2013/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012071406 | Date: | 31.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2642956 | Date: | 02.10.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.05.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2642956 | Date: | 12.07.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61F5/44, A61F5/445, F16K3/24 | [2017/02] | CPC: |
A61F5/4405 (EP,US);
A61F5/445 (EP,US);
F16K3/24 (US)
|
Former IPC [2013/40] | A61F5/44, F16K3/26, A61F5/445 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VENTIL FÜR STOMABEUTEL | [2013/40] | English: | VALVE FOR OSTOMY POUCH | [2013/40] | French: | VALVE POUR POCHE DE STOMIE | [2013/40] | Entry into regional phase | 12.06.2013 | National basic fee paid | 12.06.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.06.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.06.2013 | Examination requested [2013/40] | 31.01.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.04.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.09.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.11.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.01.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.05.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 30.05.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.05.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.04.2015 | Opposition(s) | 13.04.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 12.07.2017 | AT | 12.07.2017 | CY | 12.07.2017 | CZ | 12.07.2017 | EE | 12.07.2017 | ES | 12.07.2017 | FI | 12.07.2017 | HR | 12.07.2017 | IT | 12.07.2017 | LT | 12.07.2017 | LV | 12.07.2017 | MC | 12.07.2017 | MK | 12.07.2017 | PL | 12.07.2017 | PT | 12.07.2017 | RO | 12.07.2017 | RS | 12.07.2017 | SE | 12.07.2017 | SI | 12.07.2017 | SK | 12.07.2017 | SM | 12.07.2017 | TR | 12.07.2017 | BG | 12.10.2017 | NO | 12.10.2017 | GR | 13.10.2017 | IS | 12.11.2017 | LU | 22.11.2017 | MT | 22.11.2017 | BE | 30.11.2017 | CH | 30.11.2017 | LI | 30.11.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/27] | AT | 12.07.2017 | |
CY | 12.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 12.07.2017 | ||
EE | 12.07.2017 | ||
ES | 12.07.2017 | ||
FI | 12.07.2017 | ||
HR | 12.07.2017 | ||
IT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LV | 12.07.2017 | ||
MC | 12.07.2017 | ||
MK | 12.07.2017 | ||
PL | 12.07.2017 | ||
PT | 12.07.2017 | ||
RO | 12.07.2017 | ||
RS | 12.07.2017 | ||
SE | 12.07.2017 | ||
SI | 12.07.2017 | ||
SK | 12.07.2017 | ||
SM | 12.07.2017 | ||
TR | 12.07.2017 | ||
BG | 12.10.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
GR | 13.10.2017 | ||
IS | 12.11.2017 | ||
LU | 22.11.2017 | ||
MT | 22.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AT | 12.07.2017 | |
CY | 12.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 12.07.2017 | ||
EE | 12.07.2017 | ||
ES | 12.07.2017 | ||
FI | 12.07.2017 | ||
HR | 12.07.2017 | ||
IT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LV | 12.07.2017 | ||
MC | 12.07.2017 | ||
MK | 12.07.2017 | ||
PL | 12.07.2017 | ||
RO | 12.07.2017 | ||
RS | 12.07.2017 | ||
SE | 12.07.2017 | ||
SI | 12.07.2017 | ||
SK | 12.07.2017 | ||
SM | 12.07.2017 | ||
TR | 12.07.2017 | ||
BG | 12.10.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
GR | 13.10.2017 | ||
IS | 12.11.2017 | ||
LU | 22.11.2017 | ||
MT | 22.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AT | 12.07.2017 | |
CY | 12.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 12.07.2017 | ||
EE | 12.07.2017 | ||
ES | 12.07.2017 | ||
FI | 12.07.2017 | ||
HR | 12.07.2017 | ||
IT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LV | 12.07.2017 | ||
MC | 12.07.2017 | ||
MK | 12.07.2017 | ||
PL | 12.07.2017 | ||
RO | 12.07.2017 | ||
RS | 12.07.2017 | ||
SE | 12.07.2017 | ||
SI | 12.07.2017 | ||
SK | 12.07.2017 | ||
SM | 12.07.2017 | ||
BG | 12.10.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
GR | 13.10.2017 | ||
IS | 12.11.2017 | ||
LU | 22.11.2017 | ||
MT | 22.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AT | 12.07.2017 | |
CY | 12.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 12.07.2017 | ||
EE | 12.07.2017 | ||
ES | 12.07.2017 | ||
FI | 12.07.2017 | ||
HR | 12.07.2017 | ||
IT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LV | 12.07.2017 | ||
MC | 12.07.2017 | ||
PL | 12.07.2017 | ||
RO | 12.07.2017 | ||
RS | 12.07.2017 | ||
SE | 12.07.2017 | ||
SI | 12.07.2017 | ||
SK | 12.07.2017 | ||
SM | 12.07.2017 | ||
BG | 12.10.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
GR | 13.10.2017 | ||
IS | 12.11.2017 | ||
LU | 22.11.2017 | ||
MT | 22.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AT | 12.07.2017 | |
CZ | 12.07.2017 | ||
EE | 12.07.2017 | ||
ES | 12.07.2017 | ||
FI | 12.07.2017 | ||
HR | 12.07.2017 | ||
IT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LV | 12.07.2017 | ||
MC | 12.07.2017 | ||
PL | 12.07.2017 | ||
RO | 12.07.2017 | ||
RS | 12.07.2017 | ||
SE | 12.07.2017 | ||
SI | 12.07.2017 | ||
SK | 12.07.2017 | ||
SM | 12.07.2017 | ||
BG | 12.10.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
GR | 13.10.2017 | ||
IS | 12.11.2017 | ||
LU | 22.11.2017 | ||
MT | 22.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 12.07.2017 | |
CZ | 12.07.2017 | ||
EE | 12.07.2017 | ||
ES | 12.07.2017 | ||
FI | 12.07.2017 | ||
HR | 12.07.2017 | ||
IT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LV | 12.07.2017 | ||
MC | 12.07.2017 | ||
PL | 12.07.2017 | ||
RO | 12.07.2017 | ||
RS | 12.07.2017 | ||
SE | 12.07.2017 | ||
SI | 12.07.2017 | ||
SK | 12.07.2017 | ||
SM | 12.07.2017 | ||
BG | 12.10.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
GR | 13.10.2017 | ||
IS | 12.11.2017 | ||
LU | 22.11.2017 | ||
MT | 22.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 12.07.2017 | |
CZ | 12.07.2017 | ||
EE | 12.07.2017 | ||
ES | 12.07.2017 | ||
FI | 12.07.2017 | ||
HR | 12.07.2017 | ||
IT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LV | 12.07.2017 | ||
MC | 12.07.2017 | ||
PL | 12.07.2017 | ||
RO | 12.07.2017 | ||
RS | 12.07.2017 | ||
SE | 12.07.2017 | ||
SI | 12.07.2017 | ||
SK | 12.07.2017 | ||
SM | 12.07.2017 | ||
BG | 12.10.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
GR | 13.10.2017 | ||
IS | 12.11.2017 | ||
LU | 22.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/33] | AT | 12.07.2017 | |
CZ | 12.07.2017 | ||
EE | 12.07.2017 | ||
ES | 12.07.2017 | ||
FI | 12.07.2017 | ||
HR | 12.07.2017 | ||
IT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LV | 12.07.2017 | ||
MC | 12.07.2017 | ||
PL | 12.07.2017 | ||
RO | 12.07.2017 | ||
RS | 12.07.2017 | ||
SE | 12.07.2017 | ||
SK | 12.07.2017 | ||
SM | 12.07.2017 | ||
BG | 12.10.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
GR | 13.10.2017 | ||
IS | 12.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 12.07.2017 | |
CZ | 12.07.2017 | ||
EE | 12.07.2017 | ||
ES | 12.07.2017 | ||
FI | 12.07.2017 | ||
HR | 12.07.2017 | ||
IT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LV | 12.07.2017 | ||
PL | 12.07.2017 | ||
RO | 12.07.2017 | ||
RS | 12.07.2017 | ||
SE | 12.07.2017 | ||
SK | 12.07.2017 | ||
SM | 12.07.2017 | ||
BG | 12.10.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
GR | 13.10.2017 | ||
IS | 12.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 12.07.2017 | |
CZ | 12.07.2017 | ||
EE | 12.07.2017 | ||
ES | 12.07.2017 | ||
FI | 12.07.2017 | ||
HR | 12.07.2017 | ||
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LV | 12.07.2017 | ||
PL | 12.07.2017 | ||
RO | 12.07.2017 | ||
RS | 12.07.2017 | ||
SE | 12.07.2017 | ||
SK | 12.07.2017 | ||
BG | 12.10.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
GR | 13.10.2017 | ||
IS | 12.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 12.07.2017 | |
CZ | 12.07.2017 | ||
ES | 12.07.2017 | ||
FI | 12.07.2017 | ||
HR | 12.07.2017 | ||
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LV | 12.07.2017 | ||
PL | 12.07.2017 | ||
RS | 12.07.2017 | ||
SE | 12.07.2017 | ||
BG | 12.10.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
GR | 13.10.2017 | ||
IS | 12.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | AT | 12.07.2017 | |
ES | 12.07.2017 | ||
FI | 12.07.2017 | ||
HR | 12.07.2017 | ||
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LV | 12.07.2017 | ||
PL | 12.07.2017 | ||
RS | 12.07.2017 | ||
SE | 12.07.2017 | ||
BG | 12.10.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
GR | 13.10.2017 | ||
IS | 12.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 12.07.2017 | |
ES | 12.07.2017 | ||
FI | 12.07.2017 | ||
HR | 12.07.2017 | ||
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
PL | 12.07.2017 | ||
RS | 12.07.2017 | ||
SE | 12.07.2017 | ||
BG | 12.10.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
GR | 13.10.2017 | ||
IS | 12.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 12.07.2017 | |
FI | 12.07.2017 | ||
HR | 12.07.2017 | ||
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
RS | 12.07.2017 | ||
SE | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | FI | 12.07.2017 | |
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
SE | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 12.07.2017 | |
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 12.07.2017 | |
NO | 12.10.2017 | Cited in | International search | [XY]GB2125130 (HOLLISTER INC) [X] 1,8,10 * page 2, line 96 - page 4, line 83; figures 3-6 * [Y] 5; | [Y]EP0953322 (SQUIBB BRISTOL MYERS CO [US]) [Y] 5 * figure 1 *; | [A]GB2288865 (MEDIQUEST PRODUCTS LTD [GB]) [A] 1,11,22 * the whole document *; | [A]US5443453 (WALKER CLARENCE L [US], et al) [A] 2,11,22 * column 1, line 49 - column 2, line 34 *; | [A]US4238059 (CARAWAY WILLIAM R [US], et al) [A] 16,17 * figure 5 *; | [AP]WO2011091798 (MBH INTERNAT A S [DK], et al) [AP] 2,11,22 * page 12, line 18 - line 28 * | Examination | GB2202032 | by applicant | GB2125130 |