EP2509320 - CHANNEL SWITCHING METHOD, APPARATUS AND SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 11.12.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.2015 | Refusal of application | published on 13.01.2016 [2016/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2012/41] | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
QIU, Zhigang Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
GUO, Kai Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
YANG, Wenle Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 04 /
QIN, Xia Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 05 /
ZHENG, Hewen Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2012/41] | Representative(s) | Körber, Martin Hans, et al Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/41] | Körber, Martin Hans, et al Mitscherlich & Partner Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11791859.9 | 12.04.2011 | WO2011CN72648 | Priority number, date | CN20101200935 | 10.06.2010 Original published format: CN201010200935 | [2012/41] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011153868 | Date: | 15.12.2011 | Language: | ZH | [2011/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2509320 | Date: | 10.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 15.12.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/52, H04N7/173, H04L29/06, H04L12/56 | [2012/41] | CPC: |
H04N21/4384 (EP,US);
H04L65/612 (EP,US);
H04L65/70 (EP,US);
H04L65/80 (EP,US);
H04N21/222 (EP,US);
H04N21/23614 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/41] | Title | German: | KANALSCHALTVERFAHREN, -VORRICHTUNG UND -SYSTEM | [2012/41] | English: | CHANNEL SWITCHING METHOD, APPARATUS AND SYSTEM | [2012/41] | French: | PROCÉDÉ, APPAREIL ET SYSTÈME POUR LA COMMUTATION DE VOIES | [2012/41] | Entry into regional phase | 04.07.2012 | Translation filed | 04.07.2012 | National basic fee paid | 04.07.2012 | Search fee paid | 04.07.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.07.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.07.2012 | Examination requested [2012/41] | 19.09.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.03.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.07.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.05.2015 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2016/02] | 26.05.2015 | Date of oral proceedings | 28.08.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2016/02] | 28.08.2015 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.03.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2004160974 (READ CHRISTOPHER JENSEN [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2007011343 (DAVIS JEFFREY [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2007107026 (SHERER W P [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2008022320 (VER STEEG WILLIAM C [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2008156390 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [A]US2009148131 (AKGUL TANKUT [TR]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [X]US2010111108 (AKGUL TANKUT [TR], et al) [X] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [XP]US7769035 (BREAU JEREMY R [US], et al) [XP] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [XP]WO2010112591 (KONINKL KPN NV [NL], et al) [XP] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [X] - SIEBERT P ET AL, "Analysis and Improvements of Zapping Times in IPTV Systems", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON BROADCASTING, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20090601), vol. 55, no. 2, doi:10.1109/TBC.2008.2012019, ISSN 0018-9316, pages 407 - 418, XP011343473 [X] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TBC.2008.2012019 | [X] - BEJERANO Y ET AL, "Improving Zap Response Time for IPTV", INFOCOM 2009. THE 28TH CONFERENCE ON COMPUTER COMMUNICATIONS. IEEE, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20090419), ISBN 978-1-4244-3512-8, pages 1971 - 1979, XP031468958 [X] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [A]CN1960485 (ZTE CORP [CN]); | [A]US2008022320 (VER STEEG WILLIAM C [US]); | [A]CN101316357 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]); | [A]CN101690118 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M); | [XP]CN101854533 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) |