EP2581198 - SYSTEM FOR OPENING MOVABLE ELEMENTS IN MOULDS IN ORDER TO EXTRACT THE MOULDED PARTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.12.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.01.2016 [2016/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Irumold S.L. Poligono Industrial Landaben C/A, s/n 31012 Pamplona Navarra / ES | [2013/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANTOÑANA GASTESI, Francisco Javier Polígino Industrial Landaben C/A s/n E-31012 Pamplona Navarra / ES | 02 /
GALE ONECA, Felix Polígino Industrial Landaben C/A s/n E-31012 Pamplona Navarra / ES | 03 /
BERRO PREBOSTE, Jose Javier Polígino Industrial Landaben C/A s/n E-31012 Pamplona Navarra / ES | 04 /
LARUMBE SAN MARTIN, Luis Polígino Industrial Landaben C/A s/n E-31012 Pamplona Navarra / ES | [2013/16] | Application number, filing date | 11791961.3 | 06.05.2011 | WO2011ES00153 | Priority number, date | ES20100000775 | 11.06.2010 Original published format: ES 201000775 | [2013/16] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011154565 | Date: | 15.12.2011 | Language: | ES | [2011/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2581198 | Date: | 17.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | ES | 15.12.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.12.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B29C45/40, B29C45/26 | [2015/04] | CPC: |
B29C45/332 (EP,US);
B29C45/40 (ES);
B29C45/4005 (US);
B29C45/2614 (EP,US);
B29C45/44 (EP,US);
B29C2045/334 (EP,US);
B29L2031/246 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2013/16] | B29C45/40 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/16] | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUM ÖFFNEN BEWEGLICHER ELEMENTE IN FORMEN IN EINER REIHENFOLGE ZUR EXTRAKTION GEFORMTER TEILE | [2013/16] | English: | SYSTEM FOR OPENING MOVABLE ELEMENTS IN MOULDS IN ORDER TO EXTRACT THE MOULDED PARTS | [2013/16] | French: | SYSTÈME D'OUVERTURE D'ÉLÉMENTS MOBILES DANS DES MOULES PERMETTANT D'EXTRAIRE LES PIÈCES MOULÉES | [2013/16] | Entry into regional phase | 05.12.2012 | Translation filed | 05.12.2012 | National basic fee paid | 05.12.2012 | Search fee paid | 05.12.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.01.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.09.2011 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: ES | 10.01.2013 | Examination requested [2013/16] | 23.07.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/02] | 28.08.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2015 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US1967796 (PAUL WEISS); | [X]US2002122841 (JOSEPH EALIAS C [CA]); | [XI]JP2003205534 (KASAI KOGYO KK); | [XI]EP1386716 (ROMAGNANI STAMPI S R L [IT]); | [XI]US2008089965 (LIU ZG [CN], et al) | International search | [A]US6190585 (BROWN PAUL PHILIP [US], et al); | [A]US2010040720 (NAKAGAWA YUUSUKE [JP], et al) |