12.10.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] |
20.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] |
29.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.08.2018 [2018/31] |
13.10.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] |
01.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.10.2017 [2017/40] |
25.08.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.09.2017 [2017/39] |
18.08.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.09.2017 [2017/38] |
16.12.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.01.2017 [2017/03] |
20.05.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.06.2016 [2016/25] |
06.05.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.06.2016 [2016/23] |
29.04.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.06.2016 [2016/22] |
15.04.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.05.2016 [2016/20] |
19.02.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.03.2016 [2016/12] |
12.02.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.03.2016 [2016/11] |
29.01.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.03.2016 [2016/09] |
18.12.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.01.2016 [2016/03] |
27.11.2015 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 30.12.2015 [2015/53] |
06.11.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.12.2015 [2015/50] |
04.11.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.12.2015 [2015/49] |
21.08.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.09.2015 [2015/39] |
14.08.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.09.2015 [2015/38] |
07.08.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.09.2015 [2015/37] |
31.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.09.2015 [2015/36] |
24.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.08.2015 [2015/35] |
10.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.08.2015 [2015/33] |
02.01.2015 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 21.01.2015 [2015/04] |
16.12.2014 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
16.12.2014 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
12.12.2014 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
12.12.2014 |
Change - inventor |
|
05.08.2014 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
12.06.2014 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
08.04.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.12.2013 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 15.01.2014 [2014/03] |
13.12.2013 |
Change - classification |
published on 15.01.2014 [2014/03] |
13.12.2013 |
Change - classification |
published on 15.01.2014 [2014/03] |
09.08.2013 |
Change - extension states |
published on 11.09.2013 [2013/37] |
04.07.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.02.2013 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 13.03.2013 [2013/11] |
08.02.2013 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 13.03.2013 [2013/11] |
04.01.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.12.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.11.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.12.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.12.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|