Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8758901 | Global Dossier | 24.06.2014 | B2 | US2013078031 | 28.03.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2010130415 | 07.06.2010 | WO2011JP63425 | 06.06.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101211284B | Global Dossier | 11.12.2012 | B1 | KR20120099534 | 10.09.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2010130415 | 07.06.2010 | WO2011JP63425 | 06.06.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPWO2011155620 | Global Dossier | 15.08.2013 | A1 | JP4903918B | 28.03.2012 | B1 | Priority number | Date | JP2010130415 | 07.06.2010 | JP2011544529 | 06.06.2011 | WO2011JP63425 | 06.06.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102753300B | Global Dossier | 30.04.2014 | B | CN102753300 | 24.10.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2010130415 | 07.06.2010 | WO2011JP63425 | 06.06.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2567776 | Global Dossier | 21.01.2015 | B1 | EP2567776 | 15.01.2014 | A4 | EP2567776 | 13.03.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2010130415 | 07.06.2010 | WO2011JP63425 | 06.06.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2011155620 | Global Dossier | 15.12.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2010130415 | 07.06.2010 |