Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2013071452 | ![]() | 21.03.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20100055549 | 11.06.2010 | WO2011KR04271 | 10.06.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5852105B | ![]() | 03.02.2016 | B2 | JP2013531648 | 08.08.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20100055549 | 11.06.2010 | WO2011KR04271 | 10.06.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL223543 | ![]() | 28.02.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20100055549 | 11.06.2010 | WO2011KR04271 | 10.06.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102933573B | ![]() | 24.12.2014 | B | CN102933573 | 13.02.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20100055549 | 11.06.2010 | WO2011KR04271 | 10.06.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3012771 | ![]() | 12.10.2021 | C | CA3012771 | 15.12.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CA2801631 | 10.06.2011 | KR20100055549 | 11.06.2010 | WO2011KR04271 | 10.06.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2801631 | ![]() | 04.09.2018 | C | CA2801631 | 15.12.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20100055549 | 11.06.2010 | WO2011KR04271 | 10.06.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2011262662B | ![]() | 25.06.2015 | B2 | AU2011262662 | 31.01.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20100055549 | 11.06.2010 | WO2011KR04271 | 10.06.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2580206 | ![]() | 23.09.2015 | B1 | EP2580206 | 22.01.2014 | A4 | EP2580206 | 17.04.2013 | A2 | Priority number | Date | KR20100055549 | 11.06.2010 | WO2011KR04271 | 10.06.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112012031510 | 22.06.2021 | B1 | BR112012031510 | 08.11.2016 | A2 | Priority number | Date | KR20100055549 | 11.06.2010 | WO2011KR04271 | 10.06.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3127906 | 15.12.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20100055549 | 11.06.2010 | WO2011KR04271 | 10.06.2011 | CA3012771 | 10.06.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK2580206T | 11.01.2016 | T3 | Priority number | Date | KR20100055549 | 11.06.2010 | WO2011KR04271 | 10.06.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2556457T | 18.01.2016 | T3 | Priority number | Date | KR20100055549 | 11.06.2010 | WO2011KR04271 | 10.06.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1181389 | 08.11.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20100055549 | 11.06.2010 | WO2011KR04271 | 10.06.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | MA34368 | 03.07.2013 | B1 | Priority number | Date | KR20100055549 | 11.06.2010 | WO2011KR04271 | 10.06.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2012014440 | 26.02.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20100055549 | 11.06.2010 | WO2011KR04271 | 10.06.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ605601 | 28.11.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20100055549 | 11.06.2010 | WO2011KR04271 | 10.06.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PH12012502445 | 11.02.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20100055549 | 11.06.2010 | WO2011KR04271 | 10.06.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL2580206T | 31.03.2016 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP11792704 | 10.06.2011 | KR20100055549 | 11.06.2010 | WO2011KR04271 | 10.06.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2013100943 | 20.07.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20100055549 | 11.06.2010 | WO2011KR04271 | 10.06.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG185661 | 28.12.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20100055549 | 11.06.2010 | WO2011KR04271 | 10.06.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | UA109281 | 10.08.2015 | C2 | Priority number | Date | KR20100055549 | 11.06.2010 | WO2011KR04271 | 10.06.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA201300241 | 26.03.2014 | B | Priority number | Date | KR20100055549 | 11.06.2010 | WO2011KR04271 | 10.06.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2011155793 | ![]() | 26.04.2012 | A3 | WO2011155793 | 15.12.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | KR20100055549 | 11.06.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101217526B | ![]() | 02.01.2013 | B1 | KR20110135685 | 19.12.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20100055549 | 11.06.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AR081870 | 24.10.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20100055549 | 11.06.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CL2012003487 | 22.02.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20100055549 | 11.06.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CO6620015 | 15.02.2013 | A2 | Priority number | Date | KR20100055549 | 11.06.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | MY164015 | 15.11.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20100055549 | 11.06.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PE20130236 | 18.03.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20100055549 | 11.06.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI424995B | 01.02.2014 | B | TW201204711 | 01.02.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20100055549 | 11.06.2010 |