EP2580675 - SMARTPHONE MANAGEMENT SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.05.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.05.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.06.2016 [2016/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fidelithon Systems, LLC 111 North Market Street, Suite 300 San Jose, California 95113 / US | [2013/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REED, Robert F. 420 Reem Court El Dorado Hills California 95762 / US | 02 /
ALLAN, Kevin R. 728 North Fourth Streert San Jose California 95112 / US | [2013/16] | Representative(s) | Platzöder, Michael Christian Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Tostmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Zweibrückenstrasse 5-7 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/16] | Horner, David Richard D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 11792952.1 | 06.06.2011 | WO2011US39266 | Priority number, date | US201113151603 | 02.06.2011 Original published format: US201113151603 | US20100353769P | 11.06.2010 Original published format: US 353769 P | [2013/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011156270 | Date: | 15.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/50] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2580675 | Date: | 17.04.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.12.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 05.04.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.12.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G06F15/16, G06F21/30, G06F12/16 | [2014/03] | CPC: |
G06F11/1461 (EP,US);
G06F11/1464 (EP,US);
H04L67/04 (EP,US);
H04L67/1097 (EP,US);
G06F11/1469 (EP,US);
H04L67/06 (EP,US);
H04L67/1095 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2013/16] | G06F15/16, G06F21/20, G06F12/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/16] | Title | German: | SMARTPHONE-MANAGEMENTSYSTEM UND -VERFAHREN | [2013/16] | English: | SMARTPHONE MANAGEMENT SYSTEM AND METHOD | [2013/16] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE GESTION DE TÉLÉPHONE INTELLIGENT | [2013/16] | Entry into regional phase | 10.12.2012 | National basic fee paid | 10.12.2012 | Search fee paid | 10.12.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.12.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.12.2012 | Examination requested [2013/16] | 09.07.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/23] | 28.01.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2015 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP1760593 (SOFTBANK BB CORP [JP]) [X] 1,4,9-12,14,15 * column 1, line 1 - column 6, line 44 * [I] 2,3,5-8,13; | [I]US2006111083 (GOSS DENNIS E [US]) [I] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [I]WO2009055174 (IBM [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [I]US2005191998 (ONYON RICHARD M [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0053] , [0 55] , [0 57] , [0 58]; figures 1,2,9-12 * | International search | [Y]US2004224665 (KOKUBO TAKESHI [JP]); | [Y]US2009088142 (BARIBAULT GREGORY [US], et al); | [A]US2003182301 (PATTERSON HUGO [US], et al); | [A]US2009292710 (CASEY STEVEN M [US]) | by applicant | EP1760593 |