EP2665766 - POLYMETHACRYLIMIDE FOAMS HAVING A LOWER RESIDUAL MONOMER CONTENT, AND METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.07.2015 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.08.2015 [2015/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Evonik Röhm GmbH Kirschenallee 45 64293 Darmstadt / DE | [2013/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERNHARD, Kay Erzhäuserstrasse 41 64291 Darmstadt / DE | 02 /
HEMPLER, Mathias Raiffeisenstrasse 14 63579 Freigericht / DE | 03 /
PLASS, Stefan Humboldtweg 8 64297 Darmstadt / DE | 04 /
GEYER, Werner Am Steinerts 10 64395 Brensbach / DE | 05 /
BARTHEL, Thomas Kleine Bach 24 64646 Heppenheim / DE | [2013/48] | Application number, filing date | 11793820.9 | 13.12.2011 | WO2011EP72540 | Priority number, date | DE20111002905 | 20.01.2011 Original published format: DE102011002905 | [2013/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012097921 | Date: | 26.07.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/30] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2665766 | Date: | 27.11.2013 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.07.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C08J9/10, C08J9/14, C08F4/04, C08F4/38 | [2013/48] | CPC: |
C08F4/38 (EP,US);
C08J9/04 (US);
C08J9/10 (EP,US);
C08J9/142 (EP,US);
C08J2203/12 (EP,US);
C08J2333/02 (EP,US);
C08J2333/24 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/48] | Title | German: | POLYMETHACRYLIMID-SCHAUMSTOFFE MIT REDUZIERTEM GEHALT AN RESTMONOMEREN, SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG | [2013/48] | English: | POLYMETHACRYLIMIDE FOAMS HAVING A LOWER RESIDUAL MONOMER CONTENT, AND METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF | [2013/48] | French: | MOUSSES DE POLYMÉTHACRYLIMIDE AYANT UNE TENEUR RÉDUITE EN MONOMÈRES RÉSIDUELS ET PROCÉDÉ POUR LEUR PRÉPARATION | [2013/48] | Entry into regional phase | 26.06.2013 | National basic fee paid | 26.06.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.06.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.06.2013 | Examination requested [2013/48] | 23.10.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.11.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.03.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/35] | 23.04.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/35] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.11.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2014 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]EP0874019 (ROEHM GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,3,5,7-9,13 * page 3, line 24 - page 5, line 55 * * examples 1-4 * [I] 2,4,6,14,15; | [XDI]DE19917987 (ROEHM GMBH [DE]) [XD] 1-6,8,10-13,15 * the whole document * [I] 7,9,14; | [XI]DE10212235 (ROEHM GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,3-6,8-15 * paragraphs [0020] - [0027] - [0 30] , [0 33] , [0 37] , [0 48] * * paragraphs [0049] - [0055]; examples 1-3 *[I] 2,7 | by applicant | DE1817156 | DE2804533 | EP0356714 | EP1175458 | CN100420702C |