EP2648518 - PYRAZOLE COMPOUNDS FOR CONTROLLING INVERTEBRATE PESTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.09.2016 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.09.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.10.2016 [2016/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/42] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SÖRGEL, Sebastian Marienstr. 19 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | 02 /
DEFIEBER, Christian Tullastr. 13 68165 Mannheim / DE | 03 /
LE VEZOUET, Ronan Neckarpromenade 20 68167 Mannheim / DE | 04 /
SÄLINGER, Daniel Ludwigstrasse 49 67059 Ludwigshafen / DE | 05 /
GROss, Steffen Marie-Juchacz-Allee 201 67067 Ludwigshafen / DE | 06 /
KÖRBER, Karsten Hintere Lisgewann 26 69214 Eppelheim / DE | 07 /
CULBERTSON, Deborah L. 6400 Vintage Ridge Lane Fuquay Varina, North Carolina 27526 / US | 08 /
ANSPAUGH, Douglas D. 4007 Winecott Drive Apex, North Carolina 27502 / US | 09 /
GUNJIMA, Koshi 322 Luke Meadow Lane NC Cary, North Carolina 27519 / US | [2013/42] | Representative(s) | Reitstötter Kinzebach Patentanwälte Im Zollhof 1 67061 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/42] | Reitstötter - Kinzebach Patentanwälte Ludwigsplatz 4 67059 Ludwigshafen / DE | Application number, filing date | 11794162.5 | 09.12.2011 | WO2011EP72363 | Priority number, date | US20100421666P | 10.12.2010 Original published format: US 421666 P | [2013/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012076704 | Date: | 14.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/24] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2648518 | Date: | 16.10.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.06.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.08.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A01N43/54, A01N43/56, A01N43/653, A01N43/76, A01N43/78, C07D401/04, C07D401/14, C07D413/14, C07D417/14, A01N43/824, A01N43/82, A01P5/00, A01P7/00 | [2013/42] | CPC: |
A01N43/82 (EP,US);
A01N43/54 (EP,US);
A01N43/56 (EP,US);
A01N43/653 (EP,US);
A01N43/76 (EP,US);
A01N43/78 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/42] | Title | German: | PYRIDAZOLVERBINDUNGEN ZUR BEKÄMPFUNG VON WIRBELLOSEN SCHÄDLINGEN | [2013/42] | English: | PYRAZOLE COMPOUNDS FOR CONTROLLING INVERTEBRATE PESTS | [2013/42] | French: | COMPOSÉS DE PYRAZOLE POUR LA LUTTE CONTRE DES ANIMAUX NUISIBLES INVERTÉBRÉS | [2013/42] | Entry into regional phase | 10.07.2013 | National basic fee paid | 10.07.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.07.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.07.2013 | Examination requested [2013/42] | 18.02.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.12.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.04.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/42] | 20.05.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/42] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.12.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2015 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2010006713 (BAYER CROPSCIENCE AG [DE], et al) [X] 1-4,11-13,15-18,20-27 * examples 160, 162 * * pages 163 and 165 *; | [XD]DE102008000872 (BASF SE [DE]) [XD] 1,27 * see tables 172 to 203 in combination with A-475 to A-477 * | by applicant | WO2004089303 | WO2006028029 | DE102008000872 | WO2009149188 | WO2006114400 | EP0431421 | EP0480258 | WO02094765 | WO02070483 | WO02094791 | WO2009077197 | WO2005073165 | WO2006137376 | WO2006137395 | WO2008000438 | WO2008031534 | WO2008074427 | WO2008075454 | WO2009049844 | WO2009080203 | WO2009027393 | WO2010034737 | WO2010034738 | US6222100 | WO0182685 | WO0026390 | WO9741218 | WO9802526 | WO9802527 | WO2004106529 | WO2005020673 | WO03014357 | WO03013225 | WO03014356 | WO2004016073 | WO9200377 | EP0242236 | EP0242246 | US5559024 | WO0215701 | EP0374753 | WO9307278 | WO9534656 | EP0427529 | EP0451878 | WO03018810 | WO03052073 | EP0392225 | US3060084 | EP0707445 | WO9113546 | US4172714 | US4144050 | US3920442 | US5180587 | US5232701 | US5208030 | GB2095558 | US3299566 | WO03086075 | US4822779 | US6300348 | WO2009126668 | WO2009051956 | WO2008072743 | WO2008072783 | WO2007043677 | WO2007101540 | JP2006131529 | WO2007060839 | WO2005085216 | WO2007079162 | WO2007026965 | WO2007115644 | WO2008066153 | WO2008108491 | JP2008115155 | WO02089579 | WO02090320 | WO02090321 | WO2004006677 | WO2005068423 | WO2005068432 | WO2005063694 | - I. M. EI-DEEB ET AL., BIOORG. MED. CHEM. LETT., (2009), vol. 19, pages 5622 - 5626 | - BIOTECHNOL PROG., (200107), vol. 17, no. 4, pages 720 - 8 | - PROTEIN ENG DES SEL., (200401), vol. 17, no. 1, pages 57 - 66 | - NAT. PROTOC., (2007), vol. 2, no. 5, pages 1225 - 35 | - CURR. OPIN. CHEM. BIOL., (200610), vol. 10, no. 5, pages 487 - 91 | - BIOMATERIALS, (200103), vol. 22, no. 5, pages 405 - 17 | - BIOCONJUG. CHEM., (200501), vol. 16, no. 1, pages 113 - 21 | - J.-P. CORBET ET AL., CHEM. REV., (2006), vol. 106, page 2651 | - J. MORGAN ET AL., J. CHEM. SOC., PERKIN TRANS. 1, (1990), page 715 | - M. SKOWRONSKA ET AL., J. ORG. CHEM., (1988), vol. 53, page 5484 | - "Agglomeration", BROWNING, Chemical Engineering, (19671204), pages 147 - 48 | - Perry's Chemical Engineer's Handbook, MCGRAW-HILL, (1963), pages 8 - 57 | - Farm Chemicals Handbook, MEISTER PUBLISHING COMPANY, (2001), vol. 88 | - PESTICIDE SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 54, pages 237 - 243 |