EP2646112 - APPARATUS FOR REMODELING/PROFILING A TISSUE LUMEN, PARTICULARLY IN THE URETHRAL LUMEN IN THE PROSTATE GLAND [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2013/41] | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR REMODELING/PROFILING A TISSUE LUMEN, PARTICULARLY IN THE URETHRAL LUMEN IN THE PROSTATE GLAND | ||
[2015/09] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.05.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.05.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.06.2016 [2016/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Enable Urology, LLC 7778 Bennington Drive Cincinnati, OH 45211 / US | [2013/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOOVEN, Michael, D. 7778 Bennington Drive Cincinnati, OH 45241 / US | [2013/41] | Representative(s) | Geary, Stephen Bawden & Associates 4 The Gatehouse 2 High Street Harpenden, Herts AL5 2TH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/41] | Geary, Stephen Bawden & Associates 4 The Gatehouse 2 High Street Harpenden, Herts AL5 2TH / GB | Application number, filing date | 11794347.2 | 30.11.2011 | WO2011US62586 | Priority number, date | US20100418476P | 01.12.2010 Original published format: US 418476 P | [2013/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012075112 | Date: | 07.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2646112 | Date: | 09.10.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.06.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61B18/14, // A61M25/04, A61B17/00, A61B18/00, A61N1/40 | [2015/35] | CPC: |
A61B18/1492 (EP,US);
A61B18/14 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00026 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00199 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00274 (EP,US);
A61B2018/0016 (EP,US);
A61B2018/0022 (US);
A61B2018/00232 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00267 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00285 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00517 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00547 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00827 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00875 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00892 (EP,US);
A61B2018/1435 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3317 (EP,US);
A61M2210/166 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2013/41] | A61N1/40, A61B18/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/41] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR UMMODELLIERUNG/PROFILIERUNG EINES GEWEBELUMENS, INSBESONDERE IM URETHRALEN LUMEN DER PROSTATADRÜSE | [2015/09] | English: | APPARATUS FOR REMODELING/PROFILING A TISSUE LUMEN, PARTICULARLY IN THE URETHRAL LUMEN IN THE PROSTATE GLAND | [2015/09] | French: | APPAREIL POUR LE REMODELAGE/PROFILAGE D'UNE LUMIÈRE DE TISSU, EN PARTICULIER DANS LA LUMIÈRE URÉTRALE DE LA GLANDE PROSTATIQUE | [2015/09] |
Former [2013/41] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR UMMODELLIERUNG/PROFILIERUNG EINES GEWEBELUMENS, INSBESONDERE IM URETHRALEN LUMEN DER PROSTATADRÜSE | ||
Former [2013/41] | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR REMODELING/PROFILING A TISSUE LUMEN, PARTICULARLY IN THE URETHRAL LUMEN IN THE PROSTATE GLAND | ||
Former [2013/41] | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR LE REMODELAGE/PROFILAGE D'UNE LUMIÈRE DE TISSU, EN PARTICULIER DANS LA LUMIÈRE URÉTRALE DE LA GLANDE PROSTATIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 17.06.2013 | National basic fee paid | 17.06.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.06.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.06.2013 | Examination requested [2013/41] | 10.02.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.05.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.11.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.12.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.07.2015 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 07.08.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.12.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/23] | 25.01.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2016/23] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.05.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2015 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2009036468 (LAZURE TECHNOLOGIES LLC [US], et al) [X] 1-29,47-57 * abstract * * paragraphs [0040] - [0042] - [0057] , [0073] *; | [X]WO0180723 (CURON MEDICAL INC [US]) [X] 1-29,47-57 * abstract * * page 5, paragraph l - page 6, paragraph 2 * * page 11, paragraph 2 * * page 22, paragraph 2 * | Examination | WO2007014063 | by applicant | US5992419 | US5330518 | US5509929 | US5234004 | US6638275 |