EP2646864 - FIELD-INSTALLABLE FIBER OPTIC CONNECTORS AND RELATED CABLE ASSEMBLIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.01.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.01.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.02.2017 [2017/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Corning Cable Systems LLC 800 17th Street NW Hickory, NC 28602 / US | [2013/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ISENHOUR, Micah C 1008 Park Circle Lincolnton North Carolina 28092 / US | 02 /
KNECHT, Dennis M 4921 Elmhurst Drive Hickory North Carolina 28601 / US | 03 /
LUTHER, James P 2471 Rolling Ridge Drive Hickory North Carolina 28602 / US | [2013/41] | Representative(s) | Sturm, Christoph Quermann - Sturm - Weilnau Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Unter den Eichen 5 65195 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/41] | Sturm, Christoph Quermann Sturm Weilnau Patentanwälte Unter den Eichen 7 65195 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 11794900.8 | 29.11.2011 | WO2011US62368 | Priority number, date | US20100418160P | 30.11.2010 Original published format: US 418160 P | [2013/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012074990 | Date: | 07.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/23] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2646864 | Date: | 09.10.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.06.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/38 | [2013/41] | CPC: |
G02B6/3887 (EP,US);
G02B6/241 (US);
G02B6/32 (US);
G02B6/3817 (EP,US);
G02B6/3846 (EP,US);
G02B6/3885 (EP,US);
G02B6/3897 (EP,US);
H01R13/73 (US);
H01R24/62 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/41] | Title | German: | AM EINSATZORT INSTALLIERBARER FASEROPTISCHER STECKVERBINDER UND ZUGEHÖRIGE KABELANORDNUNGEN | [2013/41] | English: | FIELD-INSTALLABLE FIBER OPTIC CONNECTORS AND RELATED CABLE ASSEMBLIES | [2013/41] | French: | CONNECTEURS DE FIBRES OPTIQUES POUVANT ÊTRE INSTALLÉS SUR LE TERRAIN ET ENSEMBLES DE CÂBLES ASSOCIÉS | [2013/41] | Entry into regional phase | 24.06.2013 | National basic fee paid | 24.06.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.06.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.06.2013 | Examination requested [2013/41] | 20.01.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.05.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.09.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/08] | 19.10.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/08] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.05.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2016 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]EP0070098 (TRW INC [US]) [X] 1,2,9,12,13,15,17 * pages 8-29; figures 1-19 * [I] 3,4,6-8,10,11,14,18,19; | [I]EP0517346 (AMP INC [US]) [I] 1,2,6,9,11,12,15,17 * the whole document *; | [XI]US5242315 (O'DEA JOHN [US]) [X] 1,2,9,12,15,17 * the whole document * [I] 3,4,6-8,10,11,14,19; | [Y]WO0075704 (RAYCHEM SA NV [BE], et al) [Y] 1-6,8,9,11,12,17,18 * pages 6,7 *; | [A]US6293708 (OHTSUKA KENICHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-19 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2009030982 (MOLEX INC [US], et al) [A] 9-19* pages 11-21; figures 4-7,12 *; | [A]WO2009152303 (MOLEX INC [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2010290745 (LIAO CHI-NAN [TW], et al) [Y] 1-6,8,9,11,12,17,18 * the whole document * | Examination | WO2008108582 | US2010046891 |