EP2582268 - GARMENT HANGER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.10.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.11.2015 [2015/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hickson Hangers Pty Ltd 21 Cook Road Mitcha, VIC 3132 / AU | [2013/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HICKEY, Teresa 1 Orchid Court Park Orchards VIC 3114 / AU | 02 /
HICKEY, Brendan 1 Orchid Court Park Orchards VIC 3114 / AU | 03 /
PATTISON, Craig 1 Orchid Court Park Orchards VIC 3114 / AU | 04 /
PATTISON, Donna 1 Orchid Court Park Orchards VIC 3114 / AU | [2013/17] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/17] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11794956.0 | 17.06.2011 | WO2011AU00728 | Priority number, date | AU20100902663 | 18.06.2010 Original published format: AU 2010902663 | [2013/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011156863 | Date: | 22.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2582268 | Date: | 24.04.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.12.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 22.12.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A47G25/18 | [2013/45] | CPC: |
A47G25/18 (EP,US);
A47G25/183 (US);
A47G2025/1492 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/17] | A47G25/14, A47F7/19, A47F5/00, A47G25/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/17] | Title | German: | KLEIDERBÜGEL | [2013/17] | English: | GARMENT HANGER | [2013/17] | French: | CINTRE POUR VÊTEMENTS | [2013/17] | Entry into regional phase | 18.01.2013 | National basic fee paid | 18.01.2013 | Search fee paid | 18.01.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.01.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.01.2013 | Examination requested [2013/17] | 08.07.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.12.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.04.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/45] | 05.06.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2015/45] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.12.2014 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application | 08.07.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 08.07.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.07.2014 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 08.07.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 08.07.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.07.2014 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2015 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US1421709 (NELSON FRANK C) [Y] 5,14 * page 2, line 32 - line 40; figures 2,3 *; | [XY]GB740306 (ANNETTE SYLVIA STANLEY) [X] 1-4,6-9,13,15 * the whole document * [Y] 5,14; | [X]JP3126127U (MARUZEN ACE INC. CO.) [X] 1,2,4,7,8,10,12,13 * figure - *; | [X]CA2529691 (KING PAUL [CA]) [X] 1,2,4-6,8,10* figure 1A *; | [X]WO2009131394 (KIM YOUNG CHOUL [KR]) [X] 1,2,4,6-8,10-13,15 * figures 2, 3 * | International search | [X]US3054538 (RUBIN MORRIS M, et al); | [X]US2010051655 (GOULDSON STANLEY F [US]); | [X]CN201480997U (YUESHENG LU) |