EP2583730 - SPLICING TOY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 22.01.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.01.2016 | Withdrawal of application | published on 24.02.2016 [2016/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wang, Xiaoyong No.282 Changban Yuban Village Huian Quanzhou, Fujian 362122 / CN | For all designated states Lin, Hualong Room 601 No.29 Xinghua Road Siming Xiamen, Fujian 361000 / CN | [2013/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2013/17] | Representative(s) | Verscht, Thomas Kurt Albert Josephsburgstrasse 88 A 81673 München / DE | [2013/17] | Application number, filing date | 11795027.9 | 05.01.2011 | WO2011CN70033 | Priority number, date | CN20102229328U | 18.06.2010 Original published format: CN 201020229328 U | [2013/17] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011157061 | Date: | 22.12.2011 | Language: | ZH | [2011/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2583730 | Date: | 24.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 22.12.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.11.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A63H33/06 | [2013/49] | CPC: |
A63H33/062 (EP,US);
A63H33/06 (US);
A63H33/067 (US);
A63H33/08 (US)
|
Former IPC [2013/17] | A63H33/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/17] | Title | German: | SPLEISSWERKZEUG | [2013/17] | English: | SPLICING TOY | [2013/17] | French: | JOUET D'ASSEMBLAGE | [2013/17] | Entry into regional phase | 18.01.2013 | Translation filed | 18.01.2013 | National basic fee paid | 18.01.2013 | Search fee paid | 18.01.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.01.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.01.2013 | Examination requested [2013/17] | 02.06.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.01.2016 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2016/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US6264522 (DICKSON MARILYN M [US]) [X] 1,6,11 * column 5, line 56 - column 9, line 62; figure - *[I] 2-5,7-10,12-14; | [XI]US2005197039 (BENTLEY CHARLES W JR [US]) [X] 1-3,6,7,11,12,14 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0039]; figure - * [I] 4,5,8-10,13; | [XI]WO2008100417 (INFINITOY INC [US], et al) [X] 1,11 * page 3, line 12 - page 8, line 8; figure - * [I] 2-10,12-14 | International search | [X]CN86203319U (GAO, DAIJIE); | [X]CN2075097U (DAI MINGHENG [CN]); | [X]CN2221433Y (UNIV NANJING [CN]); | [X]US6264522 (DICKSON MARILYN M [US]); | [X]JP2004222858 (TOMY CO LTD); | [X]US2007077854 (JEON DONG-IN [KR], et al); | [X]CN101068607 (BLD ORIENTAL LTD [JP]) |