EP2581970 - POWDER FOR LITHIUM ION SECONDARY BATTERY NEGATIVE ELECTRODE MATERIAL, LITHIUM ION SECONDARY BATTERY NEGATIVE ELECTRODE, CAPACITOR NEGATIVE ELECTRODE, LITHIUM ION SECONDARY BATTERY, AND CAPACITOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 04.04.2014 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.04.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 07.05.2014 [2014/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OSAKA Titanium Technologies Co., Ltd. 1, Higashihama-cho Amagasaki-shi, Hyogo 660-8533 / JP | [2013/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YASUDA, Kouji c/o OSAKA Titanium technologies Co. Ltd. 1 Higashihama-cho Amagasaki-shi Hyogo 660-8533 / JP | 02 /
KIZAKI, Shingo c/o OSAKA Titanium technologies Co. Ltd. 1 Higashihama-cho Amagasaki-shi Hyogo 660-8533 / JP | 03 /
SHIMOSAKI, Shinji c/o OSAKA Titanium technologies Co. Ltd. 1 Higashihama-cho Amagasaki-shi Hyogo 660-8533 / JP | [2013/16] | Representative(s) | Simons, Amanda Louise J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [2013/16] | Application number, filing date | 11795367.9 | 03.06.2011 | WO2011JP03141 | Priority number, date | JP20100135395 | 14.06.2010 Original published format: JP 2010135395 | [2013/16] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011158459 | Date: | 22.12.2011 | Language: | JA | [2011/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2581970 | Date: | 17.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.12.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/131, H01M10/052, H01M4/134, H01M4/1391, H01M4/1395, H01M4/36, H01G9/04, H01G11/06, H01G11/42, H01G11/50 | [2014/09] | CPC: |
H01M4/134 (EP,US);
H01M4/36 (EP,KR,US);
H01G11/06 (EP,US);
H01G11/42 (EP,US);
H01G11/50 (EP,US);
H01M10/052 (EP,US);
H01M10/0525 (KR);
H01M4/131 (EP,US);
H01M4/1391 (EP,US);
H01M4/38 (US);
H01M4/48 (KR);
H01M4/1395 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2013/16] | H01M4/48, H01G9/058, H01M4/36 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/16] | Title | German: | PULVER FÜR EIN NEGATIVELEKTRODENMATERIAL FÜR EINE LITHIUMIONEN-SEKUNDÄRBATTERIE, NEGATIVELEKTRODE FÜR EINE LITHIUMIONEN-SEKUNDÄRBATTERIE, NEGATIVELEKTRODE FÜR EINEN KONDENSATOR, LITHIUMIONEN-SEKUNDÄRBATTERIE UND KONDENSATOR | [2013/16] | English: | POWDER FOR LITHIUM ION SECONDARY BATTERY NEGATIVE ELECTRODE MATERIAL, LITHIUM ION SECONDARY BATTERY NEGATIVE ELECTRODE, CAPACITOR NEGATIVE ELECTRODE, LITHIUM ION SECONDARY BATTERY, AND CAPACITOR | [2013/16] | French: | POUDRE POUR MATÉRIAU D'ÉLECTRODE NÉGATIVE DE BATTERIE RECHARGEABLE AU LITHIUM-ION, ÉLECTRODE NÉGATIVE DE BATTERIE RECHARGEABLE AU LITHIUM-ION, ÉLECTRODE NÉGATIVE DE CONDENSATEUR, BATTERIE RECHARGEABLE AU LITHIUM-ION ET CONDENSATEUR | [2013/16] | Entry into regional phase | 14.12.2012 | Translation filed | 14.12.2012 | National basic fee paid | 14.12.2012 | Search fee paid | 14.12.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.12.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.11.2011 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 14.12.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.12.2012 | Examination requested [2013/16] | 27.03.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2004063433 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0001] , [0007] , [0008] , [0014] - [0016] - [0018] , [0 33] , [0041]; claims 1,4,9 *; | [X]US2009311606 (FUKUOKA HIROFUMI [JP], et al) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0002] , [0 30] , [0 32] , [0 35] - [0037]; claims 4, 5, 6 *; | [A]US2006068287 (MORITA TOMOKAZU [JP], et al) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0003] , [0 36] - [0039] *; | [T]EP2610949 (OSAKA TITANIUM TECHNOLOGIES CO [JP]) [T] * paragraphs [0001] , [0 69] - [0073] *; | [T]EP2618407 (OSAKA TITANIUM TECHNOLOGIES CO [JP]) [T] * paragraphs [0001] , [0 85] - [0087] *; | [T]EP2372816 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [T] * paragraphs [0001] , [0019] , [0 20] , [0 44] , [0 55] * | International search | [X]JP2004063433 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO); | [Y]JP2010040231 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO); | [A]JP2008198610 (SAMSUNG SDI CO LTD); | [A]JP2007329001 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [A]JP2006244984 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [A]JP2005149957 (JAPAN STORAGE BATTERY CO LTD) | by applicant | JP3952180B |