10.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] |
26.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] |
05.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.07.2020 [2020/28] |
13.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.04.2020 [2020/16] |
17.01.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.02.2020 [2020/08] |
15.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51] |
24.05.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.06.2019 [2019/26] |
22.03.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.04.2019 [2019/17] |
08.03.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.04.2019 [2019/15] |
01.03.2019 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 03.04.2019 [2019/14] |
15.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.03.2019 [2019/12] |
01.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.03.2019 [2019/10] |
25.01.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.02.2019 [2019/09] |
11.01.2019 |
Change - classification |
published on 13.02.2019 [2019/07] |
14.12.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.01.2019 [2019/03] |
30.11.2018 |
Change - classification |
published on 02.01.2019 [2019/01] |
23.11.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.12.2018 [2018/52] |
16.11.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.12.2018 [2018/51] |
09.11.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.12.2018 [2018/50] |
19.10.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] |
23.03.2018 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 25.04.2018 [2018/17] |
23.03.2018 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
23.03.2018 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
23.03.2018 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
26.01.2018 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 28.02.2018 [2018/09] |
19.11.2017 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
20.10.2017 |
Change - classification |
published on 22.11.2017 [2017/47] |
20.10.2017 |
Change - classification |
published on 22.11.2017 [2017/47] |
06.10.2017 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
22.09.2017 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
30.06.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
31.05.2017 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
24.03.2017 |
Change - applicant |
published on 26.04.2017 [2017/17] |
31.01.2017 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
20.01.2017 |
First examination report |
|
01.07.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.10.2015 |
New entry: Decision on request for further processing |
|
20.10.2015 |
New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
19.10.2015 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
19.10.2015 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
06.08.2015 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
23.06.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.11.2014 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 31.12.2014 [2015/01] |
28.11.2014 |
Change - classification |
published on 31.12.2014 [2015/01] |
28.11.2014 |
Change - classification |
published on 31.12.2014 [2015/01] |
03.04.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.08.2013 |
Change - extension states |
published on 18.09.2013 [2013/38] |
24.06.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.03.2013 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 17.04.2013 [2013/16] |
15.03.2013 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 17.04.2013 [2013/16] |
23.10.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.10.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.09.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.01.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.12.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|