Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2016219893 | Global Dossier | 04.08.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201615016233 | 04.02.2016 | JP2010134612 | 13.06.2010 | WO2011JP03331 | 13.06.2011 | US201113699642 | 13.06.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2013078357 | Global Dossier | 28.03.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2010134612 | 13.06.2010 | WO2011JP03331 | 13.06.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11134698 | Global Dossier | 05.10.2021 | B2 | US2020163353 | 28.05.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201615016233 | 04.02.2016 | JP2010134612 | 13.06.2010 | WO2011JP03331 | 13.06.2011 | US201916690364 | 21.11.2019 | US201213699642 | 23.11.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6138225B | Global Dossier | 31.05.2017 | B2 | JP2016039826 | 24.03.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2010134612 | 13.06.2010 | JP2015246605 | 17.12.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5859977B | Global Dossier | 16.02.2016 | B2 | JP2013528046 | 08.07.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2010134612 | 13.06.2010 | WO2011JP03331 | 13.06.2011 | JP2012547773 | 13.06.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3338557 | Global Dossier | 27.06.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2010134612 | 13.06.2010 | EP11795388 | 13.06.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105341163B | Global Dossier | 29.09.2020 | B | CN105341163 | 24.02.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2010134612 | 13.06.2010 | CN201180025530 | 13.06.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102905541B | Global Dossier | 09.03.2016 | B | CN102905541 | 30.01.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2010134612 | 13.06.2010 | WO2011JP03331 | 13.06.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2942261 | Global Dossier | 05.02.2019 | C | CA2942261 | 22.12.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2010134612 | 13.06.2010 | CA2795048 | 13.06.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2795048 | Global Dossier | 06.12.2016 | C | CA2795048 | 22.12.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2010134612 | 13.06.2010 | WO2011JP03331 | 13.06.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2011266502B | Global Dossier | 15.05.2014 | B2 | AU2011266502 | 18.10.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2010134612 | 13.06.2010 | WO2011JP03331 | 13.06.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2579728 | Global Dossier | 25.04.2018 | B1 | EP2579728 | 31.12.2014 | A4 | EP2579728 | 17.04.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2010134612 | 13.06.2010 | WO2011JP03331 | 13.06.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK2579728T | 18.06.2018 | T3 | Priority number | Date | JP2010134612 | 13.06.2010 | WO2011JP03331 | 13.06.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2672229T | 13.06.2018 | T3 | Priority number | Date | JP2010134612 | 13.06.2010 | WO2011JP03331 | 13.06.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1178747 | 19.09.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2010134612 | 13.06.2010 | WO2011JP03331 | 13.06.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ602895 | 31.10.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2010134612 | 13.06.2010 | WO2011JP03331 | 13.06.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG184491 | 29.11.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2010134612 | 13.06.2010 | WO2011JP03331 | 13.06.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2011158480 | Global Dossier | 22.12.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2010134612 | 13.06.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6820300B | Global Dossier | 27.01.2021 | B2 | JP2018196393 | 13.12.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2010134612 | 13.06.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6401334B | Global Dossier | 10.10.2018 | B2 | JP2017134085 | 03.08.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2010134612 | 13.06.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1216285 | 04.11.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2010134612 | 13.06.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI429401B | 11.03.2014 | B | TW201201702 | 16.01.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2010134612 | 13.06.2010 | Type | Divisional application | EP3338557 |