EP2583971 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING CARBODIIMIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.01.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kawaguchi Chemical Industry Co. Ltd. 8-4, Uchikanda 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 171-0047 / JP | For all designated states Teijin Limited 6-7, Minamihommachi 1-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0054 / JP | [2013/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUZUKI Kenji c/o Kawaguchi Chemical Industry Co. Ltd. 6-42, Ryoke 4-chome Kawaguchi-shi Saitama 332-0004 / JP | 02 /
KATO Tsukasa c/o Kawaguchi Chemical Industry Co. Ltd. 6-42, Ryoke 4-chome Kawaguchi-shi Saitama 332-0004 / JP | 03 /
YAMADA Tsutomu c/o Kawaguchi Chemical Industry Co. Ltd. 6-42, Ryoke 4-chome Kawaguchi-shi Saitama 332-0004 / JP | 04 /
KAMADA Yuya c/o Kawaguchi Chemical Industry Co. Ltd. 6-42, Ryoke 4-chome Kawaguchi-shi Saitama 332-0004 / JP | 05 /
SHOJI Shinichiro c/o Iwakuni Research Center Teijin Limited 2-1, Hinodecho Iwakuni-shi Yamaguchi 740-0014 / JP | [2013/17] | Representative(s) | Hallybone, Huw George Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2015/10] |
Former [2013/17] | Hallybone, Huw George Carpmaels & Ransford One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 11795860.3 | 15.06.2011 | WO2011JP64193 | Priority number, date | JP20100137174 | 16.06.2010 Original published format: JP 2010137174 | JP20100137173 | 16.06.2010 Original published format: JP 2010137173 | [2013/17] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011158958 | Date: | 22.12.2011 | Language: | JA | [2011/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2583971 | Date: | 24.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2583971 | Date: | 04.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.12.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.04.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C07D498/10, B01J31/02 | [2013/17] | CPC: |
C07D498/10 (EP,KR,US);
B01J31/02 (KR);
B01J31/0239 (EP,US);
B01J2231/40 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON CARBODIIMID | [2013/17] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING CARBODIIMIDE | [2013/17] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE CARBODIIMIDE | [2013/17] | Entry into regional phase | 19.12.2012 | Translation filed | 19.12.2012 | National basic fee paid | 19.12.2012 | Search fee paid | 19.12.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.12.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.12.2012 | Examination requested [2013/17] | 24.10.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.10.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.01.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 19.01.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.01.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.10.2014 | Opposition(s) | 07.12.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.06.2011 | AL | 04.03.2015 | AT | 04.03.2015 | BE | 04.03.2015 | BG | 04.03.2015 | CY | 04.03.2015 | CZ | 04.03.2015 | DK | 04.03.2015 | EE | 04.03.2015 | FI | 04.03.2015 | HR | 04.03.2015 | LT | 04.03.2015 | LV | 04.03.2015 | MC | 04.03.2015 | MK | 04.03.2015 | MT | 04.03.2015 | PL | 04.03.2015 | RO | 04.03.2015 | RS | 04.03.2015 | SE | 04.03.2015 | SI | 04.03.2015 | SK | 04.03.2015 | SM | 04.03.2015 | TR | 04.03.2015 | NO | 04.06.2015 | GR | 05.06.2015 | GB | 15.06.2015 | IE | 15.06.2015 | LU | 15.06.2015 | CH | 30.06.2015 | LI | 30.06.2015 | IS | 04.07.2015 | PT | 06.07.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 15.06.2011 | |
AT | 04.03.2015 | ||
BE | 04.03.2015 | ||
BG | 04.03.2015 | ||
CY | 04.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 04.03.2015 | ||
DK | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
MC | 04.03.2015 | ||
MK | 04.03.2015 | ||
MT | 04.03.2015 | ||
PL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
RS | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SI | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
SM | 04.03.2015 | ||
TR | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
GB | 15.06.2015 | ||
IE | 15.06.2015 | ||
LU | 15.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 15.06.2011 | |
AT | 04.03.2015 | ||
BE | 04.03.2015 | ||
BG | 04.03.2015 | ||
CY | 04.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 04.03.2015 | ||
DK | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
MC | 04.03.2015 | ||
MT | 04.03.2015 | ||
PL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
RS | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SI | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
SM | 04.03.2015 | ||
TR | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
GB | 15.06.2015 | ||
IE | 15.06.2015 | ||
LU | 15.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 04.03.2015 | |
BE | 04.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 04.03.2015 | ||
DK | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
MC | 04.03.2015 | ||
MT | 04.03.2015 | ||
PL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
RS | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SI | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
GB | 15.06.2015 | ||
IE | 15.06.2015 | ||
LU | 15.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/37] | AT | 04.03.2015 | |
BE | 04.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 04.03.2015 | ||
DK | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
MC | 04.03.2015 | ||
PL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
RS | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SI | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
GB | 15.06.2015 | ||
IE | 15.06.2015 | ||
LU | 15.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 04.03.2015 | |
CZ | 04.03.2015 | ||
DK | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
MC | 04.03.2015 | ||
PL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
RS | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SI | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
GB | 15.06.2015 | ||
IE | 15.06.2015 | ||
LU | 15.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 04.03.2015 | |
CZ | 04.03.2015 | ||
DK | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
MC | 04.03.2015 | ||
PL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
RS | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SI | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IE | 15.06.2015 | ||
LU | 15.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 04.03.2015 | |
CZ | 04.03.2015 | ||
DK | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
MC | 04.03.2015 | ||
PL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
RS | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SI | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IE | 15.06.2015 | ||
LU | 15.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 04.03.2015 | |
CZ | 04.03.2015 | ||
DK | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
MC | 04.03.2015 | ||
PL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
RS | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SI | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
LU | 15.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | AT | 04.03.2015 | |
CZ | 04.03.2015 | ||
DK | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
MC | 04.03.2015 | ||
PL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
RS | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 04.03.2015 | |
CZ | 04.03.2015 | ||
DK | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
PL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
RS | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 04.03.2015 | |
CZ | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
PL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
RS | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | AT | 04.03.2015 | |
CZ | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
RS | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | AT | 04.03.2015 | |
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
RS | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 04.03.2015 | |
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | FI | 04.03.2015 | |
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | FI | 04.03.2015 | |
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | LT | 04.03.2015 | |
NO | 04.06.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]WO2010071211 (TEIJIN LTD [JP], et al) [XP] 1-13 * See claim 5; examples 3 and 6 *; | [E]EP2380883 (TEIJIN LTD [JP]) [E] 1-13 * See claim 5; examples 3 and 6 * | International search | [A]WO2008081230 (GREAT EASTERN RESINS IND CO LT, et al); | [XP]WO2010071211 (TEIJIN LTD [JP], et al); | [A]JP2004332166 (TORAY INDUSTRIES); | [A]JP2005350829 (NIPPON ESTER CO LTD) | [A] - PEDRO MOLINA ET AL., "A New and Efficient Preparation of Cyclic Carbodiimides from Bis(iminophosphoranes) and the System Boc20/DMAP", JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, (1994), vol. 59, pages 7306 - 7315 | by applicant | JP2004332166 | JP2005350829 | WO2009JP71190 |