EP2583252 - FOREST INVENTORY ASSESSMENT USING REMOTE SENSING DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.09.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.05.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yale University Two Whitney Avenue New Haven, CT 06510 / US | [2023/44] |
Former [2013/17] | For all designated states Yale University Two Whitney Avenue New Haven, CT 06510 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARISA, Zachary 15002 Irene Dr. Huntsville, AL 35803 / US | [2013/17] | Representative(s) | Abel & Imray LLP Westpoint Building James Street West Bath BA1 2DA / GB | [2023/44] |
Former [2013/17] | Mintz Levin Cohn Ferris Glovsky and Popeo LLP Alder Castle 10 Noble Street London EC2V 7JX / GB | Application number, filing date | 11796407.2 | 16.06.2011 | [2023/44] | WO2011US40612 | Priority number, date | US20100397867P | 16.06.2010 Original published format: US 397867 P | [2013/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011159855 | Date: | 22.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2583252 | Date: | 24.04.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.12.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2583252 | Date: | 01.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.12.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06F18/25, G06V10/80, G06V20/10 | [2023/21] | CPC: |
G06Q10/087 (EP,US);
G06F18/256 (EP,US);
G06V10/811 (EP,US);
G06V20/188 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2017/28] | G06T17/05, G06K9/62 | ||
Former IPC [2013/17] | G06T17/05 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WALDBESTANDBEURTEILUNG UNTER VERWENDUNG VON FERNMESSDATEN | [2013/17] | English: | FOREST INVENTORY ASSESSMENT USING REMOTE SENSING DATA | [2013/17] | French: | EVALUATION D'INVENTAIRE FORESTIER À L'AIDE DE DONNÉES DE DÉTECTION À DISTANCE | [2013/17] | Entry into regional phase | 16.01.2013 | National basic fee paid | 16.01.2013 | Search fee paid | 16.01.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.01.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.01.2013 | Examination requested [2013/17] | 29.03.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.08.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.02.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 20.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP23207185.2 Application deemed to be withdrawn : 01.12.2023 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.08.2018 | Opposition(s) | 02.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.11.2023 | CZ | 01.11.2023 | DK | 01.11.2023 | EE | 01.11.2023 | ES | 01.11.2023 | HR | 01.11.2023 | IT | 01.11.2023 | LT | 01.11.2023 | LV | 01.11.2023 | NL | 01.11.2023 | PL | 01.11.2023 | RO | 01.11.2023 | RS | 01.11.2023 | SE | 01.11.2023 | SK | 01.11.2023 | SM | 01.11.2023 | BG | 01.02.2024 | NO | 01.02.2024 | GR | 02.02.2024 | IS | 01.03.2024 | PT | 01.03.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 01.11.2023 | |
CZ | 01.11.2023 | ||
DK | 01.11.2023 | ||
EE | 01.11.2023 | ||
ES | 01.11.2023 | ||
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
LT | 01.11.2023 | ||
LV | 01.11.2023 | ||
NL | 01.11.2023 | ||
PL | 01.11.2023 | ||
RO | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
SE | 01.11.2023 | ||
SM | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
PT | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | AT | 01.11.2023 | |
DK | 01.11.2023 | ||
EE | 01.11.2023 | ||
ES | 01.11.2023 | ||
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
LT | 01.11.2023 | ||
LV | 01.11.2023 | ||
NL | 01.11.2023 | ||
PL | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
SE | 01.11.2023 | ||
SM | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
PT | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 01.11.2023 | |
DK | 01.11.2023 | ||
ES | 01.11.2023 | ||
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
LT | 01.11.2023 | ||
LV | 01.11.2023 | ||
NL | 01.11.2023 | ||
PL | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
SE | 01.11.2023 | ||
SM | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
PT | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 01.11.2023 | |
ES | 01.11.2023 | ||
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
LT | 01.11.2023 | ||
LV | 01.11.2023 | ||
NL | 01.11.2023 | ||
PL | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
SE | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
PT | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 01.11.2023 | |
ES | 01.11.2023 | ||
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
LT | 01.11.2023 | ||
NL | 01.11.2023 | ||
PL | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
SE | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
PT | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AT | 01.11.2023 | |
ES | 01.11.2023 | ||
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
LT | 01.11.2023 | ||
NL | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
SE | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
PT | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 01.11.2023 | |
ES | 01.11.2023 | ||
LT | 01.11.2023 | ||
NL | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
PT | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 01.11.2023 | |
NL | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 02.02.2024 | |
IS | 01.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY] - JUHA HYYPPA ET AL, "Radar-Derived Standwise Forest Inventory", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON GEOSCIENCE AND REMOTE SENSING, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (19970301), vol. 35, no. 2, ISSN 0196-2892, XP011020825 [X] 1,3-6,13-15 * abstract, §II.A, §II.B and page 399 * [Y] 2,7-12 | [Y] - DONALD G. LECKIE, "Advances in remote sensing technologies for forest surveys and management", CANADIAN JOURNAL OF FOREST RESEARCH, CA, (19900401), vol. 20, no. 4, doi:10.1139/x90-063, ISSN 0045-5067, pages 464 - 483, XP055377741 [Y] 2 * page 466, column 2, penultimate paragraph * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1139/x90-063 | [Y] - ERKKI TOMPPO ET AL, "Multi-source inventory of the forests of the Hebei Forestry Bureau, Heilongjiang, China", SILVA FENNICA, (20010101), vol. 35, no. 3, doi:10.14214/sf.587, ISSN 2242-4075, XP055401109 [Y] 7-12 * §2.3.2, page 324, column 2, second paragraph , page 315, column 1;; figure 3; tables 4-5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.14214/sf.587 | [A] - SIRPA THESSLER ET AL, "Mapping gradual landscape-scale floristic changes in Amazonian primary rain forests by combining ordination and remote sensing", GLOBAL ECOLOGY AND BIOGEOGRAPHY, UK, (20050701), vol. 14, no. 4, doi:10.1111/j.1466-822X.2005.00158.x, ISSN 1466-822X, pages 315 - 325, XP055401097 [A] 7-12 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1466-822X.2005.00158.x | International search | [Y]US5857169 (SEIDE FRANK [DE]); | [A]US2006224327 (DUNLAP SUSAN C [US]); | [Y]US2007265781 (NEMETHY JOESPH M [US], et al); | [A]US2008133195 (RAHMES MARK [US], et al); | [A]US2009105954 (VAN WORKUM JOHN A [US], et al); | [X]US2010040260 (KELLE OLAVI [US], et al) | by applicant | - JUHA HYYPPA et al., Radar-Derived Forest Inventory | - DONALD G LECKIE, Advances in remote sensing technologies for forest surveys and management | - ERKKI TOMPPO et al., Multi-source inventory of the forests of the Hebei Forestry Bureau, Heilongjiang, China | US19670613978 |