EP2583317 - NANOWIRE LED STRUCTURE AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.11.2017 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.11.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.12.2017 [2017/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Glo Ab Ideon Science Park Scheelevägen 17 223 70 Lund / SE | [2013/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LÖWGREN, Truls c/o GLO-USA Inc. 1225 Bordeaux Drive Sunnyvale, California 94089 / US | [2013/17] | Representative(s) | Brann AB P.O. Box 3690 Sveavägen 63 103 59 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/46] | Brann AB P.O. Box 12246 102 26 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2013/17] | Mannerlöf Tenning, Eva Marie BRANN AB P.O. Box 12246 102 26 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 11796534.3 | 17.06.2011 | WO2011US40932 | Priority number, date | US20100356167P | 18.06.2010 Original published format: US 356167 P | [2013/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011160051 | Date: | 22.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/51] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2583317 | Date: | 24.04.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.12.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 05.04.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H01L33/04, H01L33/22, B82B3/00, B82Y20/00, H01L33/18, H01L33/24, H01L33/38, H01L33/08, H01L33/42, H01L33/60, H01L33/62 | [2016/24] | CPC: |
B82Y20/00 (EP,US);
H01L33/04 (KR);
H01L33/08 (EP,KR,US);
H01L33/18 (EP,US);
H01L33/20 (KR);
H01L33/24 (US);
H01L33/42 (US);
H01L33/60 (US);
H01L33/62 (US);
H01L2924/0002 (EP,US);
H01L2933/0016 (US);
H01L2933/0058 (US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/17] | H01L33/04, H01L33/22, B82B3/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/17] | Title | German: | NANODRAHT-LED-STRUKTUR UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG | [2013/17] | English: | NANOWIRE LED STRUCTURE AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING THE SAME | [2013/17] | French: | STRUCTURE À DIODES ÉLECTROLUMINESCENTES DE NANOFILS ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION ASSOCIÉ | [2013/17] | Entry into regional phase | 16.01.2013 | National basic fee paid | 16.01.2013 | Search fee paid | 16.01.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.01.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.01.2013 | Examination requested [2013/17] | 06.12.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.07.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/50] | 04.08.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/50] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.03.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2016 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   27.10.2016 | 30.06.2017 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP1727216 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al) [X] 1-6,8-10 * paragraphs [0028] - [0034] - [0083] - [0094]; figure 5 * [I] 7; | [X]WO2009009612 (NANOCRYSTAL LLC [US], et al) [X] 11-13,15 * paragraphs [0057] - [0070]; figures 4,7 *; | [X]JP2010514207 (QUNANO AB) [X] 11-13 * figure 5b *; | [A]WO2010027322 (QUNANO AB [SE], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US2008036038 (HERSEE STEPHEN D [US], et al); | [A]US2010006817 (OHLSSON JONAS [SE], et al); | [A]WO2008079079 (QUNANO AB [SE], et al); | [A]US2008012030 (YOON SANG HO [KR], et al); | [A]US2005227391 (JIN YOUNG-GU [KR], et al) | by applicant | EP1727216 | WO2009009612 | JP2010514207 |