EP2646106 - SURFACE COATING FOR BIOMEDICAL IMPLANTS AND ELECTRODES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 28.08.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2015 | Withdrawal of application | published on 30.09.2015 [2015/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MED-EL Elektromedizinische Geräte GmbH Fürstenweg 77 6020 Innsbruck / AT | For all designated states Hemoteq AG Adenauerstrasse 15 52146 Würselen / DE | [2013/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HESSLER, Roland Tiergartenstr. 61 A-6020 Innsbruck / AT | 02 /
JOLLY, Claude Karl-innerebner Str. 95a C4 A-6020 Innsbruck / AT | 03 /
SCHILP, Soeren Habichtstr. 12 A-6080 Innsbruck-igls / AT | 04 /
FAUST, Volker Bruchstr. 40 52080 Aachen / DE | 05 /
FISCHLER, Wolfgang Grenzstrasse 1 A-6020 Innsbruck / AT | [2013/41] | Representative(s) | Lucke, Andreas Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/41] | Lucke, Andreas Boehmert & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11796886.7 | 02.12.2011 | WO2011US63018 | Priority number, date | US20100419061P | 02.12.2010 Original published format: US 419061 P | [2013/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012075367 | Date: | 07.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2646106 | Date: | 09.10.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.06.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/05, A61L29/00, A61B19/00 | [2013/41] | CPC: |
A61L27/34 (EP,US);
A61L2420/02 (EP,US);
A61N1/05 (EP,US);
A61N1/0541 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/41] | Title | German: | OBERFLÄCHENBESCHICHTUNG FÜR BIOMEDIZINISCHE IMPLANTATE UND ELEKTRODEN | [2013/41] | English: | SURFACE COATING FOR BIOMEDICAL IMPLANTS AND ELECTRODES | [2013/41] | French: | REVÊTEMENT DE SURFACE POUR DES IMPLANTS BIOMÉDICAUX ET DES ÉLECTRODES BIOMÉDICALES | [2013/41] | Entry into regional phase | 26.06.2013 | National basic fee paid | 26.06.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.06.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.06.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.06.2013 | Examination requested [2013/41] | 17.08.2015 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2006218783 (CULP GORDON W [US])[A] 1-19; | [Y]US2007129779 (AYRE PETER J [AU], et al) [Y] 1,3,9,11 * paragraphs [0030] - [0032] *; | [XYI]US2007220746 (ANDERSON NEIL L [AU], et al) [X] 1,2,4,6-10,12,14-16 * paragraphs [0011] , [0 58] - [0061] * [Y] 1,3,5,9,11,13 [I] 3,5,11,13,17-19; | [Y]WO2007148231 (MED EL ELEKTROMED GERAETE GMBH [AT], et al) [Y] 5,13 * paragraphs [0026] , [0 29] *; | [Y]US2008306611 (ROWLEY ADRIAN P [US], et al) [Y] 1,3,9,11 * paragraphs [0004] , [0 12] , [0 49] , [0 55] * |