EP2756291 - LEAD-FREE ELECTROCHEMICAL GALVANIC OXYGEN SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 29.05.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2015 | Withdrawal of application | published on 01.07.2015 [2015/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Life Safety Distribution AG Weiherallee 11a 8610 Uster / CH | [2014/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COBIANU, Cornel 11 Vladeasa Street B1 C33 Sc.A. Et. 6 Apt. 38 Sector 6 Bucharest 061672 / RO | 02 /
SERBAN, Bogdan-Catalin 32A Liviu Rebreanu Street Sector 3 Bucharest 60000 / RO | 03 /
HOBBS, Bryan, Stewart Walberton Lodge Yapton Lane Walberton Arundel West Sussex BN18 0AS / GB | [2014/30] | Representative(s) | Houghton, Mark Phillip Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell, Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | [2014/30] | Application number, filing date | 11797280.2 | 14.09.2011 | WO2011RO00022 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013039414 | Date: | 21.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2756291 | Date: | 23.07.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.03.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.03.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/404 | [2014/30] | CPC: |
G01N27/404 (EP,US);
G01N27/413 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/30] | Title | German: | BLEIFREIER ELEKTROCHEMISCHER GALVANISCHER SAUERSTOFFSENSOR | [2014/30] | English: | LEAD-FREE ELECTROCHEMICAL GALVANIC OXYGEN SENSOR | [2014/30] | French: | CAPTEUR D'OXYGÈNE GALVANIQUE ÉLECTROCHIMIQUE SANS PLOMB | [2014/30] | Entry into regional phase | 07.03.2014 | National basic fee paid | 07.03.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.03.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.04.2013 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/30] | 22.01.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.03.2015 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 27.05.2015 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 14.04.2014 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   10.06.2014 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]US3223597 (HERSCH PAUL A) [I] 1-12* the whole document *; | [XI]US3616416 (LINENBERG AMOS, et al) [X] 1-4,7,8,12 * column 1, lines 6-7 * * column 3, line 4 - column 4, line 35; figures 1,2 * [I] 5,6,9-11; | [XI]EP0180161 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1-4,7,12 * page 3, line 22 - page 6, line 10; figures 1,2 * [I] 5,6,8-11; | [I]US5200044 (MILSTEIN JOSEPH B [US], et al) [I] 1-12 * column 2, line 36 - column 4, line 42; figures 2,3 *; | [X]EP1593962 (GS YUASA CORP [JP]) [X] 1,2,7,12 * paragraphs [0010] - [0013] - [0028] - [0032] - [0044]; figure 1 *; | [X]DE102006024022 (IT DR GAMBERT GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2,12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0003] , [0031]; figure 1 *; | [X]EP2219024 (GS YUASA CORP [JP]) [X] 1,2,7,8,12 * paragraphs [0003] , [0004] , [0010] - [0015] - [0020] , [0021] , [0023] - [0026] - [0029] , [0035] , [0037] - [0039]; figure 1; table 1 * | by applicant | EP1593962 | EP2219024 | - ATLAS OF ELECTROCHEMICAL EQUILIBRIA IN AQUEOUS SOLUTIONS, (1974), page 527 | - ATLAS OF ELECTROCHEMICAL EQUILIBRIA IN AQUEOUS SOLUTIONS, (1974), page 536 | - ATLAS OF ELECTROCHEMICAL EQUILIBRIA IN AQUEOUS SOLUTIONS, (1974), page 387 |