EP2587810 - CONTENT DISTRIBUTION SYSTEM, PLAYBACK DEVICE, DISTRIBUTION SERVER, PLAYBACK METHOD, AND DISTRIBUTION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.07.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.10.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.08.2019 [2019/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2013/18] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAWAGUCHI, Toru c/o Panasonic Corporation IPROC, IP Development Center 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
SHINOHARA, Hiroki c/o Panasonic Corporation IPROC, IP Development Center 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2013/18] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/18] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11797845.2 | 22.06.2011 | WO2011JP03555 | Priority number, date | JP20100142718 | 23.06.2010 Original published format: JP 2010142718 | [2013/18] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011161957 | Date: | 29.12.2011 | Language: | JA | [2011/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2587810 | Date: | 01.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.12.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.08.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04N13/194, H04N13/161, H04N13/139, H04N13/178, H04N21/434, H04N21/81, H04N21/84 | [2018/41] | CPC: |
H04N13/178 (EP,US);
H04N13/139 (EP,US);
H04N13/161 (EP,US);
H04N13/194 (EP,US);
H04N19/597 (EP,US);
H04N21/4345 (EP,US);
H04N21/4347 (EP,US);
H04N21/816 (EP,US);
H04N21/84 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/40] | H04N13/00, H04N21/00 | ||
Former IPC [2013/18] | H04N13/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/18] | Title | German: | INHALTSVERTEILUNGSSYSTEM, ABSPIELVORRICHTUNG, VERTEILUNGSSERVER, ABSPIELVERFAHREN UND VERTEILUNGSVERFAHREN | [2013/18] | English: | CONTENT DISTRIBUTION SYSTEM, PLAYBACK DEVICE, DISTRIBUTION SERVER, PLAYBACK METHOD, AND DISTRIBUTION METHOD | [2013/18] | French: | SYSTÈME DE DISTRIBUTION DE CONTENUS, DISPOSITIF DE LECTURE, SERVEUR DE DISTRIBUTION, PROCÉDÉ DE LECTURE ET PROCÉDÉ DE DISTRIBUTION | [2013/18] | Entry into regional phase | 24.07.2012 | Translation filed | 24.07.2012 | National basic fee paid | 24.07.2012 | Search fee paid | 24.07.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.07.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.02.2012 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 24.07.2012 | Examination requested [2013/18] | 04.03.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.04.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.10.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.10.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.02.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/34] | 29.03.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2019/34] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.04.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO2010041896 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al) [X] 1,2,4-6 * abstract * * paragraphs [0021] - [0022] - [0059] - [0063] - [0078] - [0079] - [0113] - [0120] - [0162] , [0176] - [0177] * [Y] 3; | [IY]EP2101495 (PANASONIC CORP [JP]) [I] 1-6 * paragraphs [0012] , [0014] - [0018] - [0020] , [0029] , [0032] - [0033]; figures 1,5,17,18,19 * [Y] 3; | [I]US2010142924 (YAMASHITA KEN [JP], et al) [I] 1,2,4-6 * paragraphs [0115] - [0120] - [0137] , [0145] - [0146] - [0186] , [0224]; figures 1-4,34,36-38,40-43 * * paragraphs [0425] , [0463] - [0441] - [0443] , [0447] - [0452] - [0466] , [0488] - [0489] - [0500] - [0501] * * paragraph [0802] * | International search | [Y]JPH11191895 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [Y]JP2005006114 (SHARP KK) | by applicant | JP2005094168 |