EP2583925 - IMAGE FORMING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.01.2016 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko I Infotech Inc. 8, Nakase 1-chome Mihama-ku Chiba-shi, Chiba 261-8507 / JP | [2013/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIROTA, Kiyohito c/o SEIKO I INFOTECH INC. 8 Nakase 1-chome Mihama-ku Chiba-shi Chiba 261-8507 / JP | [2013/17] | Representative(s) | Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | [2013/17] | Application number, filing date | 11797949.2 | 24.05.2011 | WO2011JP61802 | Priority number, date | JP20110106006 | 11.05.2011 Original published format: JP 2011106006 | JP20100140894 | 21.06.2010 Original published format: JP 2010140894 | [2013/17] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011162062 | Date: | 29.12.2011 | Language: | JA | [2011/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2583925 | Date: | 24.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2583925 | Date: | 25.02.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.12.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.12.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B65H26/00, B41J15/04, B65H16/02, B65H5/28, B65H19/12, B41J11/00 | [2014/02] | CPC: |
B65H19/12 (EP,US);
G03G15/607 (US);
B41J11/003 (EP,US);
B41J15/04 (EP,US);
B65H16/02 (EP,US);
B65H5/28 (EP,US);
B65H2220/02 (EP,US);
B65H2301/12 (EP,US);
B65H2301/41368 (EP,US);
B65H2403/411 (EP,US);
B65H2511/12 (EP,US);
B65H2511/514 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
B65H2511/12, B65H2220/01, B65H2220/02 (EP,US);
B65H2511/514, B65H2220/01 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2013/17] | B65H26/00, B41J15/04, B65H16/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BILDERZEUGUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2013/17] | English: | IMAGE FORMING DEVICE | [2013/17] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE FORMATION D'IMAGE | [2013/17] | Entry into regional phase | 18.12.2012 | Translation filed | 21.01.2013 | National basic fee paid | 21.01.2013 | Search fee paid | 21.01.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.01.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.01.2013 | Examination requested [2013/17] | 14.02.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.10.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.01.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 07.01.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.01.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.10.2014 | Opposition(s) | 26.11.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.05.2011 | AL | 25.02.2015 | AT | 25.02.2015 | BE | 25.02.2015 | BG | 25.02.2015 | CY | 25.02.2015 | CZ | 25.02.2015 | DK | 25.02.2015 | EE | 25.02.2015 | ES | 25.02.2015 | FI | 25.02.2015 | HR | 25.02.2015 | IT | 25.02.2015 | LT | 25.02.2015 | LV | 25.02.2015 | MC | 25.02.2015 | MK | 25.02.2015 | MT | 25.02.2015 | NL | 25.02.2015 | PL | 25.02.2015 | PT | 25.02.2015 | RO | 25.02.2015 | RS | 25.02.2015 | SE | 25.02.2015 | SI | 25.02.2015 | SK | 25.02.2015 | SM | 25.02.2015 | TR | 25.02.2015 | IE | 24.05.2015 | LU | 24.05.2015 | GB | 25.05.2015 | NO | 25.05.2015 | GR | 26.05.2015 | CH | 31.05.2015 | LI | 31.05.2015 | IS | 25.06.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 24.05.2011 | |
AT | 25.02.2015 | ||
BE | 25.02.2015 | ||
BG | 25.02.2015 | ||
CY | 25.02.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
IT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
MC | 25.02.2015 | ||
MK | 25.02.2015 | ||
MT | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PT | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
RS | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
SM | 25.02.2015 | ||
TR | 25.02.2015 | ||
IE | 24.05.2015 | ||
LU | 24.05.2015 | ||
GB | 25.05.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 24.05.2011 | |
AT | 25.02.2015 | ||
BE | 25.02.2015 | ||
BG | 25.02.2015 | ||
CY | 25.02.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
IT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
MC | 25.02.2015 | ||
MT | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
RS | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
SM | 25.02.2015 | ||
TR | 25.02.2015 | ||
IE | 24.05.2015 | ||
LU | 24.05.2015 | ||
GB | 25.05.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
BE | 25.02.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
IT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
MC | 25.02.2015 | ||
MT | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
RS | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
IE | 24.05.2015 | ||
LU | 24.05.2015 | ||
GB | 25.05.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
BE | 25.02.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
IT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
MC | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
RS | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
IE | 24.05.2015 | ||
LU | 24.05.2015 | ||
GB | 25.05.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
IT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
MC | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
RS | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
IE | 24.05.2015 | ||
LU | 24.05.2015 | ||
GB | 25.05.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
IT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
MC | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
RS | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
IE | 24.05.2015 | ||
LU | 24.05.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
IT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
MC | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
RS | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
LU | 24.05.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/06] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
IT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
MC | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
RS | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
LU | 24.05.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
IT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
RS | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
RS | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
RS | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/41] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RS | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
RS | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | ES | 25.02.2015 | |
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | ES | 25.02.2015 | |
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | ES | 25.02.2015 | |
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/33] | ES | 25.02.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS63185730 (MINOLTA CAMERA KK) [A] 1-7 * abstract *; | [IA]US6609844 (PETTERUTI STEVEN F [US], et al) [I] 1,2,5,7 * abstract * * column 3, line 58 - column 4, line 17 * * column 10, line 62 - column 11, line 22 * * the whole document * [A] 3,4,6; | [A]US2003184007 (FURUKAWA KIMIAKI [JP]) [A] 1-7 * abstract * * sentence 0033, paragraph 0025 ** the whole document * | International search | [A]JPH0826536 (FUJI XEROX CO LTD); | [A]JP2517533Y (FUJI XEROX CO., LTD.); | [A]JPH09506053 (MOORE BUSINESS FORMS, INC.); | [A]US6609844 (PETTERUTI STEVEN F [US], et al); | [A]JP2005320101 (RICOH KK); | [A]JP2006327805 (KONICA MINOLTA BUSINESS TECH) | by applicant | US5689759 |