EP2587505 - ELECTRODE FOR ELECTRIC STORAGE DEVICE, METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING THE ELECTRODE, AND METHOD FOR CONNECTING THE ELECTRODE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.06.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.06.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.02.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Senju Metal Industry Co., Ltd 23 Senju-Hashido-cho Adachi-ku Tokyo 120-8555 / JP | [2013/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKAMURA Katsuji c/o SENJU METAL INDUSTRY CO. LTD. 23 SENJU-HASHIDO-CHO ADACHI-KU Tokyo 120-8555 / JP | 02 /
TSURUTA Kaichi c/o SENJU METAL INDUSTRY CO. LTD. 23 SENJU-HASHIDO-CHO ADACHI-KU Tokyo 120-8555 / JP | 03 /
OZAKI Yuji c/o SENJU METAL INDUSTRY CO. LTD. 23 SENJU-HASHIDO-CHO ADACHI-KU Tokyo 120-8555 / JP | 04 /
WATARAI Shigeaki c/o SENJU METAL INDUSTRY CO. LTD. 23 SENJU-HASHIDO-CHO ADACHI-KU Tokyo 120-8555 / JP | 05 /
TAKAGI Hidenori c/o JM ENERGY CO. LTD. 8565 Nishide Oizumi-cho Hokuto-shi Yamanashi 409-1501 / JP | 06 /
OHORI Yutaka c/o JM ENERGY CO. LTD. 8565 Nishide Oizumi-cho Hokuto-shi Yamanashi 409-1501 / JP | [2013/18] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/30] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2013/18] | Ealey, Douglas Ralph D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 11798012.8 | 14.06.2011 | [2017/30] | WO2011JP63575 | Priority number, date | JP20100145566 | 25.06.2010 Original published format: JP 2010145566 | [2013/18] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011162126 | Date: | 29.12.2011 | Language: | JA | [2011/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2587505 | Date: | 01.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2587505 | Date: | 26.07.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.12.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C25D3/12, C25D3/22, C25D3/30, C25D5/12, C25D5/44, C23C18/16, C23C18/18, C23C18/36, C23C18/52, C23C18/54, H01G11/24, H01G11/66, H01B1/02, H01M2/20, H01M2/30, H01G11/06, H01G11/30, H01G11/50, H01M2/26, H01M4/02 | [2017/09] | CPC: |
C23C18/1651 (EP,KR,US);
C23C18/1653 (EP,KR,US);
C23C18/1827 (EP,KR,US);
C23C18/31 (US);
C23C18/32 (KR,US);
C23C18/36 (EP,KR,US);
C23C18/48 (KR,US);
C23C18/52 (EP,KR,US);
C23C18/54 (EP,KR,US);
C25D3/12 (KR,US);
C25D3/22 (KR,US);
C25D3/30 (KR,US);
C25D3/565 (KR,US);
C25D3/60 (KR,US);
C25D5/12 (EP,KR,US);
C25D5/44 (EP,KR,US);
H01B1/023 (EP,KR,US);
H01B13/32 (KR,US);
H01G11/06 (US);
H01G11/24 (EP,KR,US);
H01G11/30 (US);
H01G11/50 (US);
H01G11/66 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/502 (KR);
H01M50/531 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/534 (EP,US);
H01M50/543 (KR);
H01M2004/028 (US);
Y02E60/10 (EP);
Y02E60/13 (KR,US);
Y10T29/49147 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2016/03] | C23C18/16, C23C18/18, C23C18/31, C23C18/36, C23C18/52, C23C18/54, C25D5/12, C25D5/44, C25D7/00, H01B1/02, H01G11/24, H01G11/66, H01M2/20, H01M2/26, H01M2/30 | ||
Former IPC [2013/18] | H01G9/058, C23C18/31, C25D7/00, H01M2/20, H01M2/26, H01M2/30 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRODEN FÜR ELEKTRISCHE SPEICHER, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DER ELEKTRODE UND VERFAHREN FÜR DEN ANSCHLUSS DER ELEKTRODE | [2013/18] | English: | ELECTRODE FOR ELECTRIC STORAGE DEVICE, METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING THE ELECTRODE, AND METHOD FOR CONNECTING THE ELECTRODE | [2013/18] | French: | ÉLECTRODE POUR DISPOSITIF DE STOCKAGE ÉLECTRIQUE, PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE L'ÉLECTRODE ET PROCÉDÉ DE CONNEXION DE L'ÉLECTRODE | [2013/18] | Entry into regional phase | 21.12.2012 | Translation filed | 21.12.2012 | National basic fee paid | 21.12.2012 | Search fee paid | 21.12.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.12.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.04.2012 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 21.12.2012 | Examination requested [2013/18] | 08.07.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.10.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.01.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.05.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 10.06.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 10.06.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.10.2016 | Opposition(s) | 30.04.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.06.2011 | AL | 26.07.2017 | AT | 26.07.2017 | CY | 26.07.2017 | CZ | 26.07.2017 | DK | 26.07.2017 | EE | 26.07.2017 | ES | 26.07.2017 | FI | 26.07.2017 | HR | 26.07.2017 | LT | 26.07.2017 | LV | 26.07.2017 | MC | 26.07.2017 | MK | 26.07.2017 | PL | 26.07.2017 | PT | 26.07.2017 | RO | 26.07.2017 | RS | 26.07.2017 | SE | 26.07.2017 | SI | 26.07.2017 | SK | 26.07.2017 | SM | 26.07.2017 | TR | 26.07.2017 | BG | 26.10.2017 | NO | 26.10.2017 | GR | 27.10.2017 | IS | 26.11.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 14.06.2011 | |
AT | 26.07.2017 | ||
CY | 26.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
ES | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
MC | 26.07.2017 | ||
MK | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PT | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
RS | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
SI | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
SM | 26.07.2017 | ||
TR | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
Former [2020/27] | HU | 14.06.2011 | |
AT | 26.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
ES | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
MC | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PT | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
RS | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
SI | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
SM | 26.07.2017 | ||
TR | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
ES | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
MC | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
RS | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
SI | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
SM | 26.07.2017 | ||
TR | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
Former [2019/15] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
ES | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
MC | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
RS | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
SI | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
SM | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
ES | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
RS | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
SI | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
SM | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
ES | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
RS | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
SM | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
ES | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
RS | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
ES | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RS | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
ES | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RS | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
ES | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RS | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
RS | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | FI | 26.07.2017 | |
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 26.07.2017 | |
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 26.07.2017 | |
NO | 26.10.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPS61115667 (MITSUBISHI METAL CORP) [Y] 6* abstract *; | [Y]JPH07157884 (THREE TEC KK) [Y] 6 * abstract *; | [XI]EP1215691 (SHOWA DENKO KK [JP]) [X] 1,3-5 * paragraphs [0016] , [0037] - [0038] - [0068]; claims 7,11-17,20 * * the whole document * [I] 2,6,7; | [XI]JP2003077451 (ROHM CO LTD) [X] 1-5,7 * abstract * * paragraphs [0023] - [0031]; figure 1; claims 1-3 * * the whole document * [I] 6 | International search | [Y]JPS61115667 (MITSUBISHI METAL CORP); | [Y]JPH0529741 (DENKI KAGAKU KOGYO KK); | [Y]JP2008108584 (SUMIDEN ASAHI IND LTD, et al); | [Y]JP2010065916 (HITACHI CABLE) | by applicant | JP2000090907 | JP2005209735 |