EP2587290 - OPTICAL CONNECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.07.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 21.08.2019 [2019/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yazaki Corporation 4-28, Mita 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8333 / JP | [2013/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIKOSAKA Tomohiro c/o Yazaki Parts Co. Ltd. 1500, Mishuku Susono-shi Shzuoka / JP | 02 /
IKEYA Kenichi c/o Yazaki Parts Co. Ltd. 1500, Mishuku Susono-shi Shzuoka / JP | [2013/18] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/18] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11798208.2 | 23.06.2011 | WO2011JP64368 | Priority number, date | JP20100142758 | 23.06.2010 Original published format: JP 2010142758 | [2013/18] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011162327 | Date: | 29.12.2011 | Language: | JA | [2011/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2587290 | Date: | 01.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.12.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/38 | [2013/18] | CPC: |
G02B6/38875 (EP,US);
G02B6/36 (KR,US);
G02B6/38 (KR);
G02B6/3829 (EP,US);
G02B6/387 (EP,US);
G02B6/3878 (EP,US);
G02B6/3888 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/18] | Title | German: | OPTISCHER VERBINDER | [2013/18] | English: | OPTICAL CONNECTOR | [2013/18] | French: | CONNECTEUR OPTIQUE | [2013/18] | Entry into regional phase | 24.12.2012 | Translation filed | 24.12.2012 | National basic fee paid | 24.12.2012 | Search fee paid | 24.12.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.12.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.12.2012 | Examination requested [2013/18] | 08.01.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.07.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/34] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.03.2019 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US4611887 (GLOVER DOUGLAS W [US], et al) [X] 1 * column 3, paragraph last - column 4, line 16 * * figure 1 * [I] 2,3; | [XI]US5138678 (BRIGGS ROBERT C [US], et al) [X] 1 * column 2, lines 21-56 * * figure 2 * [I] 2,3; | [XI]US5214731 (CHANG PETER C [US], et al) [X] 1 * column 3, line 22 - column 4, line 26 * * figures 1,3 * [I] 2,3; | [A]US2001038770 (NAKAJIMA MASAHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 2 * paragraph [0027] * * figure 2 *; | [A]EP1255142 (SUMITOMO WIRING SYSTEMS [JP], et al) [A] 1-3 * paragraph [0061] ** figures 24, 25 *; | [A]JP2009109978 (FUJIKURA LTD) [A] 2 * paragraph [0046] * * figures 15, 28 * | International search | [A]US4516829 (BORSUK LESLIE M [US], et al); | [A]JPH04273205 (MOLEX INC); | [A]JPH0777630 (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH); | [A]JPH0961667 (HIROSE ELECTRIC CO LTD, et al); | [Y]JPH09292545 (AMP JAPAN); | [X]JP2002107574 (SUMITOMO WIRING SYSTEMS, et al); | [X]JP2002533745 (RACO ELECTRONIC DATA TECHNOLOGY GMBH); | [X]JP2007279528 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES); | [A]JP2010113302 (MITSUBISHI CABLE IND LTD) | by applicant | JP2010026475 | JP20100142758 |