EP2586863 - HIGH-SPEED MATURATION METHOD FOR AN OLIGONUCLEOTIDE LIBRARY FOR THE PURPOSE OF PREPARING A PROTEIN LIBRARY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.03.2018 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.03.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.03.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.03.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The University of Tokyo 3-1, Hongo 7-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 113-8654 / JP | For all designated states GeneFrontier Corporation Todai-Kashiwa Venture Plaza Rm No. 308 5-4-19, Kashiwa-no-Ha Kashiwa-shi Chiba 277-0882 / JP | [2017/11] |
Former [2013/18] | For all designated states The University of Tokyo 3-1, Hongo 7-chome Bunkyo-Ku Tokyo 113-8654 / JP | ||
For all designated states GeneFrontier Corporation Todai-Kashiwa Venture Plaza Rm 308 5-4-19, Kashiwa-no-Ha Kashiwa-shi Chiba 277-0882 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UEDA, Takuya c/o The University of Tokyo 3-1, Hongo 7-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 113-8654 / JP | 02 /
KANAMORI, Takashi c/o GeneFrontier Corporation Todai-Kashiwa Venture Plaza Rm. No. 308 5-4-19, Kashiwa-no-Ha, Kashiwa-shi Chiba 2770882 / JP | 03 /
KOJOH, Kanehisa c/o GeneFrontier Corporation Todai-Kashiwa Venture Plaza Rm No. 308 5-4-19, Kashiwa-no-Ha Kashiwa-shi Chiba 277-0882 / JP | 04 /
KATOH, Shizue c/o GeneFrontier Corporation Todai-Kashiwa Venture Plaza Rm No. 308 5-4-19, Kashiwa-no-Ha Kashiwa-shi Chiba 277-0882 / JP | 05 /
MIYAKOSHI, Akira c/o GeneFrontier Corporation Todai-Kashiwa Venture Plaza Rm No. 308 5-4-19, Kashiwa-no-Ha Kashiwa-shi Chiba 277-0882 / JP | [2017/18] |
Former [2013/29] | 01 /
UEDA, Takuya c/o The University of Tokyo 3-1, Hongo 7-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 113-8654 / JP | ||
02 /
KANAMORI, Takashi c/o GeneFrontier Corporation Todai-Kashiwa Venture Plaza Rm. 308 5-4-19, Kashiwa-no-Ha, Kashiwa-shi Chiba 2770882 / JP | |||
03 /
KOJOH, Kanehisa c/o GeneFrontier Corporation Todai-Kashiwa Venture Plaza Rm 308 5-4-19, Kashiwa-no-Ha Kashiwa-shi Chiba 277-0882 / JP | |||
04 /
KATOH, Shizue c/o GeneFrontier Corporation Todai-Kashiwa Venture Plaza Rm 308 5-4-19, Kashiwa-no-Ha Kashiwa-shi Chiba 277-0882 / JP | |||
05 /
MIYAKOSHI, Akira c/o GeneFrontier Corporation Todai-Kashiwa Venture Plaza Rm 308 5-4-19, Kashiwa-no-Ha Kashiwa-shi Chiba 277-0882 / JP | |||
Former [2013/18] | 01 /
UEDA, Takuya c/o The University of Tokyo 3-1, Hongo 7-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 113-8654 / JP | ||
02 /
KANAMORI, Takashi c/o GeneFrontier Corporation Todai-Kashiwa Venture Plaza Rm. 308 5-4-19, Kashiwa-no-Ha, Kashiwa-shi Chiba 2770882 / JP | |||
03 /
KOJOH, Kanehisa c/o GeneFrontier Corporation Todai-Kashiwa Venture Plaza Rm 308 5-4-19, Kashiwa-no-Ha Kashiwa-shi Chiba 277-0882 / JP | |||
04 /
KATOH, Shizue c/o GeneFrontier Corporation Todai-Kashiwa Venture Plaza Rm 308 5-4-19, Kashiwa-no-Ha Kashiwa-shi Chiba 277-0882 / JP | |||
05 /
MIYAKOSHI, Akira c/o GeneFrontier Corporation Todai-Kashiwa Venture Plaza Rm 308 5-4-19, Kashiwa-no-Ha Kashiwa-shi Chiba 277-0882 / JP | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/18] | Duckworth, Timothy John J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 11798236.3 | 23.06.2011 | [2017/18] | WO2011JP64455 | Priority number, date | JP20100142470 | 23.06.2010 Original published format: JP 2010142470 | [2013/18] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011162355 | Date: | 29.12.2011 | Language: | JA | [2011/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2586863 | Date: | 01.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2586863 | Date: | 03.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.12.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.11.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/10 | [2013/52] | CPC: |
C12N15/1065 (EP,US);
C12N15/1041 (EP,US);
C12N15/1093 (US);
C12N15/67 (US)
|
Former IPC [2013/18] | C12N15/09 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HOCHGESCHWINDIGKEITS-REIFUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR EINE OLIGONUKLEOTID-BIBLIOTHEK ZUM ZWECK DER ERSTELLUNG EINER PROTEIN-BIBLIOTHEK | [2013/18] | English: | HIGH-SPEED MATURATION METHOD FOR AN OLIGONUCLEOTIDE LIBRARY FOR THE PURPOSE OF PREPARING A PROTEIN LIBRARY | [2013/18] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE MATURATION À GRANDE VITESSE D'UNE BANQUE D'OLIGONUCLÉOTIDES DANS LE BUT DE PRÉPARER UNE BANQUE DE PROTÉINES | [2013/18] | Entry into regional phase | 04.01.2013 | Translation filed | 04.01.2013 | National basic fee paid | 04.01.2013 | Search fee paid | 04.01.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.01.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.01.2013 | Examination requested [2013/18] | 23.06.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.01.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.08.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.02.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 23.02.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 23.02.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.03.2017 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 24.03.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.09.2015 | Opposition(s) | 06.02.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.06.2011 | AL | 03.05.2017 | AT | 03.05.2017 | CY | 03.05.2017 | CZ | 03.05.2017 | DK | 03.05.2017 | EE | 03.05.2017 | ES | 03.05.2017 | FI | 03.05.2017 | HR | 03.05.2017 | IT | 03.05.2017 | LT | 03.05.2017 | LV | 03.05.2017 | MC | 03.05.2017 | MK | 03.05.2017 | NL | 03.05.2017 | PL | 03.05.2017 | PT | 03.05.2017 | RO | 03.05.2017 | RS | 03.05.2017 | SE | 03.05.2017 | SI | 03.05.2017 | SK | 03.05.2017 | SM | 03.05.2017 | TR | 03.05.2017 | IE | 23.06.2017 | LU | 23.06.2017 | MT | 23.06.2017 | BG | 03.08.2017 | NO | 03.08.2017 | GR | 04.08.2017 | IS | 03.09.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 23.06.2011 | |
AT | 03.05.2017 | ||
CY | 03.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
IT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
MC | 03.05.2017 | ||
MK | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PT | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
TR | 03.05.2017 | ||
IE | 23.06.2017 | ||
LU | 23.06.2017 | ||
MT | 23.06.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | HU | 23.06.2011 | |
AT | 03.05.2017 | ||
CY | 03.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
IT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
MC | 03.05.2017 | ||
MK | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
TR | 03.05.2017 | ||
IE | 23.06.2017 | ||
LU | 23.06.2017 | ||
MT | 23.06.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 23.06.2011 | |
AT | 03.05.2017 | ||
CY | 03.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
IT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
MC | 03.05.2017 | ||
MK | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
IE | 23.06.2017 | ||
LU | 23.06.2017 | ||
MT | 23.06.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 23.06.2011 | |
AT | 03.05.2017 | ||
CY | 03.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
IT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
MC | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
IE | 23.06.2017 | ||
LU | 23.06.2017 | ||
MT | 23.06.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 23.06.2011 | |
AT | 03.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
IT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
MC | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
IE | 23.06.2017 | ||
LU | 23.06.2017 | ||
MT | 23.06.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
IT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
MC | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
IE | 23.06.2017 | ||
LU | 23.06.2017 | ||
MT | 23.06.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
IT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
IE | 23.06.2017 | ||
LU | 23.06.2017 | ||
MT | 23.06.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
IT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
IE | 23.06.2017 | ||
LU | 23.06.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
IT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
LU | 23.06.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
IT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [I] - ERIKO OSADA ET AL, "Epitope Mapping Using Ribosome Display in a Reconstituted Cell-Free Protein Synthesis System", vol. 145, no. 5, doi:10.1093/JB/MVP027, ISSN 0021-924X, (20090501), pages 693 - 700, JOURNAL OF BIOCHEMISTRY, JAPANESE BIOCHEMICAL SOCIETY / OUP, TOKYO; JP, URL: http://jb.oxfordjournals.org/content/145/5/693, (20090219), XP002677147 [I] 1-7 * page 694, column l, paragraph 2 * * page 694, column r, paragraph 2 * * page 695, column l, paragraph 2 - page 695, column r, paragraph 3; figures 1,2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/JB/MVP027 | [A] - OHASHI ET AL, "Efficient protein selection based on ribosome display system with purified components", BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, ACADEMIC PRESS INC. ORLANDO, FL, US, (20061130), vol. 352, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.BBRC.2006.11.017, ISSN 0006-291X, pages 270 - 276, XP005727956 [A] 1-7 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bbrc.2006.11.017 | [A] - SHIMIZU Y ET AL, "Protein synthesis by pure translation systems", METHODS : A COMPANION TO METHODS IN ENZYMOLOGY, ACADEMIC PRESS INC., NEW YORK, NY, US, vol. 36, no. 3, ISSN 1046-2023, (20050701), pages 299 - 304, (20050731), XP027216576 [A] 1-7 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]JP2007029061 (NAT INST OF ADV IND & TECHNOL); | [A]JP2008271903 (UNIV TOKYO); | [X]JP2009112286 (UEDA TAKUYA); | [A] - OSADA E. ET AL., "Epitope mapping using ribosome display in a reconstituted cell-free protein synthesis system", THE JOURNAL OF BIOCHEMISTRY, (2009), vol. 145, no. 5, pages 693 - 700, XP002677147 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/JB/MVP027 | Examination | - CHO G ET AL, "Constructing high complexity synthetic libraries of long ORFs using In Vitro selection", JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, ACADEMIC PRESS, UNITED KINGDOM, (20000324), vol. 297, no. 2, doi:10.1006/JMBI.2000.3571, ISSN 0022-2836, pages 309 - 319, XP004461609 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/jmbi.2000.3571 | by applicant | JP2008271903 | - NAKATOGAWA; ITO, CELL, (2002), vol. 108, pages 629 - 636 | - GONG ET AL., SCIENCE, (2002), vol. 297, pages 1864 - 1867 | - TANNER ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM, (2009), vol. 284, pages 34809 - 34818 | - HOOD ET AL., ANNU. REV. MICROBIOL, (2009), vol. 63, pages 385 - 409 | - SHIMIZU Y; INOUE A; TOMARI Y; SUZUKI T; YOKOGAWA T; NISHIKAWA K; UEDA T, "Cell-free translation reconstituted with purified components", NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (2001), vol. 19, pages 751 - 755 | - VILLEMAGNE ET AL., J. IMMUNOL. METHODS, (2006), vol. 313, pages 140 - 148 | - MOORE; SAUER, ANNU. REV. BIOCHEM., (2007), vol. 76, pages 101 - 124 | - HANES ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1997), vol. 94, pages 4937 - 4942 | - SHIMIZU ET AL., METHODS, (2005), vol. 36, pages 299 - 304 |