EP2582935 - METHOD PERTAINING TO AIR REMOVAL FROM A HC DOSING SYSTEM AND A HC DOSING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 09.10.2015 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.10.2015 | Withdrawal of application | published on 11.11.2015 [2015/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Scania CV AB (publ) 151 87 Södertälje / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/17] | For all designated states Scania CV AB (publ) 151 87 Södertälje / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ERIKSSON, Lars Grevinnans väg 14 S-153 38 Järna / SE | 02 /
CARLSSON, Ulf Rosenhöjdsvägen 10 5 tr S-152 30 Södertälje / SE | [2013/17] | Representative(s) | Scania CV AB Patents, GP 117kv 151 87 Södertälje / SE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 11798466.6 | 20.06.2011 | WO2011SE50794 | Priority number, date | SE20100050646 | 21.06.2010 Original published format: SE 1050646 | [2013/17] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011162696 | Date: | 29.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2582935 | Date: | 24.04.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.12.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 29.12.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.07.2014 | Classification | IPC: | F01N3/025, F01N3/36, F01N11/00, F01N3/20, F01N9/00 | [2013/17] | CPC: |
F01N9/002 (EP,US);
F01N3/0253 (EP,SE,US);
F01N11/00 (EP,SE,US);
F01N9/00 (EP,US);
F01N2550/05 (EP,US);
F01N2610/03 (SE);
F01N2610/14 (SE);
F01N2610/1433 (SE);
F01N2610/144 (EP,US);
F01N2610/1466 (EP,SE,US);
F01N2900/1808 (EP,US);
F01N3/208 (SE);
Y02T10/40 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/17] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR LUFTBESEITIGUNG AUS EINEM HC-DOSIERSYSTEM SOWIE HC-DOSIERSYSTEM | [2013/17] | English: | METHOD PERTAINING TO AIR REMOVAL FROM A HC DOSING SYSTEM AND A HC DOSING SYSTEM | [2013/17] | French: | PROCÉDÉ EN RAPPORT AVEC L'ÉLIMINATION DE L'AIR D'UN SYSTÈME DE DOSAGE D'HYDROCARBURES ET SYSTÈME DE DOSAGE D'HYDROCARBURES | [2013/17] | Entry into regional phase | 21.01.2013 | National basic fee paid | 21.01.2013 | Search fee paid | 21.01.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.01.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.04.2012 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 21.01.2013 | Examination requested [2013/17] | 27.01.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.10.2015 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US4255088 (NEWTON DAVID W, et al); | [A]WO9745640 (WATERS INVESTMENTS LTD [US]); | [A]WO0224311 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al); | [XP]DE102009056181 (EMITEC EMISSIONSTECHNOLOGIE [DE]) | International search | [A]DE19947197 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | [A]US2004060286 (HUBER SVEN [DE], et al); | [X]DE102008030756 (EMITEC EMISSIONSTECHNOLOGIE [DE]); | [XP]DE102009056181 (EMITEC EMISSIONSTECHNOLOGIE [DE]) |