EP2585026 - MAGNETICALLY-ORIENTED COSMETIC FIBERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 20.03.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.2015 | Withdrawal of application | published on 22.04.2015 [2015/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Avon Products, Inc. 777 Third Avenue New York, NY 10017 / US | [2013/26] |
Former [2013/18] | For all designated states Avon Products, Inc. 1345 Avenue of the Americas New York, NY 10105-0196 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FLEISSMAN, Leona, Giat 402 Stevens Avenue Ridgewood New Jersey 07450 / US | 02 /
ZHENG, Tao 124 Burda Avenue New City New York 10956 / US | [2013/18] | Representative(s) | Dr. Weitzel & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte mbB Friedenstrasse 10 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/18] | Dr. Weitzel & Partner Patentanwälte Friedenstrasse 10 89522 Heidenheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 11798606.7 | 09.06.2011 | WO2011US39740 | Priority number, date | US20100820696 | 22.06.2010 Original published format: US 820696 | [2013/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011162967 | Date: | 29.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2585026 | Date: | 01.05.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.12.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/02, A61K8/18 | [2013/18] | CPC: |
A61K8/27 (EP,US);
A61K8/027 (EP,US);
A61K8/731 (EP,US);
A61K8/8129 (EP,US);
A61K8/88 (EP,US);
A61Q19/00 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/18] | Title | German: | MAGNETISCH ORIENTIERTE KOSMETIKFASERN | [2013/18] | English: | MAGNETICALLY-ORIENTED COSMETIC FIBERS | [2013/18] | French: | FIBRES COSMÉTIQUES ORIENTÉES MAGNÉTIQUEMENT | [2013/18] | Entry into regional phase | 21.08.2012 | National basic fee paid | 21.08.2012 | Search fee paid | 21.08.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.08.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.08.2012 | Examination requested [2013/18] | 10.03.2015 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2010112019 (THEVENET); | [Y]US2008145428 (ZHENG); | [Y]US2002022042 (CASTRO ET AL.); | [A]US2008127990 (THEVENET); | [A]US2005186151 (GIROUD) |