10.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] |
26.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] |
05.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.07.2020 [2020/28] |
13.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.04.2020 [2020/16] |
17.01.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.02.2020 [2020/08] |
24.05.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.06.2019 [2019/26] |
10.05.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.06.2019 [2019/24] |
03.05.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.06.2019 [2019/23] |
19.04.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.05.2019 [2019/21] |
05.04.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.05.2019 [2019/19] |
22.03.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.04.2019 [2019/17] |
08.03.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.04.2019 [2019/15] |
15.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.03.2019 [2019/12] |
15.02.2019 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 20.03.2019 [2019/12] |
01.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.03.2019 [2019/10] |
25.01.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.02.2019 [2019/09] |
18.01.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.02.2019 [2019/08] |
14.12.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.01.2019 [2019/03] |
23.11.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.12.2018 [2018/52] |
16.11.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.12.2018 [2018/51] |
09.11.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.12.2018 [2018/50] |
02.11.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.12.2018 [2018/49] |
19.10.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] |
12.10.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] |
21.09.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.10.2018 [2018/43] |
09.03.2018 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 11.04.2018 [2018/15] |
03.03.2018 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
02.03.2018 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
02.03.2018 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
16.10.2017 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
22.06.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.06.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.07.2015 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
12.06.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.12.2014 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 07.01.2015 [2015/02] |
05.12.2014 |
Change - classification |
published on 07.01.2015 [2015/02] |
05.12.2014 |
Change - classification |
published on 07.01.2015 [2015/02] |
14.11.2014 |
Change - classification |
published on 17.12.2014 [2014/51] |
14.11.2014 |
Change - classification |
published on 17.12.2014 [2014/51] |
05.09.2014 |
New entry: Observations by third parties |
|
03.04.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.10.2013 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
30.08.2013 |
Change - extension states |
published on 02.10.2013 [2013/40] |
14.06.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.03.2013 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 01.05.2013 [2013/18] |
29.03.2013 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 01.05.2013 [2013/18] |
05.02.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.01.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.01.2013 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
13.04.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.01.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.12.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|