Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10954318 | Global Dossier | 23.03.2021 | B2 | US2013090441 | 11.04.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113704064 | 09.06.2011 | US35808510 | 24.06.2010 | WO2011US39772 | 09.06.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5968310B | Global Dossier | 10.08.2016 | B2 | JP2013533342 | 22.08.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US35808510 | 24.06.2010 | WO2011US39772 | 09.06.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102958987 | Global Dossier | 06.03.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US35808510 | 24.06.2010 | WO2011US39772 | 09.06.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2585521 | Global Dossier | 11.04.2018 | B1 | EP2585521 | 07.01.2015 | A4 | EP2585521 | 01.05.2013 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US35808510 | 24.06.2010 | WO2011US39772 | 09.06.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2011162971 | Global Dossier | 12.04.2012 | A3 | WO2011162971 | 29.12.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US35808510 | 24.06.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6300852B | Global Dossier | 28.03.2018 | B2 | JP2016172853 | 29.09.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US35808510 | 24.06.2010 |