Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102972009B | Global Dossier | 29.06.2016 | B | CN102972009 | 13.03.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2011CN76745 | 01.07.2011 | US201113081064 | 06.04.2011 | US36124410 | 02.07.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2586183 | Global Dossier | 13.12.2017 | B1 | EP2586183 | 24.07.2013 | A4 | EP2586183 | 01.05.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2011CN76745 | 01.07.2011 | US201113081064 | 06.04.2011 | US36124410 | 02.07.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2012000452 | Global Dossier | 05.01.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113081064 | 06.04.2011 | US36124410 | 02.07.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8751638 | Global Dossier | 10.06.2014 | B2 | US2012005371 | 05.01.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113081064 | 06.04.2011 | US36124410 | 02.07.2010 |