EP2586448 - SKIN PROPERTIES IMPROVING AGENT FOR ORAL ADMINISTRATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.12.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.01.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Yakult Honsha 1-19, Higashi-Shinbashi 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8660 / JP | [2018/06] |
Former [2013/18] | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Yakult Honsha 1-19, Higashi Shimbashi 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8660 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MASUOKA, Norie c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Yakult Honsha 1-19, Higashi-Shinbashi 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8660 / JP | 02 /
KANO, Mitsuyoshi c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Yakult Honsha 1-19, Higashi-Shinbashi 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8660 / JP | 03 /
MIYAZAKI, Kouji c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Yakult Honsha 1-19, Higashi-Shinbashi 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8660 / JP | 04 /
SONE, Toshiro c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Yakult Honsha 1-19, Higashi-Shinbashi 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8660 / JP | [2018/05] |
Former [2013/18] | 01 /
MASUOKA, Norie c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Yakult Honsha 1-19 Higashi Shinbashi 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8660 / JP | ||
02 /
KANO, Mitsuyoshi c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Yakult Honsha 1-19 Higashi Shinbashi 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8660 / JP | |||
03 /
MIYAZAKI, Kouji c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Yakult Honsha 1-19 Higashi Shinbashi 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8660 / JP | |||
04 /
SONE, Toshiro c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Yakult Honsha 1-19 Higashi Shinbashi 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8660 / JP | Representative(s) | Blodig, Wolfgang Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Weinstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | [2018/06] |
Former [2013/18] | Blodig, Wolfgang Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwaltspartnerschaft Ottostrasse 4 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11800786.3 | 27.06.2011 | [2018/06] | WO2011JP64681 | Priority number, date | JP20100145766 | 28.06.2010 Original published format: JP 2010145766 | [2013/18] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012002322 | Date: | 05.01.2012 | Language: | JA | [2012/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2586448 | Date: | 01.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2586448 | Date: | 07.02.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 05.01.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.12.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/702, A61K35/20, A23C9/12, A61K35/744, A61K35/745, A61P17/00, A61P17/16, A23L33/135 | [2017/37] | CPC: |
A61K31/702 (EP,KR,US);
A61K35/745 (EP,KR,US);
A61K35/74 (US);
A23L33/135 (EP,KR,US);
A61K35/20 (EP,KR,US);
A61K35/744 (EP,US);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/16 (EP);
A23V2002/00 (EP,KR,US);
A23V2200/3204 (KR)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A23V2002/00, A23V2200/318, A23V2200/3204 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/03] | A61K35/20, A23C9/12, A61K31/702, A61K35/74, A61P17/00, A61P17/16, A23L1/30 | ||
Former IPC [2013/18] | A61K35/20, A23C9/12, A61K31/702, A61K35/74, A61P17/00, A61P17/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MÜNDLICH VERABREICHTES MITTEL ZUR VERBESSERUNG DER HAUTEIGENSCHAFTEN | [2013/18] | English: | SKIN PROPERTIES IMPROVING AGENT FOR ORAL ADMINISTRATION | [2013/18] | French: | AGENT D'AMÉLIORATION DES PROPRIÉTÉS CUTANÉES, DESTINÉ À ÊTRE ADMINISTRÉ PAR VOIE ORALE | [2013/18] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 20.12.2012 | Translation filed | 20.12.2012 | National basic fee paid | 20.12.2012 | Search fee paid | 20.12.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.12.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.12.2012 | Examination requested [2013/18] | 18.06.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.01.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.09.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.12.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 21.12.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.12.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.09.2015 | Opposition(s) | 08.11.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.06.2011 | AL | 07.02.2018 | AT | 07.02.2018 | CY | 07.02.2018 | CZ | 07.02.2018 | DK | 07.02.2018 | EE | 07.02.2018 | ES | 07.02.2018 | FI | 07.02.2018 | HR | 07.02.2018 | IT | 07.02.2018 | LT | 07.02.2018 | LV | 07.02.2018 | MC | 07.02.2018 | MK | 07.02.2018 | NL | 07.02.2018 | PL | 07.02.2018 | PT | 07.02.2018 | RO | 07.02.2018 | RS | 07.02.2018 | SE | 07.02.2018 | SI | 07.02.2018 | SK | 07.02.2018 | SM | 07.02.2018 | TR | 07.02.2018 | BG | 07.05.2018 | NO | 07.05.2018 | GR | 08.05.2018 | IS | 07.06.2018 | IE | 27.06.2018 | LU | 27.06.2018 | MT | 27.06.2018 | BE | 30.06.2018 | CH | 30.06.2018 | LI | 30.06.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 27.06.2011 | |
AL | 07.02.2018 | ||
AT | 07.02.2018 | ||
CY | 07.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.02.2018 | ||
DK | 07.02.2018 | ||
EE | 07.02.2018 | ||
ES | 07.02.2018 | ||
FI | 07.02.2018 | ||
HR | 07.02.2018 | ||
IT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LV | 07.02.2018 | ||
MC | 07.02.2018 | ||
NL | 07.02.2018 | ||
PL | 07.02.2018 | ||
PT | 07.02.2018 | ||
RO | 07.02.2018 | ||
RS | 07.02.2018 | ||
SE | 07.02.2018 | ||
SI | 07.02.2018 | ||
SK | 07.02.2018 | ||
SM | 07.02.2018 | ||
TR | 07.02.2018 | ||
BG | 07.05.2018 | ||
NO | 07.05.2018 | ||
GR | 08.05.2018 | ||
IS | 07.06.2018 | ||
IE | 27.06.2018 | ||
LU | 27.06.2018 | ||
MT | 27.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 07.02.2018 | |
AT | 07.02.2018 | ||
CY | 07.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.02.2018 | ||
DK | 07.02.2018 | ||
EE | 07.02.2018 | ||
ES | 07.02.2018 | ||
FI | 07.02.2018 | ||
HR | 07.02.2018 | ||
IT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LV | 07.02.2018 | ||
MC | 07.02.2018 | ||
NL | 07.02.2018 | ||
PL | 07.02.2018 | ||
RO | 07.02.2018 | ||
RS | 07.02.2018 | ||
SE | 07.02.2018 | ||
SI | 07.02.2018 | ||
SK | 07.02.2018 | ||
SM | 07.02.2018 | ||
TR | 07.02.2018 | ||
BG | 07.05.2018 | ||
NO | 07.05.2018 | ||
GR | 08.05.2018 | ||
IS | 07.06.2018 | ||
IE | 27.06.2018 | ||
LU | 27.06.2018 | ||
MT | 27.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 07.02.2018 | |
AT | 07.02.2018 | ||
CY | 07.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.02.2018 | ||
DK | 07.02.2018 | ||
EE | 07.02.2018 | ||
ES | 07.02.2018 | ||
FI | 07.02.2018 | ||
HR | 07.02.2018 | ||
IT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LV | 07.02.2018 | ||
MC | 07.02.2018 | ||
NL | 07.02.2018 | ||
PL | 07.02.2018 | ||
RO | 07.02.2018 | ||
RS | 07.02.2018 | ||
SE | 07.02.2018 | ||
SI | 07.02.2018 | ||
SK | 07.02.2018 | ||
SM | 07.02.2018 | ||
BG | 07.05.2018 | ||
NO | 07.05.2018 | ||
GR | 08.05.2018 | ||
IS | 07.06.2018 | ||
IE | 27.06.2018 | ||
LU | 27.06.2018 | ||
MT | 27.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AL | 07.02.2018 | |
AT | 07.02.2018 | ||
CY | 07.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.02.2018 | ||
DK | 07.02.2018 | ||
EE | 07.02.2018 | ||
ES | 07.02.2018 | ||
FI | 07.02.2018 | ||
HR | 07.02.2018 | ||
IT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LV | 07.02.2018 | ||
MC | 07.02.2018 | ||
NL | 07.02.2018 | ||
PL | 07.02.2018 | ||
RO | 07.02.2018 | ||
RS | 07.02.2018 | ||
SE | 07.02.2018 | ||
SI | 07.02.2018 | ||
SK | 07.02.2018 | ||
SM | 07.02.2018 | ||
BG | 07.05.2018 | ||
NO | 07.05.2018 | ||
GR | 08.05.2018 | ||
IS | 07.06.2018 | ||
IE | 27.06.2018 | ||
LU | 27.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 07.02.2018 | |
AT | 07.02.2018 | ||
CY | 07.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.02.2018 | ||
DK | 07.02.2018 | ||
EE | 07.02.2018 | ||
ES | 07.02.2018 | ||
FI | 07.02.2018 | ||
HR | 07.02.2018 | ||
IT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LV | 07.02.2018 | ||
MC | 07.02.2018 | ||
NL | 07.02.2018 | ||
PL | 07.02.2018 | ||
RO | 07.02.2018 | ||
RS | 07.02.2018 | ||
SE | 07.02.2018 | ||
SI | 07.02.2018 | ||
SK | 07.02.2018 | ||
SM | 07.02.2018 | ||
BG | 07.05.2018 | ||
NO | 07.05.2018 | ||
GR | 08.05.2018 | ||
IS | 07.06.2018 | ||
IE | 27.06.2018 | ||
LU | 27.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/19] | AL | 07.02.2018 | |
AT | 07.02.2018 | ||
CY | 07.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.02.2018 | ||
DK | 07.02.2018 | ||
EE | 07.02.2018 | ||
ES | 07.02.2018 | ||
FI | 07.02.2018 | ||
HR | 07.02.2018 | ||
IT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LV | 07.02.2018 | ||
MC | 07.02.2018 | ||
NL | 07.02.2018 | ||
PL | 07.02.2018 | ||
RO | 07.02.2018 | ||
RS | 07.02.2018 | ||
SE | 07.02.2018 | ||
SI | 07.02.2018 | ||
SK | 07.02.2018 | ||
SM | 07.02.2018 | ||
BG | 07.05.2018 | ||
NO | 07.05.2018 | ||
GR | 08.05.2018 | ||
IS | 07.06.2018 | ||
IE | 27.06.2018 | ||
LU | 27.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/17] | AL | 07.02.2018 | |
AT | 07.02.2018 | ||
CY | 07.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.02.2018 | ||
DK | 07.02.2018 | ||
EE | 07.02.2018 | ||
ES | 07.02.2018 | ||
FI | 07.02.2018 | ||
HR | 07.02.2018 | ||
IT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LV | 07.02.2018 | ||
MC | 07.02.2018 | ||
NL | 07.02.2018 | ||
PL | 07.02.2018 | ||
RO | 07.02.2018 | ||
RS | 07.02.2018 | ||
SE | 07.02.2018 | ||
SI | 07.02.2018 | ||
SK | 07.02.2018 | ||
SM | 07.02.2018 | ||
BG | 07.05.2018 | ||
NO | 07.05.2018 | ||
GR | 08.05.2018 | ||
IS | 07.06.2018 | ||
LU | 27.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | AL | 07.02.2018 | |
AT | 07.02.2018 | ||
CY | 07.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.02.2018 | ||
DK | 07.02.2018 | ||
EE | 07.02.2018 | ||
ES | 07.02.2018 | ||
FI | 07.02.2018 | ||
HR | 07.02.2018 | ||
IT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LV | 07.02.2018 | ||
MC | 07.02.2018 | ||
NL | 07.02.2018 | ||
PL | 07.02.2018 | ||
RO | 07.02.2018 | ||
RS | 07.02.2018 | ||
SE | 07.02.2018 | ||
SI | 07.02.2018 | ||
SK | 07.02.2018 | ||
SM | 07.02.2018 | ||
BG | 07.05.2018 | ||
NO | 07.05.2018 | ||
GR | 08.05.2018 | ||
IS | 07.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | AL | 07.02.2018 | |
AT | 07.02.2018 | ||
CY | 07.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.02.2018 | ||
DK | 07.02.2018 | ||
EE | 07.02.2018 | ||
ES | 07.02.2018 | ||
FI | 07.02.2018 | ||
HR | 07.02.2018 | ||
IT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LV | 07.02.2018 | ||
NL | 07.02.2018 | ||
PL | 07.02.2018 | ||
RO | 07.02.2018 | ||
RS | 07.02.2018 | ||
SE | 07.02.2018 | ||
SI | 07.02.2018 | ||
SK | 07.02.2018 | ||
SM | 07.02.2018 | ||
BG | 07.05.2018 | ||
NO | 07.05.2018 | ||
GR | 08.05.2018 | ||
IS | 07.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 07.02.2018 | |
AT | 07.02.2018 | ||
CY | 07.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.02.2018 | ||
DK | 07.02.2018 | ||
EE | 07.02.2018 | ||
ES | 07.02.2018 | ||
FI | 07.02.2018 | ||
HR | 07.02.2018 | ||
IT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LV | 07.02.2018 | ||
NL | 07.02.2018 | ||
PL | 07.02.2018 | ||
RO | 07.02.2018 | ||
RS | 07.02.2018 | ||
SE | 07.02.2018 | ||
SK | 07.02.2018 | ||
SM | 07.02.2018 | ||
BG | 07.05.2018 | ||
NO | 07.05.2018 | ||
GR | 08.05.2018 | ||
IS | 07.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AL | 07.02.2018 | |
AT | 07.02.2018 | ||
CY | 07.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.02.2018 | ||
DK | 07.02.2018 | ||
EE | 07.02.2018 | ||
ES | 07.02.2018 | ||
FI | 07.02.2018 | ||
HR | 07.02.2018 | ||
IT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LV | 07.02.2018 | ||
NL | 07.02.2018 | ||
PL | 07.02.2018 | ||
RO | 07.02.2018 | ||
RS | 07.02.2018 | ||
SE | 07.02.2018 | ||
SK | 07.02.2018 | ||
BG | 07.05.2018 | ||
NO | 07.05.2018 | ||
GR | 08.05.2018 | ||
IS | 07.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 07.02.2018 | |
AT | 07.02.2018 | ||
CY | 07.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.02.2018 | ||
EE | 07.02.2018 | ||
ES | 07.02.2018 | ||
FI | 07.02.2018 | ||
HR | 07.02.2018 | ||
IT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LV | 07.02.2018 | ||
NL | 07.02.2018 | ||
PL | 07.02.2018 | ||
RO | 07.02.2018 | ||
RS | 07.02.2018 | ||
SE | 07.02.2018 | ||
SK | 07.02.2018 | ||
BG | 07.05.2018 | ||
NO | 07.05.2018 | ||
GR | 08.05.2018 | ||
IS | 07.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AL | 07.02.2018 | |
AT | 07.02.2018 | ||
CY | 07.02.2018 | ||
ES | 07.02.2018 | ||
FI | 07.02.2018 | ||
HR | 07.02.2018 | ||
IT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LV | 07.02.2018 | ||
NL | 07.02.2018 | ||
PL | 07.02.2018 | ||
RS | 07.02.2018 | ||
SE | 07.02.2018 | ||
BG | 07.05.2018 | ||
NO | 07.05.2018 | ||
GR | 08.05.2018 | ||
IS | 07.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 07.02.2018 | |
AT | 07.02.2018 | ||
CY | 07.02.2018 | ||
ES | 07.02.2018 | ||
FI | 07.02.2018 | ||
HR | 07.02.2018 | ||
LT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LV | 07.02.2018 | ||
NL | 07.02.2018 | ||
PL | 07.02.2018 | ||
RS | 07.02.2018 | ||
SE | 07.02.2018 | ||
BG | 07.05.2018 | ||
NO | 07.05.2018 | ||
GR | 08.05.2018 | ||
IS | 07.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 07.02.2018 | |
CY | 07.02.2018 | ||
ES | 07.02.2018 | ||
FI | 07.02.2018 | ||
HR | 07.02.2018 | ||
LT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LV | 07.02.2018 | ||
NL | 07.02.2018 | ||
PL | 07.02.2018 | ||
RS | 07.02.2018 | ||
SE | 07.02.2018 | ||
BG | 07.05.2018 | ||
NO | 07.05.2018 | ||
GR | 08.05.2018 | ||
IS | 07.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 07.02.2018 | |
CY | 07.02.2018 | ||
ES | 07.02.2018 | ||
FI | 07.02.2018 | ||
HR | 07.02.2018 | ||
LT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LV | 07.02.2018 | ||
NL | 07.02.2018 | ||
PL | 07.02.2018 | ||
RS | 07.02.2018 | ||
SE | 07.02.2018 | ||
NO | 07.05.2018 | ||
GR | 08.05.2018 | ||
IS | 07.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 07.02.2018 | |
ES | 07.02.2018 | ||
FI | 07.02.2018 | ||
HR | 07.02.2018 | ||
LT | 07.02.2018 | ||
NL | 07.02.2018 | ||
PL | 07.02.2018 | ||
NO | 07.05.2018 | ||
GR | 08.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/36] | CY | 07.02.2018 | |
ES | 07.02.2018 | ||
FI | 07.02.2018 | ||
HR | 07.02.2018 | ||
LT | 07.02.2018 | ||
NL | 07.02.2018 | ||
PL | 07.02.2018 | ||
NO | 07.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 07.02.2018 | |
FI | 07.02.2018 | ||
HR | 07.02.2018 | ||
LT | 07.02.2018 | ||
NL | 07.02.2018 | ||
NO | 07.05.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2003133921 (OHISHI KENJI [JP], et al) [X] 1-8 * paragraph [0255] * * paragraph [0260] *; | [X] - MENARD S ET AL, "Stimulation of immunity without alteration of oral tolerance in mice fed with heat-treated fermented infant formula", JOURNAL OF PEDIATRIC GASTROENTEROLOGY AND NUTRITION, LIPPINCOTT WILLIAMS WILKINS, INC, US, (20060101), vol. 43, doi:10.1097/01.MPG.0000239738.71864.19, ISSN 0277-2116, pages 451 - 458, XP003027716 [X] 1,2,7,8 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/01.mpg.0000239738.71864.19 | International search | [X]JPH07265064 (YAMADA TAKETOSHI, et al); | [X]JPH10286078 (SITIA YOMO SPA); | [X]WO03040350 (YAKULT HONSHA KK [JP], et al); | [A]WO2005018653 (NIHON KEFIR CO LTD [JP], et al); | [A]JP2005525348 (SCIETE DES PRODUITS NESTLE S.A.); | [Y]JP2007039423 (MEIJI MILK PROD CO LTD); | [Y]WO2008026318 (YAKULT HONSHA KK [JP], et al); | [Y]JP2009114080 (ICREO CO LTD); | [X]WO2009151331 (NUTRICIA NV [NL], et al); | [Y]JP2010006757 (YAKULT HONSHA KK) | by applicant | JP2001252048 | JP2005206578 | JP2007039423 | JP2010006757 |