12.10.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] |
20.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] |
13.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] |
29.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.08.2018 [2018/31] |
15.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.07.2018 [2018/29] |
08.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.07.2018 [2018/28] |
18.08.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.09.2017 [2017/38] |
19.05.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.06.2017 [2017/25] |
07.04.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.05.2017 [2017/19] |
17.03.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.04.2017 [2017/16] |
13.01.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.02.2017 [2017/07] |
16.12.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.01.2017 [2017/03] |
18.11.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.12.2016 [2016/51] |
11.11.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.12.2016 [2016/50] |
11.11.2016 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 14.12.2016 [2016/50] |
04.11.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.12.2016 [2016/49] |
14.10.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.11.2016 [2016/46] |
26.08.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.09.2016 [2016/39] |
19.08.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.09.2016 [2016/38] |
05.08.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.09.2016 [2016/36] |
29.07.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.08.2016 [2016/35] |
24.06.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.07.2016 [2016/30] |
04.12.2015 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 06.01.2016 [2016/01] |
09.11.2015 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
09.11.2015 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
06.11.2015 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
14.10.2015 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
14.08.2015 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
21.07.2015 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] |
17.07.2015 |
Change - classification |
published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] |
03.07.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.05.2015 |
Change - applicant |
published on 24.06.2015 [2015/26] |
20.05.2015 |
Change - representative |
|
04.07.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.06.2014 |
Change - extension states |
published on 30.07.2014 [2014/31] |
01.11.2013 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
30.08.2013 |
Change - classification |
published on 02.10.2013 [2013/40] |
30.08.2013 |
Change - PCT data |
published on 02.10.2013 [2013/40] |
23.08.2013 |
Change - PCT data |
published on 25.09.2013 [2013/39] |
04.07.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.04.2013 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 08.05.2013 [2013/19] |
05.04.2013 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 08.05.2013 [2013/19] |
14.09.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.08.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.08.2012 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
14.08.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.01.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.01.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|