EP2658797 - CONVEYING CHAIN FOR A CONVEYING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.04.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.02.2019 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 27.03.2019 [2019/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ferag AG Zürichstrasse 74 8340 Hinwil / CH | [2013/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STUDER, Beat Hanflandstrasse 21 CH-8340 Hinwil / CH | [2013/45] | Representative(s) | Frei Patent Attorneys Frei Patentanwaltsbüro AG Hagenholzstrasse 85 8050 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2016/23] | Frei Patent Attorneys Frei Patentanwaltsbüro AG Postfach 1771 8032 Zürich / CH | ||
Former [2013/45] | Frei Patent Attorneys Frei Patentanwaltsbüro AG Postfach 1771 8032 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 11801543.7 | 19.12.2011 | [2016/23] | WO2011CH00302 | Priority number, date | CH20100002180 | 27.12.2010 Original published format: CH 21802010 | [2013/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012088615 | Date: | 05.07.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/27] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2658797 | Date: | 06.11.2013 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.07.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2658797 | Date: | 08.06.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.08.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B65G17/38, F16G13/10 | [2013/45] | CPC: |
B65G17/385 (EP,US);
F16G13/10 (EP,KR,US);
B65G17/26 (US);
B65G17/38 (KR);
F16G13/07 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/45] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FÖRDERKETTE FÜR EINE FÖRDEREINRICHTUNG | [2013/45] | English: | CONVEYING CHAIN FOR A CONVEYING DEVICE | [2013/45] | French: | CHAÎNE DE TRANSPORT POUR DISPOSITIF DE TRANSPORT | [2013/45] | Entry into regional phase | 25.05.2013 | National basic fee paid | 25.05.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.05.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.05.2013 | Examination requested [2013/45] | 29.01.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.01.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.04.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 25.04.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.04.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.07.2014 | Opposition(s) | 09.03.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.12.2011 | AL | 08.06.2016 | BG | 08.06.2016 | CY | 08.06.2016 | CZ | 08.06.2016 | DK | 08.06.2016 | EE | 08.06.2016 | FI | 08.06.2016 | HR | 08.06.2016 | LT | 08.06.2016 | LV | 08.06.2016 | MC | 08.06.2016 | MK | 08.06.2016 | MT | 08.06.2016 | NL | 08.06.2016 | PL | 08.06.2016 | RO | 08.06.2016 | RS | 08.06.2016 | SI | 08.06.2016 | SK | 08.06.2016 | SM | 08.06.2016 | TR | 08.06.2016 | NO | 08.09.2016 | GR | 09.09.2016 | IS | 08.10.2016 | PT | 10.10.2016 | IE | 19.12.2016 | LU | 19.12.2016 | ES | 20.12.2016 | BE | 31.12.2016 | [2019/13] |
Former [2018/46] | HU | 19.12.2011 | |
AL | 08.06.2016 | ||
BG | 08.06.2016 | ||
CY | 08.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2016 | ||
DK | 08.06.2016 | ||
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
MC | 08.06.2016 | ||
MK | 08.06.2016 | ||
MT | 08.06.2016 | ||
NL | 08.06.2016 | ||
PL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
SI | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
SM | 08.06.2016 | ||
TR | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
PT | 10.10.2016 | ||
IE | 19.12.2016 | ||
LU | 19.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/45] | HU | 19.12.2011 | |
BG | 08.06.2016 | ||
CY | 08.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2016 | ||
DK | 08.06.2016 | ||
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
MC | 08.06.2016 | ||
MK | 08.06.2016 | ||
MT | 08.06.2016 | ||
NL | 08.06.2016 | ||
PL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
SI | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
SM | 08.06.2016 | ||
TR | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
PT | 10.10.2016 | ||
IE | 19.12.2016 | ||
LU | 19.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/43] | HU | 19.12.2011 | |
BG | 08.06.2016 | ||
CY | 08.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2016 | ||
DK | 08.06.2016 | ||
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
MC | 08.06.2016 | ||
MK | 08.06.2016 | ||
MT | 08.06.2016 | ||
NL | 08.06.2016 | ||
PL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
SI | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
SM | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
PT | 10.10.2016 | ||
IE | 19.12.2016 | ||
LU | 19.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/38] | HU | 19.12.2011 | |
BG | 08.06.2016 | ||
CY | 08.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2016 | ||
DK | 08.06.2016 | ||
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
MC | 08.06.2016 | ||
MK | 08.06.2016 | ||
NL | 08.06.2016 | ||
PL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
SI | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
SM | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
PT | 10.10.2016 | ||
IE | 19.12.2016 | ||
LU | 19.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 19.12.2011 | |
CY | 08.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2016 | ||
DK | 08.06.2016 | ||
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
MC | 08.06.2016 | ||
MK | 08.06.2016 | ||
NL | 08.06.2016 | ||
PL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
SI | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
SM | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
PT | 10.10.2016 | ||
IE | 19.12.2016 | ||
LU | 19.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/49] | CZ | 08.06.2016 | |
DK | 08.06.2016 | ||
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
MC | 08.06.2016 | ||
NL | 08.06.2016 | ||
PL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
SI | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
SM | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
PT | 10.10.2016 | ||
IE | 19.12.2016 | ||
LU | 19.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/47] | CZ | 08.06.2016 | |
DK | 08.06.2016 | ||
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
MC | 08.06.2016 | ||
NL | 08.06.2016 | ||
PL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
SI | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
SM | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
PT | 10.10.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/36] | CZ | 08.06.2016 | |
DK | 08.06.2016 | ||
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
NL | 08.06.2016 | ||
PL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
SI | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
SM | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
PT | 10.10.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | CZ | 08.06.2016 | |
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
NL | 08.06.2016 | ||
PL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
SM | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
PT | 10.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | CZ | 08.06.2016 | |
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
NL | 08.06.2016 | ||
PL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | CZ | 08.06.2016 | |
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
NL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | FI | 08.06.2016 | |
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
NL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | FI | 08.06.2016 | |
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | FI | 08.06.2016 | |
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 08.06.2016 | |
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 08.06.2016 | |
NO | 08.09.2016 | Cited in | International search | [XY]US2008132369 (PAUL SURENDAR [US]) [X] 1-3,6,10,11,13,14,21-23 * pages 1-5; figures 1-6 * [Y] 7,8; | [X]FR2564810 (FABER SA [FR]) [X] 1,4,5,9 * pages 1-5; figures 1,2 *; | [X]FR2846642 (GEBO IND [FR]) [X] 1 * pages 1-12; figures 1-3 *; | [X]US4220052 (SHELDON JEROME F [US]) [X] 1,15-18,21,24 * columns 1-6; figures 1-6 *; | [Y]EP1932781 (REXNORD IND LLC [US]) [Y] 7,8 * columns 1-10; figures 1-13 *; | [A]FR2319818 (FERAG AG [CH]) [A] 1 * pages 1-6; figures 1-3 *; | [A]FR2252268 (FMC CORP [US]) [A] 1 * pages 1-5; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US4353459 (PETERSHACK VICTOR D) [A] 7 * columns 1-6; figures 1-4 * | by applicant | FR2232497 | DE2629528 | EP1832532 | CH592562 |