|
25.04.2018 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.06.2017 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.05.2017 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.05.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.05.2017 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.05.2017 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.05.2017 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.05.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.03.2017 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.03.2017 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
09.03.2017 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.03.2017 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
09.03.2017 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
01.03.2017 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.03.2017 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.03.2017 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.08.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.08.2016 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.08.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.08.2016 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.04.2016 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.04.2016 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.04.2016 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.07.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.07.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.07.2014 |
Statement of non-availability of priority search results |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.05.2014 |
Invitation to file a copy of search results(priority) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.03.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.03.2014 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.03.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.03.2014 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.03.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.12.2013 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.09.2013 |
Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.09.2013 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.09.2013 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.09.2013 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.09.2013 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.09.2013 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.09.2013 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.09.2013 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.09.2013 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.09.2013 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.09.2013 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.09.2013 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
31.07.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.07.2013 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
05.07.2013 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.06.2013 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.06.2013 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
18.09.2012 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
30.08.2012 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.08.2012 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.08.2012 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
15.02.2012 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
15.02.2012 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
15.02.2012 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
14.12.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
14.12.2011 |
Abstract |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
14.12.2011 |
Claims |
PCT receiving Office |
3 |
|
14.12.2011 |
Description |
PCT receiving Office |
15 |