Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8946463 | Global Dossier | 03.02.2015 | B2 | US2013331580 | 12.12.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2011EP72771 | 14.12.2011 | DE102011004472 | 21.02.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5933599B | Global Dossier | 15.06.2016 | B2 | JP2014513667 | 05.06.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2011EP72771 | 14.12.2011 | DE102011004472 | 21.02.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103370302B | Global Dossier | 17.06.2015 | B | CN103370302 | 23.10.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2011EP72771 | 14.12.2011 | DE102011004472 | 21.02.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2678306 | Global Dossier | 21.06.2017 | B1 | EP2678306 | 01.01.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2011EP72771 | 14.12.2011 | DE102011004472 | 21.02.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112013021208 | 24.09.2019 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2011EP72771 | 14.12.2011 | DE102011004472 | 21.02.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2826415 | 30.08.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2011EP72771 | 14.12.2011 | DE102011004472 | 21.02.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2013142804 | 27.03.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2011EP72771 | 14.12.2011 | DE102011004472 | 21.02.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2012113475 | Global Dossier | 30.08.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102011004472 | 21.02.2011 |