EP2678306 - PROCESS FOR THE DIRECT AMINATION OF ALCOHOLS USING AMMONIA TO FORM PRIMARY AMINES BY MEANS OF A XANTPHOS CATALYST SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.04.2018 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.05.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Evonik Degussa GmbH Rellinghauser Straße 1-11 45128 Essen / DE | [2017/25] |
Former [2014/01] | For all designated states Evonik Degussa GmbH Rellinghauser Straße 1- 11 45128 Essen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KLASOVSKY, Florian Wielandstraße 14 45721 Haltern am See / DE | 02 /
TACKE, Thomas Rannenbergring 20 63755 Alzenau / DE | 03 /
PFEFFER, Jan, Christoph Schloßstr. 37 45355 Essen / DE | 04 /
HAAS, Thomas Backenkamp 9 48161 Münster / DE | 05 /
BELLER, Matthias Kliffstr. 11 18211 Nienhagen / DE | 06 /
MARTIN, Andreas Bohndorfer Weg 35e 12524 Berlin / DE | 07 /
DEUTSCH, Jens Goethestraße 21 15834 Rangsdorf / DE | 08 /
KÖCKRITZ, Angela Dammweg 61 12437 Berlin / DE | 09 /
IMM, Sebastian Hüttengesässer 21 63505 Langenselbold / DE | 10 /
HABERLAND, Jürgen Dahlienstr. 26 45721 Haltern am See / DE | [2014/01] | Application number, filing date | 11802039.5 | 14.12.2011 | [2017/25] | WO2011EP72771 | Priority number, date | DE20111004472 | 21.02.2011 Original published format: DE102011004472 | [2014/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012113475 | Date: | 30.08.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2678306 | Date: | 01.01.2014 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.08.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2678306 | Date: | 21.06.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.08.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C07C209/16, C07C213/02, C07C227/08, C07D213/38, C07D493/04, C07C211/07, C07C211/27, C07C211/35, C07C211/38, C07C217/08, C07C229/08, C07C229/38 | [2014/01] | CPC: |
C07C209/16 (EP,US);
C07C213/02 (EP,US);
C07C227/06 (US);
C07C227/08 (EP,US);
C07D213/38 (EP,US);
C07D493/04 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C07C209/16, C07C211/07 (US,EP);
C07C209/16, C07C211/27 (US,EP);
C07C209/16, C07C211/35 (US,EP);
C07C209/16, C07C211/38 (US,EP);
C07C213/02, C07C217/08 (EP,US);
C07C227/08, C07C229/08 (EP,US); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR DIREKTEN AMINIERUNG VON ALKOHOLEN MIT AMMONIAK ZU PRIMÄREN AMINEN MITTELS EINES XANTPHOS KATALYSATORSYSTEMS | [2014/01] | English: | PROCESS FOR THE DIRECT AMINATION OF ALCOHOLS USING AMMONIA TO FORM PRIMARY AMINES BY MEANS OF A XANTPHOS CATALYST SYSTEM | [2014/01] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR L'AMINATION DIRECTE D'ALCOOLS AVEC DE L'AMMONIAQUE EN AMINES PRIMAIRES AU MOYEN D'UN SYSTÈME CATALYTIQUE AU XANTPHOS | [2014/01] | Entry into regional phase | 31.07.2013 | National basic fee paid | 31.07.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.07.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.07.2013 | Examination requested [2014/01] | 18.03.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.04.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.08.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.05.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 11.05.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.05.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.04.2016 | Opposition(s) | 22.03.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.12.2011 | AL | 21.06.2017 | CY | 21.06.2017 | CZ | 21.06.2017 | DK | 21.06.2017 | EE | 21.06.2017 | ES | 21.06.2017 | FI | 21.06.2017 | HR | 21.06.2017 | IT | 21.06.2017 | LT | 21.06.2017 | LV | 21.06.2017 | MC | 21.06.2017 | MK | 21.06.2017 | MT | 21.06.2017 | PL | 21.06.2017 | PT | 21.06.2017 | RO | 21.06.2017 | RS | 21.06.2017 | SE | 21.06.2017 | SI | 21.06.2017 | SK | 21.06.2017 | SM | 21.06.2017 | TR | 21.06.2017 | BG | 21.09.2017 | NO | 21.09.2017 | GR | 22.09.2017 | IS | 21.10.2017 | AT | 14.12.2017 | IE | 14.12.2017 | LU | 14.12.2017 | CH | 31.12.2017 | LI | 31.12.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 14.12.2011 | |
CY | 21.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
DK | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
ES | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
IT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
MC | 21.06.2017 | ||
MK | 21.06.2017 | ||
MT | 21.06.2017 | ||
PL | 21.06.2017 | ||
PT | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
RS | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SI | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
SM | 21.06.2017 | ||
TR | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
AT | 14.12.2017 | ||
IE | 14.12.2017 | ||
LU | 14.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | HU | 14.12.2011 | |
CY | 21.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
DK | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
ES | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
IT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
MC | 21.06.2017 | ||
MK | 21.06.2017 | ||
MT | 21.06.2017 | ||
PL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
RS | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SI | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
SM | 21.06.2017 | ||
TR | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
AT | 14.12.2017 | ||
IE | 14.12.2017 | ||
LU | 14.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 14.12.2011 | |
CY | 21.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
DK | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
ES | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
IT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
MC | 21.06.2017 | ||
MK | 21.06.2017 | ||
MT | 21.06.2017 | ||
PL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
RS | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SI | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
SM | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
AT | 14.12.2017 | ||
IE | 14.12.2017 | ||
LU | 14.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 14.12.2011 | |
CY | 21.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
DK | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
ES | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
IT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
MC | 21.06.2017 | ||
MT | 21.06.2017 | ||
PL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
RS | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SI | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
SM | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
AT | 14.12.2017 | ||
IE | 14.12.2017 | ||
LU | 14.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 14.12.2011 | |
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
DK | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
ES | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
IT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
MC | 21.06.2017 | ||
MT | 21.06.2017 | ||
PL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
RS | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SI | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
SM | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
AT | 14.12.2017 | ||
IE | 14.12.2017 | ||
LU | 14.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/30] | CZ | 21.06.2017 | |
DK | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
ES | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
IT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
MC | 21.06.2017 | ||
MT | 21.06.2017 | ||
PL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
RS | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SI | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
SM | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
AT | 14.12.2017 | ||
IE | 14.12.2017 | ||
LU | 14.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/23] | CZ | 21.06.2017 | |
DK | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
ES | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
IT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
MT | 21.06.2017 | ||
PL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
RS | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SI | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
SM | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
AT | 14.12.2017 | ||
IE | 14.12.2017 | ||
LU | 14.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/52] | CZ | 21.06.2017 | |
DK | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
ES | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
IT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
MT | 21.06.2017 | ||
PL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
RS | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SI | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
SM | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
IE | 14.12.2017 | ||
LU | 14.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/45] | CZ | 21.06.2017 | |
DK | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
ES | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
IT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
MT | 21.06.2017 | ||
PL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
RS | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SI | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
SM | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
IE | 14.12.2017 | ||
LU | 14.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 21.06.2017 | |
DK | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
ES | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
IT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
MT | 21.06.2017 | ||
PL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
RS | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SI | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
SM | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
LU | 14.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | CZ | 21.06.2017 | |
DK | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
ES | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
IT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
PL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
RS | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SI | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
SM | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | CZ | 21.06.2017 | |
DK | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
ES | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
IT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
PL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
RS | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
SM | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | CZ | 21.06.2017 | |
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
ES | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
IT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
PL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
RS | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
SM | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | CZ | 21.06.2017 | |
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
RS | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | EE | 21.06.2017 | |
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
RS | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | FI | 21.06.2017 | |
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
RS | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | FI | 21.06.2017 | |
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | Cited in | International search | [XI] - IMM, SEBASTIAN ET AL, "An Efficient and General Synthesis of Primary Amines by Ruthenium-Catalyzed Amination of Secondary Alcohols with Ammonia", ANGEWANDTE CHEMIE, INTERNATIONAL EDITION , 49(44), 8126-8129, S8126/1-S8126/9 CODEN: ACIEF5; ISSN: 1433-7851, (2010), XP002669003 [X] 1,2,5,7-9,11 * page 8127, column 1, line 1 - line 10 * * page 8127, column 1; compound 2 * * Seite 8127, Spalte 2, Tabelle 1: Fussnoten * [I] 1-11 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/anie.201002576 | [XP] - IMM S ET AL, "Improved Ruthenium-Catalyzed Amination of Alcohols with Ammonia: Synthesis of Diamines and Amino Esters", ANGEWANDTE CHEMIE. INTERNATIONAL EDITION, WILEY VCH VERLAG, WEINHEIM, vol. 50, no. 33, doi:10.1002/ANIE.201103199, ISSN 1433-7851, (20110808), pages 7599 - 7603, (20110705), XP002664616 [XP] 1-11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/anie.201103199 | by applicant | US4314084 | US5530127 | US5932769 | FR1347648 | US3270059 | US4111840 | US4123462 | DE1667193 | DE19507007 | WO2010018570 | DE3903367 | US4153581 | US5103058 | DE1543377 | RO63243 | DE1278432 | DE1570542 | - FISCHER ET AL., J. CATAL., (1999), vol. 182, pages 289 - 291 | - JENZER ET AL., CATAL. LETT., (1999), vol. 61, pages 111 - 114 | - MILSTEIN ET AL., ANGEW. CHEM. INT. ED., (2008), vol. 47, pages 8661 - 8664 | - S. IMM; S. BÄHN; L. NEUBERT; H. NEUMANN; M. BELLER, ANGEW. CHEM., (2010), vol. 122, pages 8303 - 6 | - D. PINGEN; C. MÜLLER; D. VOGT, ANGEW. CHEM., (2010), vol. 122, pages 1 - 5 | - H. KIMURA; Y. YOKOTA; Y. SAWAMOTO, CATAL. LETT., (2005), vol. 99, no. 3-4, pages 133 - 140 | - G. VEDAGE; M. FORD; J. ARMOR, CATALYSIS OF ORGANIC REACTIONS, (2003), vol. 89, pages 517 - 52 | - P. LIKHAR; R. ARUNDHATHI; M. KANTAM; P. PRATHIMA, EUR. J. ORG. CHEM., (2009), pages 5383 - 59 |