EP2663987 - TAP CHANGER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.01.2016 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Maschinenfabrik Reinhausen GmbH Falkensteinstrasse 8 93059 Regensburg / DE | [2013/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BÖGER, Christian Mathildenstrasse 10 93049 Regensburg / DE | 02 /
HOTTNER, Toni Salbeiweg 3 93186 Reifenthal / DE | 03 /
JATTA, Martin Lilienweg 9 93092 Barbing / DE | 04 /
LEDERER, Philipp Ludwig-Thoma-Str. 15 93087 Alteglofsheim / DE | 05 /
REHKOPF, Sebastian An der Schierstadt 3 93059 Regensburg / DE | 06 /
SCHLEPP, Klaus Almenstrasse 23 93142 Maxhütte-Birkenhöhe / DE | 07 /
STREMPEL, Rolf Bogenstrasse 22 93051 Regensburg / DE | [2014/12] |
Former [2013/47] | 01 /
BÖGER, Christian Mathildenstrasse 10 93049 Regensburg / DE | ||
02 /
HOTTNER, Toni Salbeiweg 3 93186 Reifenthal / DE | |||
03 /
JATTA, Martin Lilienweg 9 93092 Barbing / DE | |||
04 /
LEDERER, Philipp Ludwig-Thoma-Str. 15 93087 Alteglofsheim / DE | |||
05 /
REHKOPF, Sebastian St. Peters Weg 1 93047 Regensburg / DE | |||
06 /
SCHLEPP, Klaus Almenstrasse 23 93142 Maxhütte-Birkenhöhe / DE | |||
07 /
STREMPEL, Rolf Krebsgasse 1 93047 Regensburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 11802292.0 | 24.12.2011 | WO2011EP06566 | Priority number, date | DE20111008689 | 15.01.2011 Original published format: DE102011008689 | [2013/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012095154 | Date: | 19.07.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2663987 | Date: | 20.11.2013 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.07.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2663987 | Date: | 25.02.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H01H9/00, H01F27/14 | [2013/47] | CPC: |
H01F27/14 (EP);
H01H9/0044 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/47] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STUFENSCHALTER | [2013/47] | English: | TAP CHANGER | [2013/47] | French: | COMMUTATEUR À GRADINS | [2014/43] |
Former [2013/47] | CHANGEUR DE PRISES EN CHARGE | Entry into regional phase | 16.08.2013 | National basic fee paid | 16.08.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.08.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.05.2012 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.08.2013 | Examination requested [2013/47] | 02.10.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.11.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 21.11.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.11.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.10.2014 | Opposition(s) | 26.11.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.12.2011 | AL | 25.02.2015 | CY | 25.02.2015 | CZ | 25.02.2015 | DK | 25.02.2015 | EE | 25.02.2015 | FI | 25.02.2015 | HR | 25.02.2015 | LT | 25.02.2015 | LV | 25.02.2015 | MC | 25.02.2015 | MK | 25.02.2015 | MT | 25.02.2015 | NL | 25.02.2015 | PL | 25.02.2015 | PT | 25.02.2015 | RO | 25.02.2015 | RS | 25.02.2015 | SI | 25.02.2015 | SK | 25.02.2015 | SM | 25.02.2015 | NO | 25.05.2015 | GR | 26.05.2015 | IS | 25.06.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 24.12.2011 | |
CY | 25.02.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
MC | 25.02.2015 | ||
MK | 25.02.2015 | ||
MT | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PT | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
RS | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
SM | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 24.12.2011 | |
CY | 25.02.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
MC | 25.02.2015 | ||
MT | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
RS | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
SM | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | CZ | 25.02.2015 | |
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
MC | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
RS | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | CZ | 25.02.2015 | |
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
RS | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | CZ | 25.02.2015 | |
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
RS | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | CZ | 25.02.2015 | |
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
RS | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/41] | FI | 25.02.2015 | |
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RS | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | FI | 25.02.2015 | |
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
RS | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | FI | 25.02.2015 | |
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | FI | 25.02.2015 | |
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | FI | 25.02.2015 | |
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | LT | 25.02.2015 | |
NO | 25.05.2015 | Cited in | International search | [XDY]DE102005033925 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [XD] 1-3 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0028]; figures 1,2 * [Y] 4; | [Y]US2005095177 (GOLNER THOMAS M [US], et al) [Y] 4 * paragraph [0022]; figure 1 *; | [A]FR2553228 (REINHAUSEN KG MASCHF [DE]) [A] 1-4 * page 2, line 35 - page 4, line 15; figure 1 *; | [A]GB993993 (ASS ELECT IND) [A] 1-4 * page 1, line 47 - page 2, line 19; figure 1 *; | [A]DE619635 (SIEMENS AG) [A] 1-4 * page 1, line 24 - page 2, line 16; figure 1 * | by applicant | DE2020080 | DE102008027274 | DE3504916 | DE102005033925 |