EP2655321 - PURIFICATION OF PRECURSOR COMPOUND BY CRYSTALLISATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.12.2017 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.01.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL, IS | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GE Healthcare Limited Amersham Place Little Chalfont, Buckinghamshire HP7 9NA / GB | [2017/07] |
Former [2013/44] | For all designated states GE Healthcare Limited Amersham Place Little Chalfont Buckinghamshire HP7 9NA / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NILSEN, Anne GE HEALTHCARE AS Nycoveien 2 Postboks 4220 Nydalen N-0401 Oslo / NO | 02 /
NILSEN, Sondre GE HEALTHCARE AS Nycoveien 2 Postboks 4220 Nydalen N-0401 Oslo / NO | [2013/44] | Representative(s) | Bannan, Sally, et al GE Healthcare Limited Intellectual Property Pollards Wood Nightingales Lane Chalfont St.Giles Buckinghamshire HP8 4SP / GB | [2017/07] |
Former [2013/44] | Bannan, Sally, et al GE Healthcare Limited Intellectual Property Pollards Wood Nightingales Lane, Chalfont St Giles Buckinghamshire HP8 4SP / GB | Application number, filing date | 11802373.8 | 19.12.2011 | [2017/07] | WO2011EP73247 | Priority number, date | GB20100021530 | 20.12.2010 Original published format: GB 201021530 | US201061424695P | 20.12.2010 Original published format: US 201061424695 P | [2013/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012084831 | Date: | 28.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2655321 | Date: | 30.10.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.06.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2655321 | Date: | 15.02.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C07C227/20, C07C269/06, C07B59/00, C07C303/28, C07C271/24, C07C309/65, C07C309/73 | [2016/27] | CPC: |
C07C227/20 (EP,CN);
C07B59/001 (EP,CN,RU);
C07C269/06 (EP,CN,KR,RU);
C07C303/28 (EP,CN,KR,RU);
C07C227/18 (RU);
C07C271/24 (KR);
C07C309/65 (KR);
C07C309/73 (KR);
C07B2200/05 (EP,CN);
| C-Set: |
C07C227/20, C07C229/48 (CN,EP);
C07C269/06, C07C271/24 (CN,EP);
C07C303/28, C07C309/65 (CN,EP);
C07C303/28, C07C309/73 (EP) |
Former IPC [2013/44] | C07C269/06, C07B59/00, C07C303/28, C07C271/24, C07C309/65, C07C309/73 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | REINIGUNG VON VORLÄUFERVERBINDUNGEN DURCH KRISTALLISATION | [2013/44] | English: | PURIFICATION OF PRECURSOR COMPOUND BY CRYSTALLISATION | [2013/44] | French: | PURIFICATION DE COMPOSÉ PRÉCURSEUR PAR CRISTALLISATION | [2013/44] | Entry into regional phase | 06.06.2013 | National basic fee paid | 06.06.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.06.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.06.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.06.2013 | Examination requested [2013/44] | 22.10.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.03.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.07.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.11.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 24.11.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.11.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.10.2015 | Opposition(s) | 16.11.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2013 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   27.03.2014 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.12.2011 | AL | 15.02.2017 | AT | 15.02.2017 | CY | 15.02.2017 | CZ | 15.02.2017 | FI | 15.02.2017 | HR | 15.02.2017 | LT | 15.02.2017 | LV | 15.02.2017 | MC | 15.02.2017 | MK | 15.02.2017 | NL | 15.02.2017 | PL | 15.02.2017 | RO | 15.02.2017 | RS | 15.02.2017 | SE | 15.02.2017 | SI | 15.02.2017 | SK | 15.02.2017 | SM | 15.02.2017 | TR | 15.02.2017 | BG | 15.05.2017 | GR | 16.05.2017 | IS | 15.06.2017 | PT | 15.06.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 19.12.2011 | |
AT | 15.02.2017 | ||
CY | 15.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
HR | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
MC | 15.02.2017 | ||
MK | 15.02.2017 | ||
NL | 15.02.2017 | ||
PL | 15.02.2017 | ||
RO | 15.02.2017 | ||
RS | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SI | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
SM | 15.02.2017 | ||
TR | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 19.12.2011 | |
AT | 15.02.2017 | ||
CY | 15.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
HR | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
MC | 15.02.2017 | ||
MK | 15.02.2017 | ||
NL | 15.02.2017 | ||
PL | 15.02.2017 | ||
RO | 15.02.2017 | ||
RS | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SI | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
SM | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 19.12.2011 | |
AT | 15.02.2017 | ||
CY | 15.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
HR | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
MC | 15.02.2017 | ||
NL | 15.02.2017 | ||
PL | 15.02.2017 | ||
RO | 15.02.2017 | ||
RS | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SI | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
SM | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 19.12.2011 | |
AT | 15.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
HR | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
MC | 15.02.2017 | ||
NL | 15.02.2017 | ||
PL | 15.02.2017 | ||
RO | 15.02.2017 | ||
RS | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SI | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
SM | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 15.02.2017 | |
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
HR | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
MC | 15.02.2017 | ||
NL | 15.02.2017 | ||
PL | 15.02.2017 | ||
RO | 15.02.2017 | ||
RS | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SI | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
SM | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 15.02.2017 | |
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
HR | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
NL | 15.02.2017 | ||
PL | 15.02.2017 | ||
RO | 15.02.2017 | ||
RS | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SI | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
SM | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 15.02.2017 | |
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
HR | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
NL | 15.02.2017 | ||
PL | 15.02.2017 | ||
RO | 15.02.2017 | ||
RS | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
SM | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 15.02.2017 | |
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
HR | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
NL | 15.02.2017 | ||
RO | 15.02.2017 | ||
RS | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | AT | 15.02.2017 | |
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
HR | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
NL | 15.02.2017 | ||
RS | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | AT | 15.02.2017 | |
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
HR | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
NL | 15.02.2017 | ||
RS | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | Cited in | International search | [ID]EP1978015 (NIHON MEDIPHYSICS CO LTD [JP]) [ID] 1-19 * the whole document *; | [A]EP2230229 (NIHON MEDIPHYSICS CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-19 * example - *; | [A] - WANG L J ET AL, "Syntheses of new conformationally constrained S-Ä2-Ä(1-iminoethyl)aminoÜ ethylÜhomocysteine derivatives as potential nitric oxide synthase inhibitors", HETEROATOM CHEMISTRY, VCH PUBLISHERS, DERFIELD BEACH, FL, US, (20020101), vol. 13, no. 1, doi:10.1002/HC.1109, ISSN 1042-7163, pages 77 - 83, XP003013677 [A] 1-10 * Scheme 1; page 80, column l, paragraph l - page 80, column r, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/hc.1109 | by applicant | EP1978015 | - Handbook of Radiopharmaceuticals, (2003), pages 195 - 227 | - MCCONATHY ET AL., APPL RADIAT ISOTOP, (2003), vol. 58, pages 657 - 666 |