08.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] |
10.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.07.2022 [2022/28] |
03.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.07.2022 [2022/27] |
22.10.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.11.2021 [2021/47] |
15.10.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.11.2021 [2021/46] |
03.09.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.10.2021 [2021/40] |
06.08.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.09.2021 [2021/36] |
04.06.2021 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 07.07.2021 [2021/27] |
21.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.06.2021 [2021/25] |
07.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.06.2021 [2021/23] |
30.04.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.06.2021 [2021/22] |
16.04.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.05.2021 [2021/20] |
05.03.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.04.2021 [2021/14] |
26.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.03.2021 [2021/13] |
19.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.03.2021 [2021/12] |
12.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.03.2021 [2021/11] |
05.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.03.2021 [2021/10] |
29.01.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.03.2021 [2021/09] |
22.01.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.02.2021 [2021/08] |
15.01.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.02.2021 [2021/07] |
31.07.2020 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 02.09.2020 [2020/36] |
26.06.2020 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] |
23.06.2020 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
22.06.2020 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
22.06.2020 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
18.02.2020 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
07.02.2020 |
Change - classification |
published on 11.03.2020 [2020/11] |
07.02.2020 |
Change - classification |
published on 11.03.2020 [2020/11] |
28.01.2020 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
24.12.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.09.2019 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
15.03.2019 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
10.01.2019 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
21.12.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.09.2018 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
07.09.2018 |
First examination report |
|
31.08.2018 |
First examination report |
|
03.01.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.01.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.01.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.01.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.02.2014 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
07.02.2014 |
Change - extension states |
published on 12.03.2014 [2014/11] |
11.10.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.09.2013 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 09.10.2013 [2013/41] |
06.09.2013 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 09.10.2013 [2013/41] |
21.08.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
31.07.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.07.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.07.2013 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
23.06.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.06.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.01.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|