EP2646981 - METHOD FOR DETERMINING THE MOVEMENTS OF AN OBJECT FROM A STREAM OF IMAGES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 21.10.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.10.2016 | Refusal of application | published on 23.11.2016 [2016/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ayotle 30-32 rue Broca 75005 Paris / FR | [2013/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YBANEZ ZEPEDA, José Alonso 30-32 rue Broca F-75005 Paris / FR | [2013/41] | Representative(s) | Osha BWB 2, rue de la Paix 75002 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/41] | Osha Liang SARL 32, avenue de l'Opéra 75002 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 11802866.1 | 30.11.2011 | WO2011EP71348 | Priority number, date | FR20100060074 | 03.12.2010 Original published format: FR 1060074 | [2013/41] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012072664 | Date: | 07.06.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2646981 | Date: | 09.10.2013 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.06.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G06T7/20, G06T1/20, H04N5/14 | [2013/41] | CPC: |
G06T7/20 (EP,US);
H04N5/144 (EP,US);
G06T2207/10016 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/41] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG DER BEWEGUNGEN EINES OBJEKTS AUS EINEM BILDERSTROM | [2013/41] | English: | METHOD FOR DETERMINING THE MOVEMENTS OF AN OBJECT FROM A STREAM OF IMAGES | [2013/41] | French: | METHODE DE DETERMINATION DES MOUVEMENTS D'UN OBJET A PARTIR D'UN FLUX D'IMAGES | [2013/41] | Entry into regional phase | 20.06.2013 | National basic fee paid | 20.06.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.06.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.06.2013 | Examination requested [2013/41] | 20.01.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.06.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.12.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.08.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.2016 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2016/47] | 16.06.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 04.07.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2016/47] | 04.07.2016 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.06.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9749061 (SARNOFF CORP [US]) [A] 1-16 * abstract * * page 1, line 9 - line 25 * * page 4, line 25 - line 34 * | [I] - YAMAOKA K ET AL, "Image segmentation and pattern matching based FPGA/ASIC implementation architecture of real-time object tracking", DESIGN AUTOMATION, 2006. ASIA AND SOUTH PACIFIC CONFERENCE ON JAN. 24, 2006, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20060124), doi:10.1109/ASPDAC.2006.1594678, ISBN 978-0-7803-9451-3, pages 176 - 181, XP010899510 [I] 1-16 * abstract * * page 177, column 1, paragraph 1 * * page 178, column 1, paragraph l - column 2, paragraph 1 * * figure 6 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ASPDAC.2006.1594678 | Examination | - C. V. Ramamoorthy ET AL, "Pipeline Architecture", ACM computing surveys, (19770101), vol. 9, no. 1, doi:10.1145/356683.356687, ISSN 0360-0300, pages 61 - 102, XP055124624 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/356683.356687 | - FLEURY M ET AL, "A real-time parallel image-processing model", IMAGE PROCESSING AND ITS APPLICATIONS, 1997., SIXTH INTERNATIONAL CONF ERENCE ON DUBLIN, IRELAND 14-17 JULY 1997, LONDON, UK,IEE, UK, (19970714), vol. 1, ISBN 978-0-85296-692-1, pages 174 - 178, XP006508276 | by applicant | - "Face tracking using canonical correction analysis", INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMPUTER VISION THEORY AND APPLICATIONS, (200703), pages 396 - 402 |