EP2592406 - PEDAL FORCE DETECTING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.10.2014 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.11.2014 [2014/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2013/20] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OGATA, Motoki c/o Panasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Rights Operations Company IP Development Center 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2013/20] | Representative(s) | Vigand, Philippe, et al Novagraaf International SA Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex - Genève / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2013/20] | Vigand, Philippe, et al Novagraaf International SA Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex / CH | Application number, filing date | 11803338.0 | 07.07.2011 | WO2011JP03892 | Priority number, date | JP20100156885 | 09.07.2010 Original published format: JP 2010156885 | [2013/20] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012005001 | Date: | 12.01.2012 | Language: | JA | [2012/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2592406 | Date: | 15.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.01.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.09.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G01L3/14, B62M6/50, B62M6/40 | [2013/40] | CPC: |
B62M6/50 (EP);
G01L3/1442 (EP);
G01L3/1471 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2013/20] | G01L3/14, B62M6/40 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/20] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERKENNUNG EINER PEDALKRAFT | [2013/20] | English: | PEDAL FORCE DETECTING DEVICE | [2013/20] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DÉTECTION DE FORCE À LA PÉDALE | [2013/20] | Entry into regional phase | 29.11.2012 | Translation filed | 29.11.2012 | National basic fee paid | 29.11.2012 | Search fee paid | 29.11.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.11.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.11.2012 | Examination requested [2013/20] | 01.04.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/46] | 11.06.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2014 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1361822 (FEO ELEKTRONIK GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-5 * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0035]; figures 7,8 *; | [I]CN201140775Y (SUZHOU YANGMING ELECTROMECHANI [CN]) [I] 1-5 * abstract *; | [A]JP2002082003 (TOYODA MACHINE WORKS LTD, et al) [A] 1,3 * abstract *; | [A]US6644135 (KISHIMOTO HITOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1,3 * paragraph [0059] - paragraph [0075]; figures 3,11,19 * | International search | [Y]WO2005021368 (FEO ELEKTRONIC GMBH [DE], et al); | [Y]US3832897 (SCHENCK C); | [A]JPH11258078 (TOYODA MACHINE WORKS LTD, et al); | [A]JP2003019996 (NAKAHIRA TOSHIO); | [A]JP2002019683 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [A]JP2000283864 (SHIMANO KK) | by applicant | JPH10153503 |