EP2591761 - TABLET INSPECTION ASSISTANCE METHOD AND TABLET INSPECTION ASSISTANCE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 04.07.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 06.08.2014 [2014/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2013/20] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOTOU, Makoto c/o Panasonic Corporation IPROC 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
TANIMOTO, Takanobu c/o Panasonic Corporation IPROC 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 03 /
MATSUKAWA, Yoshihiko c/o Panasonic Corporation IPROC 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2013/20] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/20] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11803341.4 | 07.07.2011 | WO2011JP03904 | Priority number, date | JP20100156886 | 09.07.2010 Original published format: JP 2010156886 | [2013/20] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012005004 | Date: | 12.01.2012 | Language: | JA | [2012/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2591761 | Date: | 15.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.01.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61J3/00 | [2013/20] | CPC: |
B07C5/38 (EP,US);
G01N21/9508 (EP,US);
B65B57/10 (EP,US);
G01N2021/8893 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/20] | Title | German: | TABLETTENPRÜFHILFSVERFAHREN UND TABLETTENPRÜFHILFSSYSTEM | [2013/20] | English: | TABLET INSPECTION ASSISTANCE METHOD AND TABLET INSPECTION ASSISTANCE SYSTEM | [2013/20] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME D'ASSISTANCE À L'INSPECTION DE COMPRIMÉS | [2013/20] | Entry into regional phase | 03.04.2012 | Translation filed | 03.04.2012 | National basic fee paid | 03.04.2012 | Search fee paid | 03.04.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.04.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.04.2012 | Examination requested [2013/20] | 24.06.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPH09253164 (TOKYO SHOKAI KK); | [Y]JP2010117331 (UNIV WASEDA, et al) | by applicant | JP2006069618 |