Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
19.12.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 21.01.2015 [2015/04] |
05.08.2014 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
06.09.2013 | Change - extension states | published on 09.10.2013 [2013/41] |
03.08.2013 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
12.04.2013 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 15.05.2013 [2013/20] |
12.04.2013 | Request for examination filed | published on 15.05.2013 [2013/20] |
25.02.2013 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
08.02.2013 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
08.02.2013 | Amendment by applicant | |
05.02.2013 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
25.01.2012 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
13.01.2012 | PCT data prior to European publication |