Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
19.07.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 21.08.2019 [2019/34] |
30.06.2018 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
21.07.2017 | Amendment by applicant | |
30.06.2017 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
13.01.2017 | Change - classification | published on 15.02.2017 [2017/07] |
13.01.2017 | Change - classification | published on 15.02.2017 [2017/07] |
13.01.2017 | Change - date of supplementary search report | published on 15.02.2017 [2017/07] |
01.07.2016 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
23.06.2015 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
03.04.2014 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
13.09.2013 | Change - extension states | published on 16.10.2013 [2013/42] |
24.06.2013 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
12.04.2013 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 15.05.2013 [2013/20] |
12.04.2013 | Request for examination filed | published on 15.05.2013 [2013/20] |
05.02.2013 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
14.01.2013 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
27.01.2012 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
13.01.2012 | PCT data prior to European publication |