EP2592832 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ENTROPY ENCODING/DECODING A TRANSFORM COEFFICIENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.07.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.07.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.08.2017 [2017/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/20] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Bae-Keun 142-10 Chunui-dong Wonmi-gu Bucheon-si Gyeonggi-do 420-120 / KR | 02 /
SOHN, Yu-Mi 201 Dogok Highville 919-3 Dogok 1-dong Gangnam-gu Seoul 135-271 / KR | [2013/20] | Representative(s) | Appleyard Lees IP LLP 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | [2016/36] |
Former [2013/20] | Davies, Robert Ean Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road Halifax Yorkshire HX1 2HY / GB | Application number, filing date | 11803837.1 | 08.07.2011 | [2016/36] | WO2011KR05034 | Priority number, date | US20100362844P | 09.07.2010 Original published format: US 362844 P | [2013/20] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012005551 | Date: | 12.01.2012 | Language: | KO | [2012/02] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2592832 | Date: | 15.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2592832 | Date: | 07.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 03.05.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/91, H04N19/176, H04N19/13, H04N19/129, H04N19/463, H04N19/18 | [2015/33] | CPC: |
H04N19/129 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04N19/13 (EP,CN,KR,RU,US);
H04N19/176 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04N19/60 (RU,US);
H04N19/119 (KR);
H04N19/18 (EP,CN,KR,RU,US);
H04N19/184 (US);
H04N19/44 (RU);
H04N19/463 (EP,CN,US);
H04N19/61 (US);
H04N19/70 (KR);
H04N19/91 (EP,CN,US);
H04N19/96 (EP,CN,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2013/20] | H04N7/26 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/20] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ENTROPIE-KODIERUNG/DEKODIERUNG EINES TRANSFORMATIONSKOEFFIZIENTEN | [2013/20] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ENTROPY ENCODING/DECODING A TRANSFORM COEFFICIENT | [2013/20] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE CODAGE/DÉCODAGE ENTROPIQUE D'UN COEFFICIENT DE TRANSFORMÉE | [2013/20] | Entry into regional phase | 08.02.2013 | Translation filed | 08.02.2013 | National basic fee paid | 08.02.2013 | Search fee paid | 08.02.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.02.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.02.2013 | Examination requested [2013/20] | 05.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.04.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.07.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 14.07.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.07.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP16180222.8 / EP3101900 | EP16180224.4 / EP3101901 | EP16180225.1 / EP3104616 | EP16180227.7 / EP3104617 | EP17193482.1 / EP3293976 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.04.2016 | Opposition(s) | 08.06.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]US2004114683 (SCHWARZ HEIKO [DE], et al); | [A]US2005123207 (MARPE DETLEV [DE], et al); | [A]EP2154894 (THOMSON LICENSING [FR]); | [E]US2012140813 (SOLE ROJALS JOEL [US], et al); | [E]WO2012075193 (QUALCOMM INC [US], et al); | [E]WO2012139192 (RESEARCH IN MOTION LTD [CA], et al); | International search | [A]JP2003153228 (SONY CORP, et al); | [A]KR20090099236 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | [A]KR20090129939 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) |