EP2643122 - SHIM-MASK STENCIL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.09.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wilkinson, Alan C/Rio Segura 5B Chalet 16 28803 Alcalà de Henares Madrid / ES | [2013/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2013/40] | Representative(s) | Games, Robert Harland, et al Albright IP Limited County House Bayshill Road Cheltenham, Glos. GL50 3BA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/45] | Games, Robert Harland, et al Albright IP Limited Eagle Tower Montpellier Drive Cheltenham GL50 1TA / GB | ||
Former [2013/40] | Games, Robert Harland, et al Albright Patents Eagle Tower Montpelier Drive GB-Cheltenham, Gloucestershire GL50 1TA / GB | Application number, filing date | 11805114.3 | 16.11.2011 | [2015/45] | WO2011GB01610 | Priority number, date | GB20100019690 | 22.11.2010 Original published format: GB 201019690 | [2013/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012069777 | Date: | 31.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2643122 | Date: | 02.10.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.05.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2643122 | Date: | 04.11.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B24B37/00, B24C1/04 | [2013/40] | CPC: |
B24B23/005 (EP,US);
B05C17/06 (GB);
B24B19/00 (GB);
B24B55/00 (EP,US);
B24C1/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/44] |
Former [2013/40] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHLEIFMASKE | [2015/22] | English: | SHIM-MASK STENCIL | [2013/40] | French: | POCHOIR DE RECTIFICATION | [2013/40] |
Former [2013/40] | MASKENSCHABLONE FÜR DISTANZSCHEIBE | Entry into regional phase | 19.06.2013 | National basic fee paid | 19.06.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.06.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.06.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.06.2013 | Examination requested [2013/40] | 14.05.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.08.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.09.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.11.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.09.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 22.09.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.09.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.05.2014 | Opposition(s) | 05.08.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.11.2011 | AL | 04.11.2015 | AT | 04.11.2015 | BE | 04.11.2015 | BG | 04.11.2015 | CY | 04.11.2015 | CZ | 04.11.2015 | DK | 04.11.2015 | EE | 04.11.2015 | ES | 04.11.2015 | FI | 04.11.2015 | HR | 04.11.2015 | IT | 04.11.2015 | LT | 04.11.2015 | LV | 04.11.2015 | MC | 04.11.2015 | MK | 04.11.2015 | MT | 04.11.2015 | NL | 04.11.2015 | PL | 04.11.2015 | RO | 04.11.2015 | RS | 04.11.2015 | SE | 04.11.2015 | SI | 04.11.2015 | SK | 04.11.2015 | SM | 04.11.2015 | TR | 04.11.2015 | IE | 16.11.2015 | LU | 16.11.2015 | CH | 30.11.2015 | LI | 30.11.2015 | NO | 04.02.2016 | GR | 05.02.2016 | IS | 04.03.2016 | PT | 04.03.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 16.11.2011 | |
AT | 04.11.2015 | ||
BE | 04.11.2015 | ||
BG | 04.11.2015 | ||
CY | 04.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2015 | ||
DK | 04.11.2015 | ||
EE | 04.11.2015 | ||
ES | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
HR | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
MC | 04.11.2015 | ||
MK | 04.11.2015 | ||
MT | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
RO | 04.11.2015 | ||
RS | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
SI | 04.11.2015 | ||
SK | 04.11.2015 | ||
SM | 04.11.2015 | ||
TR | 04.11.2015 | ||
IE | 16.11.2015 | ||
LU | 16.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
NO | 04.02.2016 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2018/02] | HU | 16.11.2011 | |
AT | 04.11.2015 | ||
BE | 04.11.2015 | ||
BG | 04.11.2015 | ||
CY | 04.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2015 | ||
DK | 04.11.2015 | ||
EE | 04.11.2015 | ||
ES | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
HR | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
MC | 04.11.2015 | ||
MT | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
RO | 04.11.2015 | ||
RS | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
SI | 04.11.2015 | ||
SK | 04.11.2015 | ||
SM | 04.11.2015 | ||
IE | 16.11.2015 | ||
LU | 16.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
NO | 04.02.2016 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 16.11.2011 | |
AT | 04.11.2015 | ||
BE | 04.11.2015 | ||
BG | 04.11.2015 | ||
CY | 04.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2015 | ||
DK | 04.11.2015 | ||
EE | 04.11.2015 | ||
ES | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
HR | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
MC | 04.11.2015 | ||
MT | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
RO | 04.11.2015 | ||
RS | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
SI | 04.11.2015 | ||
SK | 04.11.2015 | ||
SM | 04.11.2015 | ||
IE | 16.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
NO | 04.02.2016 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 04.11.2015 | |
BE | 04.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2015 | ||
DK | 04.11.2015 | ||
EE | 04.11.2015 | ||
ES | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
HR | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
MC | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
RO | 04.11.2015 | ||
RS | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
SI | 04.11.2015 | ||
SK | 04.11.2015 | ||
SM | 04.11.2015 | ||
IE | 16.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
NO | 04.02.2016 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 04.11.2015 | |
CZ | 04.11.2015 | ||
DK | 04.11.2015 | ||
EE | 04.11.2015 | ||
ES | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
HR | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
MC | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
RO | 04.11.2015 | ||
RS | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
SI | 04.11.2015 | ||
SK | 04.11.2015 | ||
SM | 04.11.2015 | ||
IE | 16.11.2015 | ||
BE | 30.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
NO | 04.02.2016 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/45] | AT | 04.11.2015 | |
CZ | 04.11.2015 | ||
DK | 04.11.2015 | ||
EE | 04.11.2015 | ||
ES | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
HR | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
MC | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
RO | 04.11.2015 | ||
RS | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
SK | 04.11.2015 | ||
SM | 04.11.2015 | ||
IE | 16.11.2015 | ||
BE | 30.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
NO | 04.02.2016 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/42] | AT | 04.11.2015 | |
CZ | 04.11.2015 | ||
DK | 04.11.2015 | ||
EE | 04.11.2015 | ||
ES | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
HR | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
MC | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
RO | 04.11.2015 | ||
RS | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
SK | 04.11.2015 | ||
SM | 04.11.2015 | ||
BE | 30.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
NO | 04.02.2016 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 04.11.2015 | |
CZ | 04.11.2015 | ||
DK | 04.11.2015 | ||
EE | 04.11.2015 | ||
ES | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
HR | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
RO | 04.11.2015 | ||
RS | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
SK | 04.11.2015 | ||
SM | 04.11.2015 | ||
BE | 30.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
NO | 04.02.2016 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 04.11.2015 | |
CZ | 04.11.2015 | ||
EE | 04.11.2015 | ||
ES | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
HR | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
RO | 04.11.2015 | ||
RS | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
SK | 04.11.2015 | ||
SM | 04.11.2015 | ||
BE | 30.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
NO | 04.02.2016 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 04.11.2015 | |
CZ | 04.11.2015 | ||
EE | 04.11.2015 | ||
ES | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
HR | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
RO | 04.11.2015 | ||
RS | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
SK | 04.11.2015 | ||
BE | 30.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
NO | 04.02.2016 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 04.11.2015 | |
CZ | 04.11.2015 | ||
ES | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
HR | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
RS | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
BE | 30.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
NO | 04.02.2016 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 04.11.2015 | |
ES | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
HR | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
RS | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
BE | 30.11.2015 | ||
NO | 04.02.2016 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 04.11.2015 | |
ES | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
HR | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
RS | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
BE | 30.11.2015 | ||
NO | 04.02.2016 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | ES | 04.11.2015 | |
HR | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
RS | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
NO | 04.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | ES | 04.11.2015 | |
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
NO | 04.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | ES | 04.11.2015 | |
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
NO | 04.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | ES | 04.11.2015 | |
LT | 04.11.2015 | Cited in | International search | [X]JPS57156169 (NIPPON COLUMBIA); | [X]JPH0564767 (TOYODA GOSEI KK); | [A]US5399421 (CASCINO LAWRENCE A [US]); | [AD]US6099388 (FRITSCH JOSEPH F [IE], et al) | by applicant | US5399421 | US6099388 |